This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 04/08/2018 at 22:34:11 (UTC).

Providence Hospitality Partners LLC vs. Pandey Hotel Denver LLC

Case Summary

On 11/21/2014 Providence Hospitality Partners LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Pandey Hotel Denver LLC. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JOEL M. PRESSMAN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    11/21/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

JOEL M. PRESSMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

Providence Hospitality Partners LLC

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

Pandey Hotel Corporation

Pandey Hotel Denver LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

Balfour, Elizabeth S

12275 El Camino Real Ste 200

San Diego, CA 92130-2006

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

ADAMS, MARK S

Attorney at JEFFER MANGELS BUTLER & MITCHELL LLP

3 Park Plaza 1100

Irvine, CA 92614

 

Court Documents

Notice of Dismissal by Court SD

Notice of Dismissal by Court SD generated.

Minute Order

Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Pandey Hotel Denver LLC.

Answer

Answer filed by Providence Hospitality Partners LLC.

Cross-Complaint

Cross-Complaint filed by Pandey Hotel Denver LLC. Refers to: Providence Hospitality Partners LLC

Notice of Confirmation of Filing SD

E-filing transaction partially accepted.

Answer

[Another document for ROA# 11]

Answer

Answer filed by Pandey Hotel Denver LLC; Pandey Hotel Corporation.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Providence Hospitality Partners LLC.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Providence Hospitality Partners LLC.

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Providence Hospitality Partners LLC. Refers to: Pandey Hotel Denver LLC; Pandey Hotel Corporation

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Providence Hospitality Partners LLC. Refers to: Pandey Hotel Denver LLC; Pandey Hotel Corporation

Complaint

Complaint filed by Providence Hospitality Partners LLC. Refers to: Pandey Hotel Denver LLC; Pandey Hotel Corporation

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/07/2015
  • Cross-Complaint dismissed without prejudice as to Pandey Hotel Denver LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • Cross-Complaint dismissed without prejudice as to Providence Hospitality Partners LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • Complaint dismissed without prejudice as to Providence Hospitality Partners LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • Complaint dismissed without prejudice as to Pandey Hotel Corporation.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • Complaint dismissed without prejudice as to Pandey Hotel Denver LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2015
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 05/01/2015 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-66 Joel M. Pressman was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Dismissal by Court SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Statement filed by Pandey Hotel Denver LLC. Filed By: Pandey Hotel Denver LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer filed by Providence Hospitality Partners LLC. Filed By: Providence Hospitality Partners LLC (Cross - Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 01/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer filed by Pandey Hotel Denver LLC; Pandey Hotel Corporation. Filed By: Pandey Hotel Denver LLC (Defendant); Pandey Hotel Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service filed by Providence Hospitality Partners LLC. Filed By: Providence Hospitality Partners LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service filed by Providence Hospitality Partners LLC. Filed By: Providence Hospitality Partners LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2014
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 05/01/2015 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-66 Joel M. Pressman.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2014
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Pressman, Joel.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2014
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Summons filed by Providence Hospitality Partners LLC. Refers to: Pandey Hotel Denver LLC; Pandey Hotel Corporation Filed By: Providence Hospitality Partners LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Providence Hospitality Partners LLC. Refers to: Pandey Hotel Denver LLC; Pandey Hotel Corporation Filed By: Providence Hospitality Partners LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed by Providence Hospitality Partners LLC. Refers to: Pandey Hotel Denver LLC; Pandey Hotel Corporation Filed By: Providence Hospitality Partners LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Providence Hospitality Partners LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where PANDEY HOTEL CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ADAMS MARK SAMUEL