This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 05/24/2019 at 02:15:27 (UTC).

Road Runner Collections Service Inc vs. Healthsouth Corporation

Case Summary

On 08/24/2007 Road Runner Collections Service Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Healthsouth Corporation. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Ronald S. Prager. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2007

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Ronald S. Prager

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Road Runner Collections Service Inc

Defendants

Greater Long Beach Endoscopy Center

Orange Surgical Services LTD

Glenwood Surigical Center L P; DBA : Healthsouth Glenwood Surgery Center

Saddleback Valley Outpatient Surgery

Antelope Valley Surgery Center L P; DBA : Healthsouth Antelope Valley Surgery Center

La Veta Surgical Center

San Diego Endoscopy Center Inc; DBA : San Diego Endoscopy

Castro Valley Surgery Center Inc

Healthsouth Rancho Bernardo Surgery Center; DBA : Healthsouth Rancho Bernardo Surgery Center

Heathsouth S C of Huntington Beach Inc

Grossmont Surgery Center LTD

Surgery Center of Santa Monica LTD; DBA : Surgery Center of Santa Monica an Affiliate of Healthsouth

Arcadia Outpatient Surgery Center L P; DBA : Healthsouth Arcadia Outpatient Surgery Center

Diagnostic Health Corporation; DBA : Healthsouth Diagnostic Center of La Jolla

Newport Beach Orange Coast Endoscopy; DBA : Newport Beach Endoscopy

Upland Outpatient Surgical Center L P

San Diego Outpatient Surgical Center Inc

Blackhawk Surgery Center L P

Arthoscopic & Laser Surgery Center of San Diego L P; DBA : Oasis/Heathsouth Surgery Center

14 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Smylie, Scott A

Defendant Attorney

Miller, William A

 

Court Documents

Case File Contents as of 12/19/16 - volume 1 of 1

Case File Contents as of 12/19/16 - volume 1 of 1

Minute Order

Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 08/08/2008 01:15:00 PM.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 08/08/2008 01:15:00 PM.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

The Civil Case Management Conference was rescheduled to 08/08/2008 at 01:15:00 PM in C-71 before Ronald S. Prager at Central.

Notice of Hearing SD

Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 08/01/2008 at 01:15:00 PM at Central in C-71 Ronald S. Prager.

 

Docket Entries

01/02/2017
View Court Documents

DocketCase File Contents as of 12/19/16 - volume 1 of 1

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/23/2008

DocketRequest for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Healthsouth Corporation. Filed By: Healthsouth Corporation (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/17/2008

DocketTrial Readiness Conference (Civil) scheduled for 01/09/2009 at 09:30:00 AM at Central in C-71 Ronald S. Prager was vacated.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/17/2008

DocketCivil Jury Trial scheduled for 02/06/2009 at 08:45:00 AM at Central in C-71 Ronald S. Prager was vacated.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/17/2008
View Court Documents

DocketMiscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/12/2008
View Court Documents

DocketMinutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 08/08/2008 01:15:00 PM.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/12/2008
View Court Documents

DocketMinutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 08/08/2008 01:15:00 PM.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/12/2008

DocketThe Civil Jury Trial is scheduled for 02/06/2009 at 08:45 AM before C-71.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/12/2008

DocketJury demanded by Both.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/12/2008

DocketThe Trial Readiness Conference (Civil) is scheduled for 01/09/2009 at 09:30 AM before Ronald S. Prager.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
07/08/2008

DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 08/08/2008 at 01:15:00 PM at Central in C-71 Ronald S. Prager.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/08/2008
View Court Documents

DocketThe Civil Case Management Conference was rescheduled to 08/08/2008 at 01:15:00 PM in C-71 before Ronald S. Prager at Central.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/19/2008
View Court Documents

DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 08/01/2008 at 01:15:00 PM at Central in C-71 Ronald S. Prager.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/28/2008

