This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 04/27/2019 at 00:47:05 (UTC).

Resurgence Capital LLC vs. McAhren

Case Summary

On 04/19/2012 Resurgence Capital LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against McAhren. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, East County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************L-EC

  • Filing Date:

    04/19/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    East County Regional Center

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Resurgence Capital LLC

Defendant

McAhren, Jason ; AKA : McAhren, Jason R

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Searles, Nathan A

Attorney at RESURGENCE LEGAL GROUP PC

10805 Holder Street 205

Cypress, CA 90630

 

Court Documents

Complaint and Declaration Re: Reduced Filing Fees

Complaint and Declaration Re: Reduced Filing Fees filed by Resurgence Capital LLC. Refers to: McAhren, Jason

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Resurgence Capital LLC. Refers to: McAhren, Jason

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Collections SD

Case initiation form printed.

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Resurgence Capital LLC. Refers to: McAhren, Jason

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Resurgence Capital LLC. Refers to: McAhren, Jason

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (AMENDED) filed by Resurgence Capital LLC. Refers to: McAhren, Jason

Request for Dismissal of Does

Request for Dismissal of Does filed by Resurgence Capital LLC.

Request for Entry of Default

Request for Entry of Default filed by Resurgence Capital LLC. Refers to: McAhren, Jason

Declarations in Support of Application for Default Judgment by Clerk

Declarations in Support of Application for Default Judgment by Clerk filed by Resurgence Capital LLC. Refers to: McAhren, Jason

Judgment by Default by Clerk

Judgment by Default by Clerk filed by Resurgence Capital LLC. Refers to: McAhren, Jason

memo

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed by Resurgence Capital LLC. Refers to: McAhren, Jason

writ

Writ of Execution issued.

Writ of Execution Returned - Partially Satisfied filed by Resurgence Capital LLC.

Writ of Execution Returned - Partially Satisfied filed by Resurgence Capital LLC.

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed by Resurgence Capital LLC.

Notice to Filing Party SD

Correspondence (Check # 160176) submitted by Resurgence Capital LLC rejected on 03/08/2014.

Writ of Execution issued

Writ of Execution issued.

Writ of Execution Returned - Partially Satisfied

Writ of Execution Returned - Partially Satisfied filed by Resurgence Capital LLC.

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Execution Returned - Partially Satisfied filed by Resurgence Capital LLC. Filed By: Resurgence Capital LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Execution issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Correspondence (Check # 160176) submitted by Resurgence Capital LLC rejected on 03/08/2014. Filed By: Resurgence Capital LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed by Resurgence Capital LLC. Filed By: Resurgence Capital LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Execution Returned - Partially Satisfied filed by Resurgence Capital LLC. Filed By: Resurgence Capital LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2013
  • *****Writ Received*****

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Execution issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed by Resurgence Capital LLC. Refers to: McAhren, Jason Filed By: Resurgence Capital LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2012
  • Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed by Resurgence Capital LLC. Refers to: McAhren, Jason Filed By: Resurgence Capital LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2012
  • Judgment was entered as follows: Judgment entered for Resurgence Capital LLC and against McAhren, Jason for $ 2677.10, punitive damages: $ 0.00, attorney fees: $ 0.00, interest: $ 697.51, prejudgment costs: $ 241.00, other costs: $ 0.00, amount payable to court: $ .00, for a grand total of $ 3615.61.

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 09/11/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Entry of Default filed by Resurgence Capital LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal of Does filed by Resurgence Capital LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (AMENDED) filed by Resurgence Capital LLC. Refers to: McAhren, Jason Filed By: Resurgence Capital LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Resurgence Capital LLC. Refers to: McAhren, Jason Filed By: Resurgence Capital LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Summons filed by Resurgence Capital LLC. Refers to: McAhren, Jason Filed By: Resurgence Capital LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2012
  • Case assigned to Department E-21.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2012
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Resurgence Capital LLC. Refers to: McAhren, Jason Filed By: Resurgence Capital LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint and Declaration Re: Reduced Filing Fees filed by Resurgence Capital LLC. Refers to: McAhren, Jason Filed By: Resurgence Capital LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less