This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 04/17/2023 at 08:04:34 (UTC).

Quintanilla vs National Steel and Shipbuilding Company

Case Summary

On 01/17/2023 Quintanilla filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against National Steel and Shipbuilding Company. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard S. Whitney. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    01/17/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Richard S. Whitney

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Quintanilla, Oscar

Defendant

National Steel and Shipbuilding Company; DBA : General Dynamics Nascco

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DELVAUX, DAPHNE A.M.

 

Court Documents

Complaint (Case Initiation)

Complaint filed by Quintanilla, Oscar. Refers to: National Steel and Shipbuilding Company

Civil Case Cover Sheet (Cover Sheets)

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Quintanilla, Oscar. Refers to: National Steel and Shipbuilding Company

Original Summons (Warrants/Issuance Returns)

Original Summons filed by Quintanilla, Oscar. Refers to: National Steel and Shipbuilding Company

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 6]

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 6]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (Proof of Service - Case Initiating Document)

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Quintanilla, Oscar. Refers to: National Steel and Shipbuilding Company

Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number (Participant Information)

Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number filed by Quintanilla, Oscar.

Stipulation - Other - Fee Due

Stipulation - Other - Fee Due (To Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint- signed 3/13/23) filed by National Steel and Shipbuilding Company; Quintanilla, Oscar.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2023
  • HearingLocation: C-68; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address / Telephone Number filed by Quintanilla, Oscar.; Filed By: Quintanilla, Oscar (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation - Other - Fee Due (To Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint- signed 3/13/23) filed by National Steel and Shipbuilding Company; Quintanilla, Oscar.; Filed By: National Steel and Shipbuilding Company (Defendant); Quintanilla, Oscar (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Quintanilla, Oscar. Refers to: National Steel and Shipbuilding Company; Filed By: Quintanilla, Oscar (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 06/23/2023 at 09:30:00 AM at Central in C-68 Richard S. Whitney.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Whitney, Richard.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Quintanilla, Oscar. Refers to: National Steel and Shipbuilding Company; Filed By: Quintanilla, Oscar (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Quintanilla, Oscar. Refers to: National Steel and Shipbuilding Company; Filed By: Quintanilla, Oscar (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Quintanilla, Oscar. Refers to: National Steel and Shipbuilding Company; Filed By: Quintanilla, Oscar (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less