Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 01/26/2020 at 01:39:48 (UTC).

REISS vs GNM TRANSPORTATION

Case Summary

On 06/18/2019 REISS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GNM TRANSPORTATION. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Katherine Bacal. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    06/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Katherine Bacal

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Reiss, Christian

Defendants

Sachs, Julio

GNM Transportation

Haghighi, Mansour Eftekhari

G and M Transportation; ESA : GNM Transportation

HyreCar Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Berman, William M

Attorney at BERMAN & RIEDEL LLP

Defendant Attorney

Brown, Jay D

Attorney at FRIEDENTHAL HEFFERNAN & BROWN LLP

 

Court Documents

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Reiss, Christian.

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Reiss, Christian.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by G and M Transportation; HyreCar Inc; Haghighi, Mansour Eftekhari.

Notice of Posting Jury Fees

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by G and M Transportation; HyreCar Inc; Haghighi, Mansour Eftekhari.

Answer

Answer filed by HyreCar Inc.

Amendment to Complaint

Amendment to Complaint (doe 1) filed by Reiss, Christian. Refers to: HyreCar Inc

Answer to Complaint

Answer filed by G and M Transportation; Haghighi, Mansour Eftekhari.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Reiss, Christian. Refers to: Haghighi, Mansour

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Reiss, Christian. Refers to: GNM Transportation

Complaint

Complaint filed by Reiss, Christian. Refers to: GNM Transportation; Haghighi, Mansour; Sachs, Julio

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Reiss, Christian. Refers to: GNM Transportation; Haghighi, Mansour; Sachs, Julio

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Reiss, Christian. Refers to: GNM Transportation; Haghighi, Mansour; Sachs, Julio

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by G and M Transportation; HyreCar Inc; Haghighi, Mansour Eftekhari. Filed By: G and M Transportation (Defendant); HyreCar Inc (Defendant); Haghighi, Mansour Eftekhari (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by G and M Transportation; HyreCar Inc; Haghighi, Mansour Eftekhari. Filed By: G and M Transportation (Defendant); HyreCar Inc (Defendant); Haghighi, Mansour Eftekhari (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Reiss, Christian. Filed By: Reiss, Christian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by Reiss, Christian. Filed By: Reiss, Christian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by HyreCar Inc. Filed By: HyreCar Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (doe 1) filed by Reiss, Christian. Refers to: HyreCar Inc Filed By: Reiss, Christian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by G and M Transportation; Haghighi, Mansour Eftekhari. Filed By: G and M Transportation (Defendant); Haghighi, Mansour Eftekhari (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Reiss, Christian. Refers to: G and M Transportation Filed By: Reiss, Christian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Reiss, Christian. Refers to: Haghighi, Mansour Filed By: Reiss, Christian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 01/24/2020 at 10:00:00 AM at Central in C-69 Katherine Bacal.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Bacal, Katherine.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Reiss, Christian. Refers to: G and M Transportation; Haghighi, Mansour; Sachs, Julio Filed By: Reiss, Christian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Reiss, Christian. Refers to: G and M Transportation; Haghighi, Mansour; Sachs, Julio Filed By: Reiss, Christian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Reiss, Christian. Refers to: G and M Transportation; Haghighi, Mansour; Sachs, Julio; HyreCar Inc Filed By: Reiss, Christian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HYRECAR INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BROWN JAY D. ESQ.