This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 04/30/2019 at 14:58:40 (UTC).

Rodriguez vs. Al Alem

Case Summary

On 05/02/2012 Rodriguez filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Al Alem. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, East County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is EDDIE C STURGEON. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************O-EC

  • Filing Date:

    05/02/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    East County Regional Center

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

EDDIE C STURGEON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Claimant

Rodriguez, Kayden

Guardian Ad Litem and Petitioner

BARRON, MARIA

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

Al Alem, Nader

Finn, Stephanie

Defendant and Cross Defendant

Finn, Stephanie

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Claimant Attorney

McClellan, Craig R

Attorney at THE MCCLELLAN LAW FIRM

1144 State St

San Diego, CA 92101

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

KONOSKE, GREGORY P

Attorney at KONOSKE AKIYAMA & BRUST LLP

16880 W Bernardo Dr Suite 250

San Diego, CA 92127

GUIDO, RICHARD A

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF MCCARTHY & BEAVERS

1230 Columbia St Suite 1180

San Diego, CA 92101

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorney

GUIDO, RICHARD A

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF MCCARTHY & BEAVERS

1230 Columbia St Suite 1180

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Rodriguez, Kayden; Barron, Maria. Refers to: Al Alem, Nader; Finn, Stephanie

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Rodriguez, Kayden. Refers to: Al Alem, Nader

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Rodriguez, Kayden. Refers to: Finn, Stephanie

Answer

Answer filed by Finn, Stephanie. Refers to: Rodriguez, Kayden

Certificate of Service

Certificate of Service filed by Rodriguez, Kayden.

Cross-Complaint

Cross-Complaint filed by Al Alem, Nader. Refers to: Finn, Stephanie

Answer

Answer filed by Finn, Stephanie.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Rodriguez, Kayden.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Rodriguez, Kayden.

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Rodriguez, Kayden.

Minute Order

Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.

Notice to Filing Party SD

[Another document for ROA# 34]

Stipulation - Other - Fee Due

Stipulation - Other - Fee Due (to continue Trial Readiness Conference and Order (signed 07/01/13)) filed by Al Alem, Nader; Rodriguez, Kayden; Finn, Stephanie.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

The Trial Readiness Conference (Civil) was rescheduled to 07/12/2013 at 10:00:00 AM in E-14 before Eddie C Sturgeon at East County.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Trial Readiness Conference (Civil) heard 07/12/2013 10:00:00 AM.

Notice of Hearing SD

Notice of Hearing SD generated.

Notice of Hearing SD

Notice of Hearing SD generated.

Notice - Other

Notice - Other (OF FUNDING OF ANNUITY PURSUANT TO MINOR'S COMPROMISE) filed by Barron, Maria. Refers to: Rodriguez, Kayden

35 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2013
  • OSC - Failure to File Receipt and Acknowledgement of Order for the Deposit of Money into Blocked Account scheduled for 12/06/2013 at 11:00:00 AM at East County in E-14 Eddie C Sturgeon was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2013
  • OSC - Why Case Should Not be Dismissed scheduled for 12/06/2013 at 11:00:00 AM at East County in E-14 Eddie C Sturgeon was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2013
  • Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Rodriguez, Kayden .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2013
  • Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Finn, Stephanie .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2013
  • Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Al Alem, Nader .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action (COMPLAINT) filed by Rodriguez, Kayden. Filed By: Rodriguez, Kayden (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice - Other (OF FUNDING OF ANNUITY PURSUANT TO MINOR'S COMPROMISE) filed by Barron, Maria. Refers to: Rodriguez, Kayden Filed By: Barron, Maria (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2013
  • OSC - Why Case Should Not be Dismissed scheduled for 12/06/2013 at 11:00:00 AM at East County in E-14 Eddie C Sturgeon was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2013
  • Cross-Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Al Alem, Nader .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2013
  • Cross-Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Finn, Stephanie .

    Read MoreRead Less
56 More Docket Entries
  • 06/13/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Rodriguez, Kayden. Refers to: Finn, Stephanie Filed By: Rodriguez, Kayden (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Rodriguez, Kayden. Refers to: Al Alem, Nader Filed By: Rodriguez, Kayden (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2012
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Summons filed by Rodriguez, Kayden; Barron, Maria. Refers to: Al Alem, Nader; Finn, Stephanie Filed By: Rodriguez, Kayden (Plaintiff); Barron, Maria (Guardian Ad Litem)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Application and Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem (GRANTED) filed by Rodriguez, Kayden. Refers to: Barron, Maria Filed By: Rodriguez, Kayden (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2012
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Sturgeon, Eddie.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2012
  • Application and Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem filed by Rodriguez, Kayden. Refers to: Barron, Maria; Al Alem, Nader; Finn, Stephanie Filed By: Rodriguez, Kayden (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Rodriguez, Kayden. Refers to: Barron, Maria; Al Alem, Nader; Finn, Stephanie Filed By: Rodriguez, Kayden (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed by Rodriguez, Kayden. Refers to: Barron, Maria; Al Alem, Nader; Finn, Stephanie Filed By: Rodriguez, Kayden (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.