This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 05/04/2019 at 04:35:24 (UTC).

Richard Mark Anderson vs. Phillip Staples

Case Summary

On 07/06/2009 Richard Mark Anderson filed a Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation lawsuit against Phillip Staples. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego East County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is EDDIE C STURGEON. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************F-EC

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

EDDIE C STURGEON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Appellant

ANDERSON, RICHARD MARK

Respondents and Defendants

MCGRAW HILL BROADCASTING CO INC

VARA, JULIETTE

COUNTY OF SAN DIEGO

ELIAS, PAMELA

STAPLES, PHILLIP

TRENT, BARBARA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Appellant Attorney

BAIN, RICHARD G

275 East Douglas Ave Ste 113

El Cajon, CA 92020-4548

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

CUMMINS, GUYLYN R

501 West Broadway 19Th Floor

San Diego, CA 92101-3598

CHAPIN, JAMES M

1600 Pacific Highway 355

San Diego, CA 92101

GANADJIAN, NANCY

4027 Jackdaw St

San Diego, CA 92103

 

Court Documents

Notice to Filing Party SD

Abstract of Judgment submitted by McGraw Hill Broadcasting Co Inc; Vara, Juliette; Staples, Phillip; Trent, Barbara rejected on 08/15/2011. Refers to: Anderson, Richard

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Multiple Events heard 03/11/2011 09:00:00 AM.

Notice to Filing Party SD

Abstract of Judgment submitted by McGraw Hill Broadcasting Co Inc; Vara, Juliette; Staples, Phillip; Trent, Barbara rejected on 05/14/2010. Refers to: Anderson, Richard

Notice to Filing Party SD

Memorandum of Costs (Summary) (and (Worksheet); Proof Of Service (originally filed Dec. 2009)) submitted by McGraw Hill Broadcasting Co Inc; Vara, Juliette rejected on 01/13/2010.

Notice of Filing SD

Notice of Appeal filed by Anderson, Richard Mark. Refers to: County of San Diego; Elias, Pamela; McGraw Hill Broadcasting Co Inc; Vara, Juliette; Staples, Phillip; Trent, Barbara

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 02/05/2010 09:00:00 AM.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 01/21/2010 09:00:00 AM.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 01/15/2010 09:00:00 AM.

Notice to Filing Party SD

Memorandum of Costs (Summary) (; Proof of Service) submitted by McGraw Hill Broadcasting Co Inc; Vara, Juliette rejected on 12/11/2009.

Minute Order

Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 11/20/2009 09:00:00 AM.

Notice of Hearing SD

Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 12/18/2009 at 10:30:00 AM at East County in E-14 Eddie C Sturgeon.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 10/23/2009 09:00:00 AM.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 10/15/2009 08:30:00 AM.

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/24/2011
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment submitted by McGraw Hill Broadcasting Co Inc; Vara, Juliette; Staples, Phillip; Trent, Barbara rejected on 08/15/2011. Refers to: Anderson, Richard Filed By: McGraw Hill Broadcasting Co Inc (Defendant); Vara, Juliette (Defendant); Staples, Phillip (Defendant); Trent, Barbara (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2011
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Multiple Events heard 03/11/2011 09:00:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2011
  • DocketCase file location changed to East County Courthouse E-Civil/Small Claims Business Office

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2011
  • DocketTentative Ruling for Motion Hearing (Civil) published.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2011
  • DocketTentative Ruling for Motion Hearing (Civil) published.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2011
  • DocketReply to Opposition of Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations filed by McGraw Hill Broadcasting Co Inc. Filed By: McGraw Hill Broadcasting Co Inc (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2011
  • DocketOpposition - Other (TO THE FEE REQUESTS OF THE COUNTY AND MCGRAW HILL) filed by Anderson, Richard Mark. Refers to: Staples, Phillip; Trent, Barbara; Vara, Juliette; McGraw Hill Broadcasting Co Inc; Elias, Pamela; County of San Diego Filed By: Anderson, Richard Mark (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
79 More Docket Entries
  • 09/23/2009
  • DocketMotion Hearing (Civil) scheduled for 11/20/2009 at 09:00:00 AM at East County in E-14 Eddie C Sturgeon.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2009
  • DocketMotion Hearing (Civil) scheduled for 10/23/2009 at 09:00:00 AM at East County in E-14 Eddie C Sturgeon.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2009
  • DocketThe Motion Hearing (Civil) was rescheduled to 10/23/2009 at 09:00:00 AM in E-14 before Eddie C Sturgeon at East County.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2009
  • DocketMotion Hearing (Civil) scheduled for 10/30/2009 at 09:00:00 AM at East County in E-14 Eddie C Sturgeon.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2009
  • DocketCertificate of Service filed by Anderson, Richard Mark. Refers to: Staples, Phillip Filed By: Anderson, Richard Mark (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2009
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Sturgeon, Eddie.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2009
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Anderson, Richard Mark. Refers to: Staples, Phillip; Trent, Barbara; Vara, Juliette; McGraw Hill Broadcasting Co Inc; Elias, Pamela; County of San Diego Filed By: Anderson, Richard Mark (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2009
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Anderson, Richard Mark. Refers to: Staples, Phillip; Trent, Barbara; Vara, Juliette; McGraw Hill Broadcasting Co Inc; Elias, Pamela; County of San Diego Filed By: Anderson, Richard Mark (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2009
  • DocketComplaint filed by Anderson, Richard Mark. Refers to: Staples, Phillip; Trent, Barbara; Vara, Juliette; McGraw Hill Broadcasting Co Inc; Elias, Pamela; County of San Diego Filed By: Anderson, Richard Mark (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2009
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less