This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 02/19/2021 at 03:03:40 (UTC).

RANDALI vs FCA US LLC

Case Summary

On 03/11/2020 RANDALI filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against FCA US LLC. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Ronald F. Frazier. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    03/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Ronald F. Frazier

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RANDALI, CAMILLE

Defendants

FCA US LLC

Sunroad Auto LLC; AKA : Kearny Mesa Chrysler Dodge Jeep Ram

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jacobson, Kevin Y

Attorney at QUILL & ARROW LLP

Wirtz, Richard M

Attorney at WIRTZ LAW APC

Defendant Attorney

Frerich, Amy

Attorney at LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

 

Court Documents

Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number (Participant Information)

Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number filed by FCA US LLC.

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit (Notices)

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by FCA US LLC.

Case Management Statement (Case Management)

Case Management Statement filed by FCA US LLC.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by RANDALI, CAMILLE.

Notice of Posting Advance Jury Fees

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by RANDALI, CAMILLE.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 01/08/2021 11:15:00 AM.

Notice of Association of Counsel

Association of Attorney filed by RANDALI, CAMILLE.

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Cause of Actions

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party (Not Entered) filed by RANDALI, CAMILLE. Refers to: Sunroad Auto LLC

Notice of Errata

Notice of Errata filed by RANDALI, CAMILLE.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

Civil Case Management Conference rescheduled to 01/08/2021 at 11:15:00 AM in C-65 before Ronald F. Frazier at Central.

Defendant FCA US LLCs Answer To Complaint

Answer filed by FCA US LLC.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by RANDALI, CAMILLE. Refers to: FCA US LLC

Complaint

Complaint filed by RANDALI, CAMILLE. Refers to: FCA US LLC; Sunroad Auto LLC

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by RANDALI, CAMILLE. Refers to: FCA US LLC

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by RANDALI, CAMILLE. Refers to: FCA US LLC

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

Case initiation form printed.

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/29/2021
  • HearingLocation: C-65; Event Type: Civil Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • HearingLocation: C-65; Event Type: Trial Readiness Conference (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAssociation of Attorney filed by RANDALI, CAMILLE. Filed By: RANDALI, CAMILLE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketCivil Jury Trial scheduled for 10/29/2021 at 09:45AM before Judge Ronald F. Frazier.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketTrial Readiness Conference (Civil) scheduled for 10/15/2021 at 10:00AM before Judge Ronald F. Frazier.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 01/08/2021 11:15:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by RANDALI, CAMILLE. Filed By: RANDALI, CAMILLE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by RANDALI, CAMILLE. Filed By: RANDALI, CAMILLE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by FCA US LLC. Filed By: FCA US LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by FCA US LLC. Filed By: FCA US LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party (Not Entered) filed by RANDALI, CAMILLE. Refers to: Sunroad Auto LLC Filed By: RANDALI, CAMILLE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Errata filed by RANDALI, CAMILLE. Filed By: RANDALI, CAMILLE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference rescheduled to 01/08/2021 at 11:15:00 AM in C-65 before Ronald F. Frazier at Central.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 08/28/2020 at 11:15:00 AM at Central in C-65 Ronald F. Frazier.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by RANDALI, CAMILLE. Refers to: FCA US LLC; Sunroad Auto LLC Filed By: RANDALI, CAMILLE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by RANDALI, CAMILLE. Refers to: FCA US LLC Filed By: RANDALI, CAMILLE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by RANDALI, CAMILLE. Refers to: FCA US LLC Filed By: RANDALI, CAMILLE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Frazier, Ronald.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Sunroad Auto LLC; AKA : Kearny Mesa Chrysler Dodge Jeep Ram is a litigant

Latest cases where FCA US LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Frerich, Amy