Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 06/24/2020 at 01:47:09 (UTC).

QUEEN FUNDING LLC VS SOCIAL ACCOUNTING INC AND SOCIAL TAX

Case Summary

On 11/21/2019 QUEEN FUNDING LLC filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against SOCIAL ACCOUNTING INC AND SOCIAL TAX. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    11/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

QUEEN FUNDING LLC

Defendants

DIONNE, MARK ANTHONY

SOCIAL ACCOUNTING INC AND SOCIAL TAX

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Haines, Todd F

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF TODD F HAINES

Defendant Attorney

Grace, Scott M

Attorney at LUFTMAN HECK & ASSOCIATES LLP

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 02/27/2020 01:30:00 PM.

Opposition to Mtn to Vacate Sister State Jmt

Opposition to Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations filed by QUEEN FUNDING LLC.

Notice of Case Reassignment SD

Case reassigned from 903 to C-61 effective 01/11/2020.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Set Aside Sister State Judgment

Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by DIONNE, MARK ANTHONY; SOCIAL ACCOUNTING INC AND SOCIAL TAX.

Notice of Motion and Motion for Order Setting Aside and Vacating Sister State Judgment

Motion to Set Aside Judgment filed by DIONNE, MARK ANTHONY; SOCIAL ACCOUNTING INC AND SOCIAL TAX.

Declaration of Scott M. Grace

Declaration - Other (of attorney Scott M Grace) filed by DIONNE, MARK ANTHONY; SOCIAL ACCOUNTING INC AND SOCIAL TAX.

Proposed Order

Proposed Order (vacating sister state judgment) submitted by DIONNE, MARK ANTHONY; SOCIAL ACCOUNTING INC AND SOCIAL TAX received but not filed on 01/09/2020.

Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail (of motion, declaration, proposed order) filed by DIONNE, MARK ANTHONY; SOCIAL ACCOUNTING INC AND SOCIAL TAX.

Proposed Order

[Another document for ROA# 16]

Declaration of Scott M. Grace

E-filing transaction partially accepted.

Declaration of Defendants

Declaration - Other filed by DIONNE, MARK ANTHONY; SOCIAL ACCOUNTING INC AND SOCIAL TAX.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by QUEEN FUNDING LLC. Refers to: DIONNE, MARK

Proof of Service

Proof of Service (Notice of and Application for Entry of and Judgment on Sister-State Judgment) filed by QUEEN FUNDING LLC. Refers to: SOCIAL ACCOUNTING INC AND SOCIAL TAX

Sister-State Judgment - Application for Entry

Sister-State Judgment - Application for Entry filed by QUEEN FUNDING LLC. Refers to: SOCIAL ACCOUNTING INC AND SOCIAL TAX; DIONNE, MARK

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by QUEEN FUNDING LLC. Refers to: SOCIAL ACCOUNTING INC AND SOCIAL TAX; DIONNE, MARK

Sister-State Judgment - Notice of Entry

Sister-State Judgment - Notice of Entry filed by QUEEN FUNDING LLC. Refers to: SOCIAL ACCOUNTING INC AND SOCIAL TAX; DIONNE, MARK

Sister-State Judgment

Sister-State Judgment filed by QUEEN FUNDING LLC. Refers to: SOCIAL ACCOUNTING INC AND SOCIAL TAX; DIONNE, MARK

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketJudgment entered against QUEEN FUNDING LLC, SOCIAL ACCOUNTING INC AND SOCIAL TAX, MARK ANTHONY DIONNE on the Sister-State Judgment - Application for Entry vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 02/27/2020 01:30:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder After Hearing filed by DIONNE, MARK ANTHONY; SOCIAL ACCOUNTING INC AND SOCIAL TAX. Filed By: DIONNE, MARK ANTHONY (Defendant); SOCIAL ACCOUNTING INC AND SOCIAL TAX (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketTentative Ruling for Motion Hearing (Civil) published.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOpposition to Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations filed by QUEEN FUNDING LLC. Filed By: QUEEN FUNDING LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase reassigned from 903 to C-61 effective 01/11/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration - Other filed by DIONNE, MARK ANTHONY; SOCIAL ACCOUNTING INC AND SOCIAL TAX. Filed By: DIONNE, MARK ANTHONY (Defendant); SOCIAL ACCOUNTING INC AND SOCIAL TAX (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • DocketMotion Hearing (Civil) scheduled for 02/27/2020 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-61 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum of Points and Authorities filed by DIONNE, MARK ANTHONY; SOCIAL ACCOUNTING INC AND SOCIAL TAX. Filed By: DIONNE, MARK ANTHONY (Defendant); SOCIAL ACCOUNTING INC AND SOCIAL TAX (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Set Aside Judgment filed by DIONNE, MARK ANTHONY; SOCIAL ACCOUNTING INC AND SOCIAL TAX. Filed By: DIONNE, MARK ANTHONY (Defendant); SOCIAL ACCOUNTING INC AND SOCIAL TAX (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-filing transaction partially accepted.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by QUEEN FUNDING LLC. Refers to: DIONNE, MARK Filed By: QUEEN FUNDING LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service (Notice of and Application for Entry of and Judgment on Sister-State Judgment) filed by QUEEN FUNDING LLC. Refers to: SOCIAL ACCOUNTING INC AND SOCIAL TAX Filed By: QUEEN FUNDING LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSister-State Judgment - Notice of Entry filed by QUEEN FUNDING LLC. Refers to: SOCIAL ACCOUNTING INC AND SOCIAL TAX; DIONNE, MARK Filed By: QUEEN FUNDING LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSister-State Judgment - Application for Entry filed by QUEEN FUNDING LLC. Refers to: SOCIAL ACCOUNTING INC AND SOCIAL TAX; DIONNE, MARK Filed By: QUEEN FUNDING LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by QUEEN FUNDING LLC. Refers to: SOCIAL ACCOUNTING INC AND SOCIAL TAX; DIONNE, MARK Filed By: QUEEN FUNDING LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 903.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSister-State Judgment filed by QUEEN FUNDING LLC. Refers to: SOCIAL ACCOUNTING INC AND SOCIAL TAX; DIONNE, MARK Filed By: QUEEN FUNDING LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketJudgment was entered as follows: Judgment entered for QUEEN FUNDING LLC and against DIONNE, MARK ANTHONY ;SOCIAL ACCOUNTING INC AND SOCIAL TAX for $ 60724.44, punitive damages: $ 0.00, attorney fees: $ 0.00, interest: $ 0.00, prejudgment costs: $ 3100.22, other costs: $ 0.00, amount payable to court: $ .00, for a grand total of $ 63824.66.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SoCal Accounting Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where QUEEN FUNDING LLC is a litigant