This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 11/30/2021 at 07:08:54 (UTC).

Rodriguez vs Autruck Auto Sales Inc

Case Summary

On 10/01/2021 Rodriguez filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Autruck Auto Sales Inc. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Richard S. Whitney and Matthew C. Braner. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    10/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judges

Richard S. Whitney

Matthew C. Braner

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rodriguez, Horacio Flores

Defendants

AUTRUCK AUTO SALES INC

Hudson Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Sadr, Kasra

 

Court Documents

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Rodriguez, Horacio Flores. Refers to: AUTRUCK AUTO SALES INC; Hudson Insurance Company

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Rodriguez, Horacio Flores. Refers to: AUTRUCK AUTO SALES INC; Hudson Insurance Company

Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000

Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 filed by Rodriguez, Horacio Flores. Refers to: AUTRUCK AUTO SALES INC; Hudson Insurance Company

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

Civil Case Management Conference rescheduled to 05/27/2022 at 10:30:00 AM in C-60 before Matthew C. Braner at Central.

Notice of Case Reassignment SD

Case reassigned from Whitney,Richard to Braner,Matthew effective 11/11/2021

Affidavit Re Venue

Affidavit - Other filed by Rodriguez, Horacio Flores.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/27/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-60; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference reassigned to Braner, Matthew for 04/01/2022 at 10:00:00 AM in C-60 at Central.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase reassigned from Whitney,Richard to Braner,Matthew effective 11/11/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference rescheduled to 05/27/2022 at 10:30:00 AM in C-60 before Matthew C. Braner at Central.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit - Other filed by Rodriguez, Horacio Flores. Filed By: Rodriguez, Horacio Flores (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 04/01/2022 at 10:00:00 AM at Central in C-68 Richard S. Whitney.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 filed by Rodriguez, Horacio Flores. Refers to: AUTRUCK AUTO SALES INC; Hudson Insurance Company Filed By: Rodriguez, Horacio Flores (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Rodriguez, Horacio Flores. Refers to: AUTRUCK AUTO SALES INC; Hudson Insurance Company Filed By: Rodriguez, Horacio Flores (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Rodriguez, Horacio Flores. Refers to: AUTRUCK AUTO SALES INC; Hudson Insurance Company Filed By: Rodriguez, Horacio Flores (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Whitney, Richard.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Hudson Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SADR KASRA