This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 06/20/2021 at 08:22:02 (UTC).

Richards vs The Regents of the University of California

Case Summary

On 03/22/2021 Richards filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against The Regents of the University of California. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Eddie C Sturgeon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Eddie C Sturgeon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Richards, Irene

Defendants

The Regents of the University of California

University of California San Diego Health

Ball, Catherine

Farrell, Lara

Meier, Terri

Robertson, Shelly

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Campbell, Michael John

Attorney at CAMPBELL LAW APC

 

Court Documents

Notice of Confirmation of Filing SD

E-filing transaction partially accepted.

Complaint

[Another document for ROA# 6]

Civil Case Cover Sheet

[Another document for ROA# 6]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 5]

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 5]

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Richards, Irene. Refers to: The Regents of the University of California; University of California San Diego Health

Complaint

Complaint filed by Richards, Irene. Refers to: The Regents of the University of California; University of California San Diego Health

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Richards, Irene. Refers to: The Regents of the University of California; University of California San Diego Health

First Amended Complaint

Amended Complaint (First) filed by Richards, Irene. Refers to: Ball, Catherine; Farrell, Lara; Meier, Terri; The Regents of the University of California; University of California San Diego Health; Robertson, Shelly

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-67; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • HearingLocation: C-67; Event Type: Motion Hearing (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • HearingLocation: C-67; Event Type: Demurrer / Motion to Strike

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Complaint (First) filed by Richards, Irene. Refers to: Ball, Catherine; Farrell, Lara; Meier, Terri; The Regents of the University of California; University of California San Diego Health; Robertson, Shelly Filed By: Richards, Irene (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketDemurrer / Motion to Strike scheduled for 12/10/2021 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in C-67 Eddie C Sturgeon.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketMotion Hearing (Civil) scheduled for 12/10/2021 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in C-67 Eddie C Sturgeon.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Richards, Irene. Refers to: The Regents of the University of California; University of California San Diego Health Filed By: Richards, Irene (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 02/11/2022 at 10:30:00 AM at Central in C-67 Eddie C Sturgeon.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 6]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 6]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-filing transaction partially accepted.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Richards, Irene. Refers to: The Regents of the University of California; University of California San Diego Health Filed By: Richards, Irene (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Richards, Irene. Refers to: The Regents of the University of California; University of California San Diego Health Filed By: Richards, Irene (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Sturgeon, Eddie.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA BOARD OF REGENTS is a litigant

Latest cases where THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA A PUBLIC ENTITY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CAMPBELL MICHAEL J.