This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 04/14/2018 at 01:10:32 (UTC).

ROBERTSONS READY MIX LTD vs CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION

Case Summary

On 03/14/2016 ROBERTSONS READY MIX LTD filed an Other lawsuit against CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RICHARD E. L. STRAUSS. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    03/14/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

RICHARD E. L. STRAUSS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROBERTSONS READY MIX LTD

Defendants

COOPER, DENISE K

COOPER ENGINEERING INC

L B CIVIL CONSTRUCTION INCORPORATED

THE GUARANTEE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA USA

CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ENCARNACION, MERVYN Y

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF MERVYN Y ENCARNACION

200 S Main St #200

Corona, CA 92882

 

Court Documents

Complaint

Complaint filed by Robertsons Ready Mix LTD. Refers to: California Department Of Transportation; The Guarantee Company of North America USA; COOPER ENGINEERING INC; L B CIVIL CONSTRUCTION INCORPORATED; COOPER, DENISE

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Robertsons Ready Mix LTD. Refers to: California Department Of Transportation; The Guarantee Company of North America USA; COOPER ENGINEERING INC; L B CIVIL CONSTRUCTION INCORPORATED; COOPER, DENISE

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Robertsons Ready Mix LTD. Refers to: California Department Of Transportation; The Guarantee Company of North America USA; COOPER ENGINEERING INC; L B CIVIL CONSTRUCTION INCORPORATED; COOPER, DENISE

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice - Other

Notice - Other (commencement of proceeding) filed by Robertsons Ready Mix LTD.

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Robertsons Ready Mix LTD.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/19/2016
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 09/16/2016 at 10:30:00 AM at Central in C-75 Richard E. L. Strauss was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2016
  • Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Robertsons Ready Mix LTD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2016
  • Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to COOPER, DENISE K .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2016
  • Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to L B CIVIL CONSTRUCTION INCORPORATED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2016
  • Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to COOPER ENGINEERING INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2016
  • Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to The Guarantee Company of North America USA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2016
  • Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to California Department Of Transportation.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Robertsons Ready Mix LTD. Filed By: Robertsons Ready Mix LTD (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice - Other (commencement of proceeding) filed by Robertsons Ready Mix LTD. Filed By: Robertsons Ready Mix LTD (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 09/16/2016 at 10:30:00 AM at Central in C-75 Richard E. L. Strauss.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2016
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Strauss, Richard.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Summons filed by Robertsons Ready Mix LTD. Refers to: California Department Of Transportation; The Guarantee Company of North America USA; COOPER ENGINEERING INC; L B CIVIL CONSTRUCTION INCORPORATED; COOPER, DENISE Filed By: Robertsons Ready Mix LTD (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Robertsons Ready Mix LTD. Refers to: California Department Of Transportation; The Guarantee Company of North America USA; COOPER ENGINEERING INC; L B CIVIL CONSTRUCTION INCORPORATED; COOPER, DENISE Filed By: Robertsons Ready Mix LTD (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed by Robertsons Ready Mix LTD. Refers to: California Department Of Transportation; The Guarantee Company of North America USA; COOPER ENGINEERING INC; L B CIVIL CONSTRUCTION INCORPORATED; COOPER, DENISE Filed By: Robertsons Ready Mix LTD (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COOPER ENGINEERING INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where LB CIVIL CONSTRUCTION INCORPORATED is a litigant

Latest cases where The Guarantee Company of North America USA is a litigant

Latest cases where ROBERTSON'S READY MIX INC. A CORPORATION is a litigant