This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 11/19/2021 at 07:24:50 (UTC).

Rappaport vs Art In Aluminum Inc

Case Summary

On 09/20/2021 Rappaport filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against Art In Aluminum Inc. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, North County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Earl H. Maas, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************D-NC

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Earl H. Maas, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Rappaport, Lori

Rappaport, Mark

Defendants

Art In Aluminum Inc; DBA : CHPT Construction

BUSINESS ALLIANCE INSURANCE COMPANY

Zavala, Javier

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Hotchkiss, Sam W

Attorney at HEROLD & SAGER

Defendant Attorney

Wells, Michelle J

 

Court Documents

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Rappaport, Mark; Rappaport, Lori. Refers to: Art In Aluminum Inc; Zavala, Javier; BUSINESS ALLIANCE INSURANCE COMPANY

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Rappaport, Mark; Rappaport, Lori. Refers to: Art In Aluminum Inc; Zavala, Javier; BUSINESS ALLIANCE INSURANCE COMPANY

Complaint

Complaint filed by Rappaport, Mark; Rappaport, Lori. Refers to: Art In Aluminum Inc; Zavala, Javier; BUSINESS ALLIANCE INSURANCE COMPANY

Proof of Service by Mail (Proof of Service - General)

Proof of Service by Mail filed by BUSINESS ALLIANCE INSURANCE COMPANY.

Answer (First Papers)

Answer filed by BUSINESS ALLIANCE INSURANCE COMPANY.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/13/2022
  • HearingLocation: N-28; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by BUSINESS ALLIANCE INSURANCE COMPANY. Filed By: BUSINESS ALLIANCE INSURANCE COMPANY (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail filed by BUSINESS ALLIANCE INSURANCE COMPANY. Filed By: BUSINESS ALLIANCE INSURANCE COMPANY (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 05/13/2022 at 10:00:00 AM at North County in N-28 Earl H. Maas.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Rappaport, Mark; Rappaport, Lori. Refers to: Art In Aluminum Inc; Zavala, Javier; BUSINESS ALLIANCE INSURANCE COMPANY Filed By: Rappaport, Mark (Plaintiff); Rappaport, Lori (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Rappaport, Mark; Rappaport, Lori. Refers to: Art In Aluminum Inc; Zavala, Javier; BUSINESS ALLIANCE INSURANCE COMPANY Filed By: Rappaport, Mark (Plaintiff); Rappaport, Lori (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Rappaport, Mark; Rappaport, Lori. Refers to: Art In Aluminum Inc; Zavala, Javier; BUSINESS ALLIANCE INSURANCE COMPANY Filed By: Rappaport, Mark (Plaintiff); Rappaport, Lori (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Maas, Earl.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BUSINESS ALLIANCE INSURANCE COMPANY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Hotchkiss, Sam W