This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 03/12/2023 at 07:03:53 (UTC).

Ramirez vs Ford Motor Company

Case Summary

On 01/11/2023 Ramirez filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Ford Motor Company. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Keri Katz. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Keri Katz

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ramirez, Robert

Defendant

Ford Motor Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jacobson, Kevin Y

10900 Wilshire Boulevard 300

Los Angeles, CA 90024

Defendant Attorney

Nassihi, Amir

Attorney at SHOOK HARDY AND BACON LLP

555 Mission Street 2300

San Francisco, CA 94105

 

Court Documents

Complaint

Complaint filed by Ramirez, Robert. Refers to: Ford Motor Company

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Ramirez, Robert. Refers to: Ford Motor Company

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Ramirez, Robert. Refers to: Ford Motor Company

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Ramirez, Robert. Refers to: Ford Motor Company

Answer (First Papers)

Answer filed by Ford Motor Company.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2023
  • HearingLocation: C-74; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Ford Motor Company.; Filed By: Ford Motor Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Ramirez, Robert. Refers to: Ford Motor Company; Filed By: Ramirez, Robert (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 06/23/2023 at 10:30:00 AM at Central in C-74 Keri Katz.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Katz, Keri.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Ramirez, Robert. Refers to: Ford Motor Company; Filed By: Ramirez, Robert (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Ramirez, Robert. Refers to: Ford Motor Company; Filed By: Ramirez, Robert (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Ramirez, Robert. Refers to: Ford Motor Company; Filed By: Ramirez, Robert (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less