This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 07/08/2022 at 01:33:59 (UTC).

Ramirez vs Fuller Honda

Case Summary

On 06/10/2022 Ramirez filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Fuller Honda. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Ronald F. Frazier. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Ronald F. Frazier

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ramirez, Rosalva

Defendants

American Honda Motor Co Inc

Capital One National Association

Fuller Honda

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mobasseri, Robert B

1055 W Seventh Street Suite 2140

Los Angeles, CA 90017-3329

 

Court Documents

Complaint

Complaint filed by Ramirez, Rosalva. Refers to: Fuller Honda; American Honda Motor Co Inc; Capital One National Association

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Ramirez, Rosalva. Refers to: Fuller Honda; American Honda Motor Co Inc; Capital One National Association

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Ramirez, Rosalva. Refers to: Fuller Honda; American Honda Motor Co Inc; Capital One National Association

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

Case initiation form printed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Ramirez, Rosalva. Refers to: Capital One National Association

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Ramirez, Rosalva. Refers to: American Honda Motor Co Inc

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-65; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Ramirez, Rosalva. Refers to: American Honda Motor Co Inc; Filed By: Ramirez, Rosalva (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Ramirez, Rosalva. Refers to: Capital One National Association; Filed By: Ramirez, Rosalva (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 12/16/2022 at 11:15:00 AM at Central in C-65 Ronald F. Frazier.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Frazier, Ronald.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Ramirez, Rosalva. Refers to: Fuller Honda; American Honda Motor Co Inc; Capital One National Association; Filed By: Ramirez, Rosalva (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Ramirez, Rosalva. Refers to: Fuller Honda; American Honda Motor Co Inc; Capital One National Association; Filed By: Ramirez, Rosalva (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Ramirez, Rosalva. Refers to: Fuller Honda; American Honda Motor Co Inc; Capital One National Association; Filed By: Ramirez, Rosalva (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CAPITAL ONE N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases where AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO. INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MOBASSERI ROBERT B.