This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 12/05/2021 at 09:48:30 (UTC).

Robles vs Gilead Sciences Inc

Case Summary

On 07/09/2021 Robles filed an Other - Complex Tort/Class Action lawsuit against Gilead Sciences Inc. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Eddie C Sturgeon and Matthew C. Braner. The case status is Other - Stayed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other - Stayed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Complex Tort/Class Action

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judges

Eddie C Sturgeon

Matthew C. Braner

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Acey, Mark

Acosta-Perez, Nilsa

Adams, Nathan T

Argote, Jorge

Burger, Jackie

Champion, Billy

Coit, Avery

Eakin, William

Edwards-El, Cherrell

GILBERT, JAMES

Godwin, Shonda L

Hoffman, Arthea

JENKINS, MICHAEL

Johnson, Kelvin

Johnson, Melissa

Kamins, Andrew S

LEFF, ALAN

Letera, Sunday

MILLER, RORY

Defendant

Gilead Sciences Inc

22 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Graham, M Elizabeth

Attorney at One Market Street Spear Tower

 

Court Documents

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Robles, Trudy Lyn Rojas; Adams, Nathan T; Smith, Alonzo; Hoffman, Arthea; Burger, Jackie; Eakin, William; Edwards-El, Cherrell; Godwin, Shonda L; Johnson, Kelvin; Johnson, Melissa;OTHERS. Refers to: Gilead Sciences Inc

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Robles, Trudy Lyn Rojas; Adams, Nathan T; Smith, Alonzo; Hoffman, Arthea; Burger, Jackie; Eakin, William; Edwards-El, Cherrell; Godwin, Shonda L; Johnson, Kelvin; Johnson, Melissa;OTHERS. Refers to: Gilead Sciences Inc

Complaint

Complaint filed by Robles, Trudy Lyn Rojas; Adams, Nathan T; Smith, Alonzo; Hoffman, Arthea; Burger, Jackie; Eakin, William; Edwards-El, Cherrell; Godwin, Shonda L; Johnson, Kelvin; Johnson, Melissa;OTHERS. Refers to: Gilead Sciences Inc

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed by LEFF, ALAN; Smith, Alonzo; Kamins, Andrew S; Hoffman, Arthea; Coit, Avery; Champion, Billy; Teasett, Bridget; Miller, Carolyn; Nosal, Charles; Edwards-El, Cherrell;OTHERS. Refers to: Gilead Sciences Inc

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

Civil Case Management Conference rescheduled to 07/01/2022 at 10:30:00 AM in C-60 before Matthew C. Braner at Central.

Notice of Case Reassignment SD

Case reassigned from Sturgeon,Eddie to Braner,Matthew effective 11/11/2021

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by LEFF, ALAN; Smith, Alonzo; Kamins, Andrew S; Hoffman, Arthea; Coit, Avery; Champion, Billy; Teasett, Bridget; Miller, Carolyn; Nosal, Charles; Edwards-El, Cherrell;OTHERS.

Notice of Stay

Notice of Stay of Proceedings - Case filed by LEFF, ALAN; Smith, Alonzo; Kamins, Andrew S; Hoffman, Arthea; Coit, Avery; Champion, Billy; Teasett, Bridget; Miller, Carolyn; Nosal, Charles; Edwards-El, Cherrell;OTHERS.

