Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 05/14/2020 at 08:11:40 (UTC).

RKR DLFY LP vs Otay Logistics Inc

Case Summary

On 01/15/2020 RKR DLFY LP filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against Otay Logistics Inc. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    01/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RKR DLFY LP

Defendants

Otay Logistics Inc

Kelly, Roberto

Aceves-Hernandez, Angel

Godin, Barbara A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Alter, Richard C

 

Court Documents

Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000

Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 filed by RKR DLFY LP. Refers to: Otay Logistics Inc; Aceves-Hernandez, Angel; Godin, Barbara; Kelly, Roberto

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by RKR DLFY LP. Refers to: Otay Logistics Inc; Aceves-Hernandez, Angel; Godin, Barbara; Kelly, Roberto

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by RKR DLFY LP. Refers to: Otay Logistics Inc; Aceves-Hernandez, Angel; Godin, Barbara; Kelly, Roberto

Notice that you have been sued SD

Case initiation form printed.

Proof of Service of 5-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute

Proof of Service of 5-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by RKR DLFY LP. Refers to: Otay Logistics Inc

Proof of Service of 5-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute

Proof of Service of 5-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by RKR DLFY LP. Refers to: Godin, Barbara

Proof of Service of 5-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute

Proof of Service of 5-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by RKR DLFY LP. Refers to: Kelly, Roberto

Proof of Service of Summons & Complaint - Unnamed Occupants

Proof of Service of Summons & Complaint - Unnamed Occupants filed by RKR DLFY LP.

Proof of Service of 5-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute

Proof of Service of 5-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by RKR DLFY LP. Refers to: Aceves-Hernandez, Angel

Request for Entry of Default

Request for Entry of Default (and Unknowns) filed by RKR DLFY LP. Refers to: Aceves-Hernandez, Angel; Godin, Barbara; Kelly, Roberto; Otay Logistics Inc

Judgment by Default by Clerk for Possession Only

Judgment by Default by Clerk for Possession Only (and Unknowns) filed by RKR DLFY LP. Refers to: Aceves-Hernandez, Angel; Godin, Barbara; Kelly, Roberto; Otay Logistics Inc

Writ of Possession issued.

Writ of Possession issued.

Application for Entry of Judgment

Application for Entry of Judgment (with Supporting Declarations and Dismissal of DOES 1 - X) filed by RKR DLFY LP. Refers to: Aceves-Hernandez, Angel; Godin, Barbara; Godin, Barbara; Kelly, Roberto

Notice to Filing Party SD

Judgment by Default by Court (Received March 04, 2020) submitted by RKR DLFY LP rejected on 03/11/2020. Refers to: Aceves-Hernandez, Angel; Godin, Barbara; Kelly, Roberto; Otay Logistics Inc

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Court (Received March 04, 2020) submitted by RKR DLFY LP rejected on 03/11/2020. Refers to: Aceves-Hernandez, Angel; Godin, Barbara; Kelly, Roberto; Otay Logistics Inc Filed By: RKR DLFY LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication for Entry of Judgment (with Supporting Declarations and Dismissal of DOES 1 - X) filed by RKR DLFY LP. Refers to: Aceves-Hernandez, Angel; Godin, Barbara; Godin, Barbara; Kelly, Roberto Filed By: RKR DLFY LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Clerk for Possession Only (and Unknowns) filed by RKR DLFY LP. Refers to: Aceves-Hernandez, Angel; Godin, Barbara; Kelly, Roberto; Otay Logistics Inc Filed By: RKR DLFY LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketJudgment entered for RKR DLFY LP and against Aceves-Hernandez, Angel ;Godin, Barbara A ;Kelly, Roberto ;Otay Logistics Inc for a grand total of $ 0.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Possession issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 5-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by RKR DLFY LP. Refers to: Otay Logistics Inc Filed By: RKR DLFY LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 5-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by RKR DLFY LP. Refers to: Godin, Barbara Filed By: RKR DLFY LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 5-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by RKR DLFY LP. Refers to: Kelly, Roberto Filed By: RKR DLFY LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons & Complaint - Unnamed Occupants filed by RKR DLFY LP. Filed By: RKR DLFY LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 5-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by RKR DLFY LP. Refers to: Aceves-Hernandez, Angel Filed By: RKR DLFY LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketDefault entered as to Godin, Barbara A on Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 filed by RKR DLFY LP .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketDefault entered as to Kelly, Roberto on Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 filed by RKR DLFY LP .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketDefault entered as to Otay Logistics Inc on Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 filed by RKR DLFY LP .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketDefault entered as to Aceves-Hernandez, Angel on Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 filed by RKR DLFY LP .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 filed by RKR DLFY LP. Refers to: Otay Logistics Inc; Aceves-Hernandez, Angel; Godin, Barbara; Kelly, Roberto Filed By: RKR DLFY LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by RKR DLFY LP. Refers to: Otay Logistics Inc; Aceves-Hernandez, Angel; Godin, Barbara; Kelly, Roberto Filed By: RKR DLFY LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by RKR DLFY LP. Refers to: Otay Logistics Inc; Aceves-Hernandez, Angel; Godin, Barbara; Kelly, Roberto Filed By: RKR DLFY LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Department C-60.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less