This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 01/23/2023 at 08:14:37 (UTC).

Ramirez Reyes vs Mendoza

Case Summary

On 10/25/2022 Ramirez Reyes filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Mendoza. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Carolyn Caietti. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    10/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Carolyn Caietti

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ramirez Reyes, Lizeth

Defendant

Mendoza, Edith

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Hepburn, Adam

Defendant Attorney

Cooper, Benjamin P

 

Court Documents

Complaint

Complaint filed by Ramirez Reyes, Lizeth. Refers to: Mendoza, Edith

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Ramirez Reyes, Lizeth. Refers to: Mendoza, Edith

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Ramirez Reyes, Lizeth. Refers to: Mendoza, Edith

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Ramirez Reyes, Lizeth. Refers to: Mendoza, Edith

Answer

Answer filed by Mendoza, Edith.

 

Docket Entries

04/07/2023

HearingLocation: C-70; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/30/2022
View Court Documents

DocketAnswer filed by Mendoza, Edith.; Filed By: Mendoza, Edith (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/04/2022
View Court Documents

DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Ramirez Reyes, Lizeth. Refers to: Mendoza, Edith; Filed By: Ramirez Reyes, Lizeth (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/26/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCase initiation form printed.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/26/2022

DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 04/07/2023 at 09:30:00 AM at Central in C-70 Carolyn Caietti.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/26/2022

DocketSummons issued.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/25/2022

DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Caietti, Carolyn.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/25/2022
View Court Documents

DocketOriginal Summons filed by Ramirez Reyes, Lizeth. Refers to: Mendoza, Edith; Filed By: Ramirez Reyes, Lizeth (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/25/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Ramirez Reyes, Lizeth. Refers to: Mendoza, Edith; Filed By: Ramirez Reyes, Lizeth (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/25/2022
View Court Documents

DocketComplaint filed by Ramirez Reyes, Lizeth. Refers to: Mendoza, Edith; Filed By: Ramirez Reyes, Lizeth (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less