This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 08:22:37 (UTC).

Rangel vs Sandoval

Case Summary

On 01/06/2017 Rangel filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Sandoval. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JOEL R. WOHLFEIL. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

JOEL R. WOHLFEIL

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RANGEL, FELICIA

RANGEL, GABRIELA

Defendants and Cross Defendants

SANDOVAL, JOHN

MULHERN, LYNN

TIMELY LIMO

TEKLEY, HAGOS

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

TIMELY LIMO

TEKLEY, HAGOS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PETROV, DANIEL

1320 Columbia 200

San Diego, CA 92101

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

SWEET, WALLACE H

Attorney at HARTSUYKER STRATMAN & WILLIAMS ABREGO SAN DIE

3111 Camino Del Rio North 700

San Diego, CA 92108

CAREY, JANE E

1551 N Tustin Avenue 830

Santa Ana, CA 92705

SALEM, JOHNPAUL N.

501 W Broadway Street 1750

San Diego, CA 92101

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

SALEM, JOHNPAUL N.

501 W Broadway Street 1750

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

Application for Order for Publication of Summons

Application for Order for Publication of Summons/Citation filed by Rangel, Felicia; Rangel, Gabriela.

Application for Order for Publication of Summons

Application for Order for Publication of Summons/Citation filed by Rangel, Felicia; Rangel, Gabriela.

Application for Order for Publication of Summons

Application for Order for Publication of Summons/Citation filed by Rangel, Felicia; Rangel, Gabriela.

Order for Publication of Summons

Order for Publication of Summons/Citation (Denied) filed by Rangel, Felicia; Rangel, Gabriela.

Order for Publication of Summons

Order for Publication of Summons/Citation (Denied) filed by Rangel, Felicia; Rangel, Gabriela.

Order for Publication of Summons

Order for Publication of Summons/Citation (Denied) filed by Rangel, Felicia; Rangel, Gabriela.

Declaration - Other

Declaration - Other filed by Rangel, Felicia; Rangel, Gabriela.

Declaration - Other

Declaration - Other filed by Rangel, Felicia; Rangel, Gabriela.

Declaration - Other

Declaration - Other filed by Rangel, Felicia; Rangel, Gabriela.

Declaration of Non-Service

Declaration of Non-Service filed by Rangel, Felicia; Rangel, Gabriela. Refers to: Sandoval, John

Declaration of Non-Service

Declaration of Non-Service filed by Rangel, Felicia; Rangel, Gabriela. Refers to: Tekley, Hagos

Declaration of Non-Service

Declaration of Non-Service filed by Rangel, Felicia; Rangel, Gabriela. Refers to: Timely Limo

Application for Order for Publication of Summons

Application for Order for Publication of Summons/Citation (John Sandoval) filed by Rangel, Felicia; Rangel, Gabriela.

Declaration - Other

Declaration - Other filed by Rangel, Felicia; Rangel, Gabriela.

Declaration of Non-Service

Declaration of Non-Service filed by Rangel, Felicia; Rangel, Gabriela. Refers to: Sandoval, John

Application for Order for Publication of Summons

Application for Order for Publication of Summons/Citation (Hagos Tekley) filed by Rangel, Felicia; Rangel, Gabriela.

Declaration - Other

Declaration - Other filed by Rangel, Felicia; Rangel, Gabriela.

Declaration of Non-Service

Declaration of Non-Service filed by Rangel, Felicia; Rangel, Gabriela. Refers to: Tekley, Hagos

50 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/05/2017
  • DocketStatus of Mediation process changed to Mediation Not held.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Agreement/Nonagreement - mediation did not take place filed by PLOTKIN, BARRY M. Filed By: PLOTKIN, BARRY M (Mediator)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to Rangel, Gabriela .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to Rangel, Felicia .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to MULHERN, LYNN .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to Timely Limo.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to Tekley, Hagos .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to Sandoval, John .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • DocketCross-Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Sandoval, John .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • DocketCross-Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Timely Limo.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
66 More Docket Entries
  • 04/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication for Order for Publication of Summons/Citation filed by Rangel, Felicia; Rangel, Gabriela. Filed By: Rangel, Felicia (Plaintiff); Rangel, Gabriela (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 06/09/2017 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-73 Joel R. Wohlfeil.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2017
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Wohlfeil, Joel.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2017
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Rangel, Felicia; Rangel, Gabriela. Refers to: Sandoval, John; Tekley, Hagos; Timely Limo; MULHERN, LYNN Filed By: Rangel, Felicia (Plaintiff); Rangel, Gabriela (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[A document for ROA# 3]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Rangel, Felicia; Rangel, Gabriela. Refers to: Sandoval, John; Tekley, Hagos; Timely Limo; MULHERN, LYNN Filed By: Rangel, Felicia (Plaintiff); Rangel, Gabriela (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[A document for ROA# 2]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Rangel, Felicia; Rangel, Gabriela. Refers to: Sandoval, John; Tekley, Hagos; Timely Limo; MULHERN, LYNN Filed By: Rangel, Felicia (Plaintiff); Rangel, Gabriela (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SALEM JOHNPAUL NAJAH