This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 12/03/2021 at 07:42:16 (UTC).

PUENTES VS AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR COMPANY INC

Case Summary

On 03/29/2021 PUENTES filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR COMPANY INC. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Eddie C Sturgeon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Eddie C Sturgeon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PUENTES, MIGUEL

Defendant

American Honda Motor Company Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Beck, Benjeman

5757 W Century Boulevard 500

Los Angeles, CA 90045

Defendant Attorney

Sanders, Justin H.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Original Summons (Warrants/Issuance Returns) (Warrants/Issuance Returns)

Original Summons filed by PUENTES, MIGUEL. Refers to: American Honda Motor Company Inc

Civil Case Cover Sheet (Cover Sheets)

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by PUENTES, MIGUEL. Refers to: American Honda Motor Company Inc

Complaint (Case Initiation)

Complaint filed by PUENTES, MIGUEL. Refers to: American Honda Motor Company Inc

Proof of Service (Proof of Service - General)

Proof of Service filed by PUENTES, MIGUEL.

Answer

Answer filed by American Honda Motor Company Inc.

Notice - Other (Notices)

Notice - Other (of Rescheduling of Case Management Conference) filed by PUENTES, MIGUEL.

Order - Other (Order)

Proposed Order (in support of Motion to Compel Further Responses to Plaintiff) submitted by PUENTES, MIGUEL received but not filed on 08/24/2021.

Separate Statement (Declarations/Affidavits/Statements)

Separate Statement (in support of Motion to Compel Further Responses to Plaintiff) filed by PUENTES, MIGUEL.

Declaration - Other (Declarations/Affidavits/Statements)

Declaration - Other (in support of Motion to Compel Further Responses to Plaintiff) filed by PUENTES, MIGUEL.

Motion to Compel Discovery (Motions)

Motion to Compel Discovery (Motion to Compel Further Responses to Plaintiff) filed by PUENTES, MIGUEL.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

The Civil Case Management Conference was rescheduled to 02/18/2022 at 09:00:00 AM in C-67 before Eddie C Sturgeon at Central.

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-67; Event Type: Discovery Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-67; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice - Other (of Rescheduling of Case Management Conference) filed by PUENTES, MIGUEL. Filed By: PUENTES, MIGUEL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Compel Discovery (Motion to Compel Further Responses to Plaintiff) filed by PUENTES, MIGUEL. Filed By: PUENTES, MIGUEL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration - Other (in support of Motion to Compel Further Responses to Plaintiff) filed by PUENTES, MIGUEL. Filed By: PUENTES, MIGUEL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSeparate Statement (in support of Motion to Compel Further Responses to Plaintiff) filed by PUENTES, MIGUEL. Filed By: PUENTES, MIGUEL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order (in support of Motion to Compel Further Responses to Plaintiff) submitted by PUENTES, MIGUEL received but not filed on 08/24/2021. Filed By: PUENTES, MIGUEL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketDiscovery Hearing scheduled for 02/18/2022 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in C-67 Eddie C Sturgeon.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketThe Civil Case Management Conference was rescheduled to 02/18/2022 at 09:00:00 AM in C-67 before Eddie C Sturgeon at Central.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 02/18/2022 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in C-67 Eddie C Sturgeon.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by American Honda Motor Company Inc. Filed By: American Honda Motor Company Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by PUENTES, MIGUEL. Filed By: PUENTES, MIGUEL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 02/18/2022 at 10:30:00 AM at Central in C-67 Eddie C Sturgeon.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by PUENTES, MIGUEL. Refers to: American Honda Motor Company Inc Filed By: PUENTES, MIGUEL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by PUENTES, MIGUEL. Refers to: American Honda Motor Company Inc Filed By: PUENTES, MIGUEL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by PUENTES, MIGUEL. Refers to: American Honda Motor Company Inc Filed By: PUENTES, MIGUEL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Sturgeon, Eddie.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO. INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BECK BENJEMAN