DocketAnswer filed by Antelope Valley Surgery Center L P; Arcadia Outpatient Surgery Center L P; Arthoscopic & Laser Surgery Center of San Diego L P; Blackhawk Surgery Center L P; Castro Valley Surgery Center Inc; Diagnostic Health Corporation; Doctors Surgery Center of Whittier L P; Forest Ambulatory Surgical Associates L P; Fort Sutter Surgery Center; Frost Street Outpatient Surgical Associates L P; Glenwood Surigical Center L P; Golden Triangle Surgicenter L P; Greater Long Beach Endoscopy Center; Grossmont Surgery Center LTD; Healthsouth Corporation; Heathsouth S C of Huntington Beach Inc; Inland Surgery Center L P; Kerlan-Jobe Surgery Center LLC; La Veta Surgical Center; Newport Beach Orange Coast Endoscopy; North Coast Surgery Center LTD; Orange Surgical Services LTD; Saddleback Valley Outpatient Surgery; San Diego Endoscopy Center Inc; San Diego Outpatient Surgical Center Inc; South Bay Surgery Center; Surgery Center of Santa Monica LTD; Sutter Alhambra Surgery Center L P; T..... Refers to: Road Runner Collections Service Inc Filed By: Antelope Valley Surgery Center L P (Defendant); Arcadia Outpatient Surgery Center L P (Defendant); Arthoscopic & Laser Surgery Center of San Diego L P (Defendant); Blackhawk Surgery Center L P (Defendant); Castro Valley Surgery Center Inc (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/03/2007

DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed by Road Runner Collections Service Inc. Refers to: Antelope Valley Surgery Center L P; Arcadia Outpatient Surgery Center L P; Arthoscopic & Laser Surgery Center of San Diego L P; Blackhawk Surgery Center L P; Castro Valley Surgery Center Inc; Diagnostic Health Corporation; Doctors Surgery Center of Whittier L P; Forest Ambulatory Surgical Associates L P; Fort Sutter Surgery Center; Frost Street Outpatient Surgical Associates L P; Glenwood Surigical Center L P; Golden Triangle Surgicenter L P; Greater Long Beach Endoscopy Center; Grossmont Surgery Center LTD; Healthsouth Corporation; Healthsouth Rancho Bernardo Surgery Center; Heathsouth S C of Huntington Beach Inc; Heathsouth UTC Surgicenter; Inland Surgery Center L P; Kerlan-Jobe Surgery Center LLC; La Veta Surgical Center; Newport Beach Orange Coast Endoscopy; North Coast Surgery Center LTD; Orange Surgical Services LTD; Saddleback Valley Outpatient Surgery; San Diego Endoscopy Center Inc; San Diego Outpatient Surgical Center Inc; South Bay Surgery Center; Surgery Center of Santa Monica LTD; Sutter Alhambra Surgery Center L P; Tri-Valley Surgery Center L P; Upland Outpatient Surgical Center L P; Walnut Creek Ambulatory Surgery Center Filed By: Road Runner Collections Service Inc (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/28/2007

DocketCertificate of Progress: Inability to Default (granted until 1/28/08) filed by Road Runner Collections Service Inc. Filed By: Road Runner Collections Service Inc (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/03/2007

DocketCertificate of Service filed by Road Runner Collections Service Inc. Filed By: Road Runner Collections Service Inc (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/05/2007

DocketCertificate of Progress: Inability to Serve (granted until 12/5/07) filed by Road Runner Collections Service Inc on 11/05/2007. Filed By: Road Runner Collections Service Inc (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/24/2007

DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Prager, Ronald.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/24/2007

DocketComplaint filed by Road Runner Collections Service Inc on 08/24/2007. Refers to: Healthsouth Corporation; Antelope Valley Surgery Center L P; Arcadia Outpatient Surgery Center L P; Greater Long Beach Endoscopy Center; Kerlan-Jobe Surgery Center LLC; Golden Triangle Surgicenter L P; La Veta Surgical Center; Inland Surgery Center L P; Glenwood Surigical Center L P; Heathsouth UTC Surgicenter; Diagnostic Health Corporation; Arthoscopic & Laser Surgery Center of San Diego L P; San Diego Endoscopy Center Inc; Surgery Center of Santa Monica LTD; Newport Beach Orange Coast Endoscopy; Healthsouth Rancho Bernardo Surgery Center; Grossmont Surgery Center LTD; Heathsouth S C of Huntington Beach Inc; Walnut Creek Ambulatory Surgery Center; Doctors Surgery Center of Whittier L P; Frost Street Outpatient Surgical Associates L P; Blackhawk Surgery Center L P; Castro Valley Surgery Center Inc; Forest Ambulatory Surgical Associates L P; Fort Sutter Surgery Center; North Coast Surgery Center LTD; Orange Surgical Services LTD; Tri-Valley Surgery Center L P; Upland Outpatient Surgical Center L P; Sutter Alhambra Surgery Center L P; Saddleback Valley Outpatient Surgery; San Diego Outpatient Surgical Center Inc; South Bay Surgery Center Filed By: Road Runner Collections Service Inc (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less