This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 04/17/2020 at 03:50:04 (UTC).

PS Business Parks LP vs Red Unicorn

Case Summary

On 02/13/2020 PS Business Parks LP filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Red Unicorn. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Gregory W Pollack. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Gregory W Pollack

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PS Business Parks LP

Defendants

Morgan, Daniel

RED Unicorn LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Brisco, Todd A

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service of 10-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute

Proof of Service of 10-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by PS Business Parks LP. Refers to: Morgan, Daniel; RED Unicorn LLC

Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000

Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by PS Business Parks LP. Refers to: RED Unicorn LLC; Morgan, Daniel

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by PS Business Parks LP. Refers to: RED Unicorn LLC

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by PS Business Parks LP. Refers to: RED Unicorn LLC

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/17/2020
  • HearingLocation: C-71; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 10-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by PS Business Parks LP. Refers to: Morgan, Daniel; RED Unicorn LLC Filed By: PS Business Parks LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 07/17/2020 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-71 Gregory W Pollack.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by PS Business Parks LP. Refers to: RED Unicorn LLC; Morgan, Daniel Filed By: PS Business Parks LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by PS Business Parks LP. Refers to: RED Unicorn LLC Filed By: PS Business Parks LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by PS Business Parks LP. Refers to: RED Unicorn LLC Filed By: PS Business Parks LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Pollack, Gregory.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.