This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 03/27/2018 at 18:05:22 (UTC).

Rios vs. Icon Health & Fitness Inc

Case Summary

On 12/27/2012 Rios filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Icon Health Fitness Inc. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JOEL M. PRESSMAN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    12/27/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

JOEL M. PRESSMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rios, Maria

Defendants

HOME SHOPPING NETWORK INC

HSN Interactive LLC

HSN LP

IAC/Interactivecorp

Icon Health & Fitness Inc

HSNI LLC; ESA : IAC/INTERACTIVECORP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kroger-Diamond, Catharine E

Attorney at CATHARINE KROGER DIAMOND APC

7220 Avenida Encinas 203

Carlsbad, CA 92011

Defendant Attorney

SMITH, STEPHEN HENRY

Attorney at YOKA & SMITH LLP

445 S Figueroa Street 38Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party filed by Rios, Maria.

Complaint

Complaint filed by Rios, Maria. Refers to: ICON Health & Fitness Inc; HOME SHOPPING NETWORK INC; HSN LP; HSN Interactive LLC; HSNi LLC

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Rios, Maria. Refers to: ICON Health & Fitness Inc; HOME SHOPPING NETWORK INC; HSN LP; HSN Interactive LLC; HSNi LLC

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Rios, Maria. Refers to: ICON Health & Fitness Inc; HOME SHOPPING NETWORK INC; HSN LP; HSN Interactive LLC; HSNi LLC

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (ICON HEALTH & FITNESS INC) filed by Rios, Maria. Refers to: ICON Health & Fitness Inc

Answer

Answer filed by HSNi LLC.

Answer

Answer filed by ICON Health & Fitness Inc.

Amended Complaint

Amended Complaint filed by Rios, Maria. Refers to: ICON Health & Fitness Inc; HOME SHOPPING NETWORK INC; HSN LP; HSN Interactive LLC; HSNi LLC

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by IAC/Interactivecorp. Refers to: Rios, Maria

Answer

Answer filed by HSNi LLC.

Answer

Answer filed by ICON Health & Fitness Inc.

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Rios, Maria. Refers to: ICON Health & Fitness Inc; HOME SHOPPING NETWORK INC; HSN LP; HSN Interactive LLC; IAC/Interactivecorp

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2013
  • Amended Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Rios, Maria .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2013
  • Amended Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to ICON Health & Fitness Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2013
  • Amended Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to HSNi LLC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2013
  • Amended Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to HSN LP.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2013
  • Amended Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to HSN Interactive LLC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2013
  • Amended Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to HOME SHOPPING NETWORK INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Rios, Maria. Refers to: ICON Health & Fitness Inc; HOME SHOPPING NETWORK INC; HSN LP; HSN Interactive LLC; IAC/Interactivecorp Filed By: Rios, Maria (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer filed by ICON Health & Fitness Inc. Filed By: ICON Health & Fitness Inc (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer filed by HSNi LLC. Filed By: HSNi LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by IAC/Interactivecorp. Refers to: Rios, Maria Filed By: HSNi LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 04/03/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Amended Complaint filed by Rios, Maria. Refers to: ICON Health & Fitness Inc; HOME SHOPPING NETWORK INC; HSN LP; HSN Interactive LLC; HSNi LLC Filed By: Rios, Maria (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer filed by ICON Health & Fitness Inc. Filed By: ICON Health & Fitness Inc (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer filed by HSNi LLC. Filed By: HSNi LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (ICON HEALTH & FITNESS INC) filed by Rios, Maria. Refers to: ICON Health & Fitness Inc Filed By: Rios, Maria (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2012
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Pressman, Joel.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2012
  • Summons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Rios, Maria. Refers to: ICON Health & Fitness Inc; HOME SHOPPING NETWORK INC; HSN LP; HSN Interactive LLC; HSNi LLC Filed By: Rios, Maria (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Summons filed by Rios, Maria. Refers to: ICON Health & Fitness Inc; HOME SHOPPING NETWORK INC; HSN LP; HSN Interactive LLC; HSNi LLC Filed By: Rios, Maria (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed by Rios, Maria. Refers to: ICON Health & Fitness Inc; HOME SHOPPING NETWORK INC; HSN LP; HSN Interactive LLC; HSNi LLC Filed By: Rios, Maria (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less