Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 06/09/2020 at 12:39:04 (UTC).

Rivera vs Morales

Case Summary

On 02/19/2019 Rivera filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Morales. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard E. L. Strauss. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    02/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Richard E. L. Strauss

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rivera, Dawn

Defendants

Fastenal Company

Morales, Jose Paulo

Schenk, Michael

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Mason, Brian R

Attorney at JUREWITZ LAW GROUP

600 B Street 1550

San Diego, CA 92101

Jurewitz, Ross A

Attorney at JUREWITZ LAW GROUP

Defendant Attorneys

Elliott, Kelly R

9325 Sky Park Court 230

San Diego, CA 92123

Volk, Amy E

Attorney at DIEDERICH & ASSOCIATES

Simms, Ryan J

Attorney at DIEDERICH & ASSOCIATES

 

Court Documents

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

Civil Jury Trial rescheduled to 11/13/2020 at 08:50:00 AM in C-75 before Richard E. L. Strauss at Central.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

Trial Readiness Conference (Civil) rescheduled to 10/30/2020 at 08:55:00 AM in C-75 before Richard E. L. Strauss at Central.

Notice of Change of Handling Attorney and Change of Address

Notice of Change in Handling Attorney filed by Fastenal Company; Schenk, Michael.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 11/01/2019 10:15:00 AM.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 10/25/2019 10:00:00 AM.

Notice of Change in Handling Attorney

Notice of Change in Handling Attorney filed by Rivera, Dawn.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Fastenal Company; Schenk, Michael.

Notice of Change in Handling Attorney

Notice of Change in Handling Attorney filed by Fastenal Company; Schenk, Michael.

Answer to Complaint

Answer filed by Fastenal Company; Schenk, Michael.

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Fastenal Company; Schenk, Michael.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Rivera, Dawn. Refers to: Schenk, Michael

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Rivera, Dawn.

Complaint

Complaint filed by Rivera, Dawn. Refers to: Morales, Jose; Schenk, Michael; Fastenal Company

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Rivera, Dawn. Refers to: Morales, Jose; Schenk, Michael; Fastenal Company

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Rivera, Dawn. Refers to: Morales, Jose; Schenk, Michael; Fastenal Company

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/13/2020
  • HearingLocation: C-75; Event Type: Civil Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • HearingLocation: C-75; Event Type: Trial Readiness Conference (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Jury Trial rescheduled to 11/13/2020 at 08:50:00 AM in C-75 before Richard E. L. Strauss at Central.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTrial Readiness Conference (Civil) rescheduled to 10/30/2020 at 08:55:00 AM in C-75 before Richard E. L. Strauss at Central.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Change in Handling Attorney filed by Fastenal Company; Schenk, Michael. Filed By: Fastenal Company (Defendant); Schenk, Michael (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • DocketPursuant to California Rules of Court 3.714, the Court, after having met and conferred with counsel, categorizes this case as one that will be disposed of within 18 months

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • DocketTrial Readiness Conference (Civil) scheduled for 05/01/2020 at 08:55AM before Judge Richard E. L. Strauss.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • DocketCivil Jury Trial scheduled for 05/15/2020 at 08:50AM before Judge Richard E. L. Strauss.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • DocketJury demanded by Defendants.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • DocketThis matter is referred to Mediation per stipulation of the parties.

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Fastenal Company; Schenk, Michael. Filed By: Fastenal Company (Defendant); Schenk, Michael (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Rivera, Dawn. Refers to: Schenk, Michael Filed By: Rivera, Dawn (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Rivera, Dawn. Filed By: Rivera, Dawn (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Rivera, Dawn. Refers to: Morales, Jose; Schenk, Michael; Fastenal Company Filed By: Rivera, Dawn (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Rivera, Dawn. Refers to: Morales, Jose; Schenk, Michael; Fastenal Company Filed By: Rivera, Dawn (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Rivera, Dawn. Refers to: Morales, Jose; Schenk, Michael; Fastenal Company Filed By: Rivera, Dawn (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Strauss, Richard.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 10/25/2019 at 10:00:00 AM at Central in C-75 Richard E. L. Strauss.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FASTENAL COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MASON BRIAN R ESQ.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JUREWITZ ROSS