This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 03/12/2023 at 08:09:51 (UTC).

Reyes Coca-Cola Bottling LLC vs Oil and Water Pechanga Parkway LP

Case Summary

On 12/12/2022 Reyes Coca-Cola Bottling LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Oil and Water Pechanga Parkway LP. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Loren G. Freestone. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    12/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Loren G. Freestone

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Reyes Coca-Cola Bottling LLC

Defendants

Kourie, Lawrence Joseph; AKA : Kourie, Lawrence

Oil and Water Pechanga Parkway LP; DBA : Kangaroo Express

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Minassian, Natalia A

 

Court Documents

Request for Entry of Default

E-filing transaction partially accepted.

Request for Entry of Default1

[Another document for ROA# 16]

Notice of Confirmation of Filing SD

[Another document for ROA# 16]

Notice to Filing Party SD

The default filed by was denied. Refers to: Oil and Water Pechanga Parkway LP

Notice to Filing Party SD

The default filed by was denied. Refers to: Kourie, Lawrence

Request for Entry of Default

Request for Entry of Default (NOT ENTERED) filed by Reyes Coca-Cola Bottling LLC. Refers to: Oil and Water Pechanga Parkway LP

Request for Entry of Default

Request for Entry of Default (NOT ENTERED) filed by Reyes Coca-Cola Bottling LLC. Refers to: Kourie, Lawrence

Proof of Personal Service - Petition

E-filing transaction partially accepted.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

[Another document for ROA# 11]

Request for Entry of Default

[Another document for ROA# 11]

Notice of Confirmation of Filing SD

[Another document for ROA# 11]

Notice to Filing Party SD

The default filed by was denied. Refers to: Kourie, Lawrence; Oil and Water Pechanga Parkway LP

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Reyes Coca-Cola Bottling LLC. Refers to: Oil and Water Pechanga Parkway LP

Proof of Personal Service - Petition

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Reyes Coca-Cola Bottling LLC. Refers to: Kourie, Lawrence

Request for Entry of Default

Request for Entry of Default (NOT ENTERED) filed by Reyes Coca-Cola Bottling LLC. Refers to: Kourie, Lawrence; Oil and Water Pechanga Parkway LP

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Collections SD

Case initiation form printed.

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Reyes Coca-Cola Bottling LLC. Refers to: Oil and Water Pechanga Parkway LP; Kourie, Lawrence

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Reyes Coca-Cola Bottling LLC. Refers to: Oil and Water Pechanga Parkway LP; Kourie, Lawrence

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-filing transaction partially accepted.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 16]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 16]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketThe default filed by was denied. Refers to: Oil and Water Pechanga Parkway LP; Filed By: Reyes Coca-Cola Bottling LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketThe default filed by was denied. Refers to: Kourie, Lawrence; Filed By: Reyes Coca-Cola Bottling LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default (NOT ENTERED) filed by Reyes Coca-Cola Bottling LLC. Refers to: Oil and Water Pechanga Parkway LP; Filed By: Reyes Coca-Cola Bottling LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default (NOT ENTERED) filed by Reyes Coca-Cola Bottling LLC. Refers to: Kourie, Lawrence; Filed By: Reyes Coca-Cola Bottling LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-filing transaction partially accepted.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 11]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 11]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 02/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketThe default filed by was denied. Refers to: Kourie, Lawrence; Oil and Water Pechanga Parkway LP; Filed By: Reyes Coca-Cola Bottling LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Reyes Coca-Cola Bottling LLC. Refers to: Oil and Water Pechanga Parkway LP; Filed By: Reyes Coca-Cola Bottling LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Reyes Coca-Cola Bottling LLC. Refers to: Kourie, Lawrence; Filed By: Reyes Coca-Cola Bottling LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default (NOT ENTERED) filed by Reyes Coca-Cola Bottling LLC. Refers to: Kourie, Lawrence; Oil and Water Pechanga Parkway LP; Filed By: Reyes Coca-Cola Bottling LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Freestone, Loren.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Reyes Coca-Cola Bottling LLC. Refers to: Oil and Water Pechanga Parkway LP; Kourie, Lawrence; Filed By: Reyes Coca-Cola Bottling LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Reyes Coca-Cola Bottling LLC. Refers to: Oil and Water Pechanga Parkway LP; Kourie, Lawrence; Filed By: Reyes Coca-Cola Bottling LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Reyes Coca-Cola Bottling LLC. Refers to: Oil and Water Pechanga Parkway LP; Kourie, Lawrence; Filed By: Reyes Coca-Cola Bottling LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less