This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 08/29/2019 at 03:54:22 (UTC).

Providence Hospitality Partners LLC vs. Pandey Hotel Denver LLC

Case Summary

On 04/15/2014 Providence Hospitality Partners LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Pandey Hotel Denver LLC. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JOHN S. MEYER. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

JOHN S. MEYER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Providence Hospitality Partners LLC

Defendants

GP Hotel Dallas LLC

Pandey Hotel Corporation

Pandey Hotel Denver LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Balfour, Elizabeth S

Attorney at SHEPPARD MULLIN RICHTER & HAMPTON LLP

12275 El Camino Real Ste 200

San Diego, CA 92130

 

Court Documents

Complaint

Complaint filed by Providence Hospitality Partners LLC. Refers to: Pandey Hotel Denver LLC; GP Hotel Dallas LLC; Pandey Hotel Corporation

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Providence Hospitality Partners LLC. Refers to: Pandey Hotel Denver LLC; GP Hotel Dallas LLC; Pandey Hotel Corporation

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Providence Hospitality Partners LLC. Refers to: Pandey Hotel Denver LLC; GP Hotel Dallas LLC; Pandey Hotel Corporation

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

Amended Complaint

Amended Complaint (First) filed by Providence Hospitality Partners LLC. Refers to: Pandey Hotel Denver LLC; GP Hotel Dallas LLC; Pandey Hotel Corporation

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Providence Hospitality Partners LLC. Refers to: GP Hotel Dallas LLC

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Providence Hospitality Partners LLC. Refers to: Pandey Hotel Corporation

Request for Entry of Default

Request for Entry of Default filed by Providence Hospitality Partners LLC. Refers to: GP Hotel Dallas LLC; Pandey Hotel Corporation

Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party (Not Entered) filed by Providence Hospitality Partners LLC.

Request - Other

Application for Entry of Judgment filed by Providence Hospitality Partners LLC.

Declaration - Other

Declaration - Other (of Catherine A Hance) filed by Providence Hospitality Partners LLC.

Notice - Other

Declaration - Other (Summary of Case) filed by Providence Hospitality Partners LLC.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Providence Hospitality Partners LLC.

Declaration - Other

Declaration - Other (of Elizabeth S Balfour) filed by Providence Hospitality Partners LLC.

Declaration - Other

Declaration - Other (of David B Storm) filed by Providence Hospitality Partners LLC.

Notice to Filing Party SD

Judgment by Default by Court submitted by Providence Hospitality Partners LLC rejected on 09/18/2014.

Declaration - Other

[Another document for ROA# 22]

Notice - Other

[Another document for ROA# 22]

33 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Stipulation - Other - Fee Due (Joint Stipulation and Order to Vacate Judgment and Dismiss Action) filed by Providence Hospitality Partners LLC; GP Hotel Dallas LLC. Filed By: Providence Hospitality Partners LLC (Plaintiff); GP Hotel Dallas LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2015
  • Amended Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Providence Hospitality Partners LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2015
  • Amended Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to GP Hotel Dallas LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment filed by Providence Hospitality Partners LLC. Filed By: Providence Hospitality Partners LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Judgment by Default by Court filed by Providence Hospitality Partners LLC. Refers to: GP Hotel Dallas LLC Filed By: Providence Hospitality Partners LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2014
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 01/23/2015 at 09:30:00 AM at Central in C-61 John S. Meyer was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2014
  • Judgment was entered as follows: Judgment entered for Providence Hospitality Partners LLC and against GP Hotel Dallas LLC for $ 69480.82, punitive damages: $ 0.00, attorney fees: $ 0.00, interest: $ 6871.15, prejudgment costs: $ 580.00, other costs: $ 0.00, amount payable to court: $ .00, for a grand total of $ 76931.97.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2014
  • Amended Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Pandey Hotel Denver LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2014
  • Amended Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Pandey Hotel Corporation.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Application for Entry of Judgment (Approved as to form only) filed by Providence Hospitality Partners LLC. Refers to: GP Hotel Dallas LLC Filed By: Providence Hospitality Partners LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
36 More Docket Entries
  • 05/01/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service filed by Providence Hospitality Partners LLC. Refers to: Pandey Hotel Corporation Filed By: Providence Hospitality Partners LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service filed by Providence Hospitality Partners LLC. Refers to: GP Hotel Dallas LLC Filed By: Providence Hospitality Partners LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Amended Complaint (First) filed by Providence Hospitality Partners LLC. Refers to: Pandey Hotel Denver LLC; GP Hotel Dallas LLC; Pandey Hotel Corporation Filed By: Providence Hospitality Partners LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2014
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 01/23/2015 at 09:30:00 AM at Central in C-61 John S. Meyer.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2014
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Meyer, John.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2014
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Providence Hospitality Partners LLC. Refers to: Pandey Hotel Denver LLC; GP Hotel Dallas LLC; Pandey Hotel Corporation Filed By: Providence Hospitality Partners LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Summons filed by Providence Hospitality Partners LLC. Refers to: Pandey Hotel Denver LLC; GP Hotel Dallas LLC; Pandey Hotel Corporation Filed By: Providence Hospitality Partners LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed by Providence Hospitality Partners LLC. Refers to: Pandey Hotel Denver LLC; GP Hotel Dallas LLC; Pandey Hotel Corporation Filed By: Providence Hospitality Partners LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GP HOTEL DALLAS, LLC D/B/A LOVE FIELD HOTEL AND SUITES is a litigant

Latest cases where Providence Hospitality Partners LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Balfour, Elizabeth S