This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 04/17/2016 09:39:35

Get the Latest Court Record Available:

Case Summary

On 05/20/2014 a Labor - Wrongful Termination case was filed by Randall against Vistage Worldwide Inc in the jurisdiction of San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number XXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXX-CTL
  • Filing Date 05/20/2014
  • Case Status Pending - Other Pending
  • Case Type Labor - Wrongful Termination
  • Jurisdiction San Diego County Superior Courts
  • Judge Randa Trapp
  • Courthouse Central Courthouse
  • County San Diego
  • State California

Party Details

  • Plaintiff Randall, Ruby L
  • Represented By
    • Edleson, Louis Bert
  • Defendant Shapiro, Leon
  • Represented By
    • Wirtz, Sarah T
    • Levin, Adam
  • Defendant Vistage Worldwide Inc
  • Represented By
    • Wirtz, Sarah T
    • Levin, Adam
  • Cross Plaintiff Vistage Worldwide Inc
  • Represented By
    • Wirtz, Sarah T
    • Levin, Adam
  • Cross Defendant Randall, Ruby L
  • Represented By
    • Edleson, Louis Bert

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed b...

Fees Apply
Request for Dismissal - Cross complaint

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed b...

Fees Apply
Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

The Status Conference (Civil) was rescheduled to 04/08/2016 ...

Fees Apply
Notice of Hearing SD

Status Conference (Civil) scheduled for 03/25/2016 at 10:00:...

Fees Apply
Notice of Dismissal by Court SD

Notice of Dismissal by Court SD generated.

Fees Apply
Minute Order

Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.

Fees Apply
Minute Order

Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.

Fees Apply
Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Status Conference (Civil) heard 04/08/...

Fees Apply
Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minutes Only) SD

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minutes Only) SD gen...

Fees Apply

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2016
  • Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Randall, Ruby L. Filed By: Randall, Ruby L (Plaintiff)
  • 04/29/2016
  • Amended Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Randall, Ruby L .
  • 04/29/2016
  • Amended Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Shapiro, Leon .
  • 04/29/2016
  • Amended Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Vistage Worldwide Inc.
  • 04/26/2016
  • Cross-Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Randall, Ruby L .
  • 04/26/2016
  • Cross-Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Vistage Worldwide Inc.
  • 04/26/2016
  • Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Vistage Worldwide Inc. Filed By: Vistage Worldwide Inc (Cross - Complainant)
  • 04/19/2016
  • Trial Readiness Conference (Civil) scheduled for 05/20/2016 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in C-70 Randa Trapp was vacated.
  • 04/19/2016
  • Status Conference (Civil) scheduled for 05/20/2016 at 10:00:00 AM at Central in C-70 Randa Trapp was vacated.
  • 04/19/2016
  • Civil Jury Trial scheduled for 06/03/2016 at 08:45:00 AM at Central in C-70 Randa Trapp was vacated.
  • 04/19/2016
  • Notice of Dismissal by Court SD generated.
  • 04/19/2016
  • Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.
  • 04/08/2016
  • Minutes finalized for Status Conference (Civil) heard 04/08/2016 10:00:00 AM.
  • 04/08/2016
  • Motion Hearing (Civil) scheduled for 04/15/2016 at 11:00:00 AM at Central in C-70 Randa Trapp was vacated.
  • 04/08/2016
  • Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minutes Only) SD generated.
  • 04/08/2016
  • Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.
  • 04/08/2016
  • Matter decided.
  • 03/24/2016
  • Status Conference (Civil) scheduled for 04/08/2016 at 10:00:00 AM at Central in C-70 Randa Trapp.
  • 03/24/2016
  • The Status Conference (Civil) was rescheduled to 04/08/2016 at 10:00:00 AM in C-70 before Randa Trapp at Central.
  • 02/26/2016
  • Status Conference (Civil) scheduled for 03/25/2016 at 10:00:00 AM at Central in C-70 Randa Trapp.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.