Notice of Entry of Order

Notice - Other (OF ENTRY OF ORDER ADDING CASES TO JCCP. No. 5043) filed by LEFF, ALAN; Smith, Alonzo; Kamins, Andrew S; Hoffman, Arthea; Coit, Avery; Champion, Billy; Teasett, Bridget; Miller, Carolyn; Nosal, Charles; Edwards-El, Cherrell;OTHERS.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-60; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference reassigned to Braner, Matthew for 05/27/2022 at 10:30:00 AM in C-60 at Central.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase reassigned from Sturgeon,Eddie to Braner,Matthew effective 11/11/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference rescheduled to 07/01/2022 at 10:30:00 AM in C-60 before Matthew C. Braner at Central.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice - Other (OF ENTRY OF ORDER ADDING CASES TO JCCP. No. 5043) filed by LEFF, ALAN; Smith, Alonzo; Kamins, Andrew S; Hoffman, Arthea; Coit, Avery; Champion, Billy; Teasett, Bridget; Miller, Carolyn; Nosal, Charles; Edwards-El, Cherrell;OTHERS. Filed By: LEFF, ALAN (Plaintiff); Smith, Alonzo (Plaintiff); Kamins, Andrew S (Plaintiff); Hoffman, Arthea (Plaintiff); Coit, Avery (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Stay of Proceedings - Case filed by LEFF, ALAN; Smith, Alonzo; Kamins, Andrew S; Hoffman, Arthea; Coit, Avery; Champion, Billy; Teasett, Bridget; Miller, Carolyn; Nosal, Charles; Edwards-El, Cherrell;OTHERS. Filed By: LEFF, ALAN (Plaintiff); Smith, Alonzo (Plaintiff); Kamins, Andrew S (Plaintiff); Hoffman, Arthea (Plaintiff); Coit, Avery (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by LEFF, ALAN; Smith, Alonzo; Kamins, Andrew S; Hoffman, Arthea; Coit, Avery; Champion, Billy; Teasett, Bridget; Miller, Carolyn; Nosal, Charles; Edwards-El, Cherrell;OTHERS. Filed By: LEFF, ALAN (Plaintiff); Smith, Alonzo (Plaintiff); Kamins, Andrew S (Plaintiff); Hoffman, Arthea (Plaintiff); Coit, Avery (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed by LEFF, ALAN; Smith, Alonzo; Kamins, Andrew S; Hoffman, Arthea; Coit, Avery; Champion, Billy; Teasett, Bridget; Miller, Carolyn; Nosal, Charles; Edwards-El, Cherrell;OTHERS. Refers to: Gilead Sciences Inc Filed By: LEFF, ALAN (Plaintiff); Smith, Alonzo (Plaintiff); Kamins, Andrew S (Plaintiff); Hoffman, Arthea (Plaintiff); Coit, Avery (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 05/27/2022 at 10:30:00 AM at Central in C-67 Eddie C Sturgeon.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Robles, Trudy Lyn Rojas; Adams, Nathan T; Smith, Alonzo; Hoffman, Arthea; Burger, Jackie; Eakin, William; Edwards-El, Cherrell; Godwin, Shonda L; Johnson, Kelvin; Johnson, Melissa;OTHERS. Refers to: Gilead Sciences Inc Filed By: Robles, Trudy Lyn Rojas (Plaintiff); Adams, Nathan T (Plaintiff); Smith, Alonzo (Plaintiff); Hoffman, Arthea (Plaintiff); Burger, Jackie (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Robles, Trudy Lyn Rojas; Adams, Nathan T; Smith, Alonzo; Hoffman, Arthea; Burger, Jackie; Eakin, William; Edwards-El, Cherrell; Godwin, Shonda L; Johnson, Kelvin; Johnson, Melissa;OTHERS. Refers to: Gilead Sciences Inc Filed By: Robles, Trudy Lyn Rojas (Plaintiff); Adams, Nathan T (Plaintiff); Smith, Alonzo (Plaintiff); Hoffman, Arthea (Plaintiff); Burger, Jackie (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Robles, Trudy Lyn Rojas; Adams, Nathan T; Smith, Alonzo; Hoffman, Arthea; Burger, Jackie; Eakin, William; Edwards-El, Cherrell; Godwin, Shonda L; Johnson, Kelvin; Johnson, Melissa;OTHERS. Refers to: Gilead Sciences Inc Filed By: Robles, Trudy Lyn Rojas (Plaintiff); Adams, Nathan T (Plaintiff); Smith, Alonzo (Plaintiff); Hoffman, Arthea (Plaintiff); Burger, Jackie (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Sturgeon, Eddie.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Gilead Sciences, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GRAHAM, M. ELIZABETH