This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 08/17/2020 at 04:56:06 (UTC).

Reynoso vs Veterans Advantage Enterprises LLC

Case Summary

On 11/19/2018 Reynoso filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Veterans Advantage Enterprises LLC. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JOHN S. MEYER, Kenneth J Medel and Joel R. Wohlfeil. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    11/19/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judges

JOHN S. MEYER

Kenneth J Medel

Joel R. Wohlfeil

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

REYNOSO, MARTHA

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

SMITH, LAUREN

SMITH, JOSH

VETERANS BENEFITS ADVANTAGE LLC

VETERANS ADVANTAGE ENTERPRISES LLC

Valued Veteran Consulting Serivces LLC

Lujan, Javier

Zucarello, Michael

Smith, Joshua

Defendants and Cross Defendants

Lujan, Javier

Zucarello, Michael

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GLICK, NOAM

Attorney at GLICK LAW GROUP

225 Broadway Suite 2100

San Diego, CA 92101

Fanning, Charles L.

Attorney at THE FANNING LAW FIRM APC

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

Stokes, Bonnie L

Attorney at STOKES LAW PC

750 B Street 1610

San Diego, CA 92101

Feasby, Jeffrey A

Attorney at PEREZ VAUGHN & FEASBY INC

Comerica Bank Building, 600 B St #2100

San Diego, CA 92101

Rowlett, Christopher W

Attorney at PEREZ VAUGHN & FEASBY INC

Pestotnik, Timothy R

Attorney at PESTOTNIK LLP

Cross Defendant Attorneys

Poole, Ross M

Renda, Vincent

 

Court Documents

Separate Statement iso MTC Documents

Statement - Other (Separate Statement iso MTC Documents) filed by Veterans Benefits Advantage LLC.

Notice of Confirmation of Filing SD

E-filing transaction partially accepted.

Joshua Smith and Lauren Smith's Opposition to Cross-Defendants' Demurrer

Opposition - Other (to cross defendants demurrer) filed by Smith, Joshua; Smith, Lauren.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Smith, Joshua; Smith, Lauren.

Reply to Opposition to Demurrer to Cross-Complaint

Reply to Opposition of Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations filed by Lujan, Javier; Zucarello, Michael.

Notice of Hearing SD

Motion Hearing (Civil) scheduled for 04/10/2020 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in C-73 Joel R. Wohlfeil was vacated.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Zucarello, Michael.

Defendants' Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Veterans Benefits Advantage LLC.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service (of opposition, declaration) filed by Reynoso, Martha.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities

Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in support of demurrer to cross complaint) filed by Lujan, Javier.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service (of motion, memorandum of points and authorities, statement, declaration) filed by Veterans Benefits Advantage LLC.

Demurrer

Demurrer (to cross complaint) filed by Lujan, Javier.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

The Trial Readiness Conference (Civil) was rescheduled to 08/28/2020 at 08:30:00 AM in C-64 before John S. Meyer at Central.

Answer to Third Amended Complaint

Answer filed by Veterans Advantage Enterprises LLC; Smith, Lauren; Smith, Josh.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Reynoso, Martha.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Reynoso, Martha.

Stipulation - Other

Stipulation - Other - Fee Due (Joint Stipulation Granting Plaintiff Leave to File A First Amended Complaint) filed by Reynoso, Martha; Smith, Lauren; Veterans Advantage Enterprises LLC; Veterans Benefits Advantage LLC; Smith, Josh.

Proposed Order

[Another document for ROA# 15]

171 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2021
  • HearingLocation: C-73; Event Type: Civil Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • HearingLocation: C-73; Event Type: Trial Readiness Conference (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • HearingLocation: C-73; Event Type: Demurrer / Motion to Strike - Demurrer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • HearingLocation: C-73; Event Type: Motion Hearing (Civil) - Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • HearingLocation: C-73; Event Type: Discovery Hearing - Motion to Compel Discovery

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReply to Opposition of Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations filed by Lujan, Javier; Zucarello, Michael. Filed By: Lujan, Javier (Cross - Defendant); Zucarello, Michael (Cross - Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Lujan, Javier; Zucarello, Michael. Filed By: Lujan, Javier (Cross - Defendant); Zucarello, Michael (Cross - Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReply filed by Veterans Benefits Advantage LLC. Filed By: Veterans Benefits Advantage LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Veterans Benefits Advantage LLC. Filed By: Veterans Benefits Advantage LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement (and Notice of Non-Opposition) filed by Reynoso, Martha. Filed By: Reynoso, Martha (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
194 More Docket Entries
  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Reynoso, Martha. Filed By: Reynoso, Martha (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Reynoso, Martha. Filed By: Reynoso, Martha (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Reynoso, Martha. Filed By: Reynoso, Martha (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Reynoso, Martha. Filed By: Reynoso, Martha (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 04/26/2019 at 09:45:00 AM at Central in C-64 John S. Meyer.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Reynoso, Martha. Refers to: Veterans Advantage Enterprises LLC; Veterans Benefits Advantage LLC; Smith, Joshua; Smith, Lauren Filed By: Reynoso, Martha (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Reynoso, Martha. Refers to: Veterans Advantage Enterprises LLC; Veterans Benefits Advantage LLC; Smith, Joshua; Smith, Lauren Filed By: Reynoso, Martha (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Reynoso, Martha. Refers to: Veterans Advantage Enterprises LLC; Veterans Benefits Advantage LLC; Smith, Joshua; Smith, Lauren Filed By: Reynoso, Martha (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Meyer, John.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ross Matthew Poole

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Renda, Vincent