This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 12/22/2021 at 04:00:26 (UTC).

Richardson vs Robinhood Financial LLC

Case Summary

On 11/24/2021 Richardson filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Robinhood Financial LLC. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The case status is Pending - Trial.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Trial

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Richardson, Brett

Cheyenne, WY 82009

Defendant

Robinhood Financial LLC

 

Court Documents

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated.

Notice of Case Assignment Small Claims SD

Notice of Case Assignment Small Claims SD generated.

Notice of Hearing SD

Notice of Hearing SD generated.

Order on Court Fee Waiver

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Granted in Whole) filed by Richardson, Brett.

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court filed by Richardson, Brett. Refers to: Robinhood Financial LLC

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/14/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-63; Event Type: Small Claims Court Trial - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial scheduled for 03/14/2022 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-63 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing SD generated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment Small Claims SD generated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Granted in Whole) filed by Richardson, Brett. Filed By: Richardson, Brett (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court filed by Richardson, Brett. Refers to: Robinhood Financial LLC Filed By: Richardson, Brett (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Department C-63.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees filed by Richardson, Brett. Filed By: Richardson, Brett (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Robinhood Financial LLC is a litigant