Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 02/17/2021 at 05:02:42 (UTC).

Robert Michael D'Amico vs. Michelle Lee

Case Summary

On 02/10/2020 Robert Michael D'Amico filed a Family - Harassment lawsuit against Michelle Lee. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, East County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************R-EC

  • Filing Date:

    02/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Harassment

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    East County Regional Center

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

D'Amico, Robert Michael

Respondent

Lee, Michelle

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/14/2020
  • DocketCourt ordered the Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders (Civil Harassment Prevention) dismissed without prejudice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order dissolved.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Hearing on Restraining Order heard 07/14/2020 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketHearing on Restraining Order scheduled for 07/14/2020 at 08:30:00 AM at East County in E-21 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • DocketOrder on Request to Continue Hearing filed by D'Amico, Robert Michael. Refers to: Lee, Michelle Filed By: D'Amico, Robert Michael (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • DocketHearing on Restraining Order scheduled for 07/14/2020 at 08:30AM in Department E-21.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Hearing on Restraining Order heard 04/15/2020 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • DocketHearing on Restraining Order scheduled for 04/15/2020 at 08:30AM in Department E-21.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Hearing on Restraining Order heard 03/25/2020 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • DocketOrder on Request to Continue Hearing filed by D'Amico, Robert Michael. Refers to: Lee, Michelle Filed By: D'Amico, Robert Michael (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketPetitioner's request to continue the Hearing on Restraining Order and reissue the temporary orders was granted. The Hearing on Restraining Order was continued to 03/25/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department E-21.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Hearing on Restraining Order heard 03/03/2020 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketOrder on Request to Continue Hearing filed by D'Amico, Robert Michael. Refers to: Lee, Michelle Filed By: D'Amico, Robert Michael (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketRequest for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders (Civil Harassment Prevention) filed by D'Amico, Robert Michael. Refers to: Lee, Michelle Filed By: D'Amico, Robert Michael (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Department E-21.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketNotice of Court Hearing filed by D'Amico, Robert Michael. Refers to: Lee, Michelle Filed By: D'Amico, Robert Michael (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketHearing on Restraining Order scheduled for 03/03/2020 at 08:30:00 AM at East County in E-21 .

    Read MoreRead Less