This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 03/20/2023 at 08:06:19 (UTC).

RODRIGUEZ VS ALFARO

Case Summary

On 12/20/2022 RODRIGUEZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ALFARO. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Katherine Bacal. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Katherine Bacal

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rodriguez, Lauren

Defendants

Alfaro, Desiree E

Alfaro, Isabelita

Alfaro, Joby B

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

De Santis, Thomas J

Tastad, Blake

 

Court Documents

Complaint (Case Initiation)

Complaint filed by Rodriguez, Lauren. Refers to: Alfaro, Isabelita; Alfaro, Joby; Alfaro, Desiree

Civil Case Cover Sheet (Cover Sheets)

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Rodriguez, Lauren. Refers to: Alfaro, Isabelita; Alfaro, Joby; Alfaro, Desiree

Original Summons (Warrants/Issuance Returns)

Original Summons filed by Rodriguez, Lauren. Refers to: Alfaro, Isabelita; Alfaro, Joby; Alfaro, Desiree

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

Case initiation form printed.

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action (Judgment/Dismissal)

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Rodriguez, Lauren.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 05/26/2023 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in C-69 Katherine Bacal was vacated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Rodriguez, Lauren.; Filed By: Rodriguez, Lauren (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to Rodriguez, Lauren .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to Alfaro, Desiree E .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to Alfaro, Joby B .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to Alfaro, Isabelita .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 05/26/2023 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in C-69 Katherine Bacal.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Bacal, Katherine.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Rodriguez, Lauren. Refers to: Alfaro, Isabelita; Alfaro, Joby; Alfaro, Desiree; Filed By: Rodriguez, Lauren (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Rodriguez, Lauren. Refers to: Alfaro, Isabelita; Alfaro, Joby; Alfaro, Desiree; Filed By: Rodriguez, Lauren (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Rodriguez, Lauren. Refers to: Alfaro, Isabelita; Alfaro, Joby; Alfaro, Desiree; Filed By: Rodriguez, Lauren (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less