This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 05/19/2022 at 08:05:02 (UTC).

Rebelez vs Opp

Case Summary

On 02/18/2022 Rebelez filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Opp. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Katherine Bacal. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Katherine Bacal

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rebelez, Sierra

Defendants

OPP, JARED

Jax Assets Inc; DBA : Tarpy Plumbing Heating and Air;ESA : Jax Assets Inc and Tarpy Plumbing

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Malek, Marianne M

Attorney at GUY LEVY LAW

9888 Carroll Centre Rd Ste 222

San Diego, CA 92126

Defendant Attorney

Schmitt, Charles J

Attorney at One World Trade Center

1 World Trade Center 27Th Floor

Long Beach, CA 90802-2700

 

Court Documents

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Rebelez, Sierra.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

E-filing transaction partially accepted.

Complaint

[Another document for ROA# 6]

Notice of Confirmation of Filing SD

[Another document for ROA# 6]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 5]

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 5]

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Rebelez, Sierra. Refers to: OPP, JARED; Jax Assets Inc; Tarpy Plumbing

Complaint

Complaint filed by Rebelez, Sierra. Refers to: OPP, JARED; Jax Assets Inc; Tarpy Plumbing

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Rebelez, Sierra.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Rebelez, Sierra.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Rebelez, Sierra.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Rebelez, Sierra.

Answer to Complaint

Answer filed by OPP, JARED; Jax Assets Inc.

Demand for Jury Trial

Demand for Jury Trial filed by OPP, JARED; Jax Assets Inc.

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by OPP, JARED; Jax Assets Inc.

Consent to Electronic Service and Notice of Electronic Service Address

Consent to Electronic Service and Notice of Electronic Service Address filed by OPP, JARED; Jax Assets Inc.

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-69; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketConsent to Electronic Service and Notice of Electronic Service Address filed by OPP, JARED; Jax Assets Inc.; Filed By: OPP, JARED (Defendant); Jax Assets Inc (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by OPP, JARED; Jax Assets Inc.; Filed By: OPP, JARED (Defendant); Jax Assets Inc (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial filed by OPP, JARED; Jax Assets Inc.; Filed By: OPP, JARED (Defendant); Jax Assets Inc (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by OPP, JARED; Jax Assets Inc.; Filed By: OPP, JARED (Defendant); Jax Assets Inc (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Rebelez, Sierra.; Filed By: Rebelez, Sierra (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Rebelez, Sierra.; Filed By: Rebelez, Sierra (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Rebelez, Sierra.; Filed By: Rebelez, Sierra (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Rebelez, Sierra.; Filed By: Rebelez, Sierra (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Rebelez, Sierra.; Filed By: Rebelez, Sierra (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-filing transaction partially accepted.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 6]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 6]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 07/29/2022 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in C-69 Katherine Bacal.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Bacal, Katherine.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Rebelez, Sierra. Refers to: OPP, JARED; Jax Assets Inc; Tarpy Plumbing; Filed By: Rebelez, Sierra (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Rebelez, Sierra. Refers to: OPP, JARED; Jax Assets Inc; Filed By: Rebelez, Sierra (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Jax Assets Inc; DBA : Tarpy Plumbing Heating and Air is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Malek, Marianne