This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 04/11/2018 at 07:23:57 (UTC).

Prolien Services LLC vs Schack

Case Summary

On 04/27/2015 Prolien Services LLC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Schack. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, North County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ROBERT P DAHLQUIST and RONALD F. FRAZIER. The case status is Other - Consolidated.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************R-NC

  • Filing Date:

    04/27/2015

  • Case Status:

    Other - Consolidated

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North County Regional Center

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judges

ROBERT P DAHLQUIST

RONALD F. FRAZIER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

Prolien Services LLC

Baker Quality Construction

Baker, Randy

K and M Contracting, Inc.

Peterson, Jared

Quintrall, Albert

Schaul, Kimball

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

BURNS, JEANNE ; AKA : Burns, Jeanne M

Schack, Kathy

BURNS, JEANNE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

Peterson, Jared

7801 Mission Center Court

San Diego, CA 92108

PETERSON, JARED D

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF JARED PETERSON

5353 Mission Center Road 202

San Diego, CA 92108

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

Spreter, Geoffrey J

Attorney at SPRETER LEGAL SERVICES APC

402 W Broadway 860

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Reassignment SD

Case reassigned from Dahlquist,Robert to Frazier,Ronald effective 03/04/2017

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

Cross-Complaint

Cross-Complaint filed by Schack, Kathy; BURNS, JEANNE. Refers to: Baker, Randy; Schaul, Kimball; Quintrall, Albert; Peterson, Jared; K and M Contracting, Inc.; Baker Quality Construction; Prolien Services LLC

Answer

Answer filed by BURNS, JEANNE; Schack, Kathy.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by BURNS, JEANNE; Schack, Kathy.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Schack, Kathy; BURNS, JEANNE. Refers to: Quintrall, Albert

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Schack, Kathy; BURNS, JEANNE. Refers to: Schaul, Kimball

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Schack, Kathy; BURNS, JEANNE. Refers to: Peterson, Jared

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Schack, Kathy; BURNS, JEANNE. Refers to: Baker Quality Construction

Request for Entry of Default

Request for Entry of Default filed by Schack, Kathy; BURNS, JEANNE. Refers to: Quintrall, Albert; Prolien Services LLC

Request for Entry of Default

Request for Entry of Default (NOT ENTERED AS TO K & M) filed by Schack, Kathy; BURNS, JEANNE. Refers to: Schaul, Kimball; K and M Contracting, Inc.

Request for Entry of Default

Request for Entry of Default (NOT ENTERED) filed by Schack, Kathy; BURNS, JEANNE. Refers to: Peterson, Jared; K and M Contracting, Inc.

Request for Entry of Default

Request for Entry of Default filed by Schack, Kathy; BURNS, JEANNE. Refers to: Baker, Randy; Baker Quality Construction

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Schack, Kathy; BURNS, JEANNE.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.

Request for Entry of Default

Request for Entry of Default (APPROVED FORM ONLY) filed by Schack, Kathy; BURNS, JEANNE.

Notice of Confirmation of Filing SD

[Another document for ROA# 44]

Request for Dismissal of Does

E-filing transaction partially accepted.

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case reassigned from Dahlquist,Robert to Frazier,Ronald effective 03/04/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2015
  • Cases consolidated on 12/04/2015. 37-2015-00009987-CU-BC-NC is designated the lead case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2015
  • Demurrer / Motion to Strike scheduled for 02/19/2016 at 01:30:00 PM at North County in N-29 Robert P Dahlquist was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2015
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 03/04/2016 at 09:00:00 AM at North County in N-29 Robert P Dahlquist was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2015
  • Motion Hearing (Civil) scheduled for 01/08/2016 at 01:30:00 PM at North County in N-29 Robert P Dahlquist was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • E-filing transaction partially accepted.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • [Another document for ROA# 44]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • [Another document for ROA# 44]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Entry of Default (APPROVED FORM ONLY) filed by Schack, Kathy; BURNS, JEANNE. Filed By: Schack, Kathy (Cross - Complainant); BURNS, JEANNE (Cross - Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal of Does filed by Schack, Kathy; BURNS, JEANNE. Filed By: Schack, Kathy (Cross - Complainant); BURNS, JEANNE (Cross - Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 06/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service filed by BURNS, JEANNE; Schack, Kathy. Filed By: BURNS, JEANNE (Defendant); Schack, Kathy (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer filed by BURNS, JEANNE; Schack, Kathy. Filed By: BURNS, JEANNE (Defendant); Schack, Kathy (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Cross-Complaint filed by Schack, Kathy; BURNS, JEANNE. Refers to: Baker, Randy; Schaul, Kimball; Quintrall, Albert; Peterson, Jared; K and M Contracting, Inc.; Baker Quality Construction; Prolien Services LLC Filed By: Schack, Kathy (Cross - Complainant); BURNS, JEANNE (Cross - Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 10/02/2015 at 09:00:00 AM at North County in N-29 Robert P Dahlquist.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2015
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Dahlquist, Robert.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2015
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Prolien Services LLC. Refers to: Schack, Kathy; BURNS, JEANNE Filed By: Prolien Services LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Summons filed by Prolien Services LLC. Refers to: Schack, Kathy; BURNS, JEANNE Filed By: Prolien Services LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed by Prolien Services LLC. Refers to: Schack, Kathy; BURNS, JEANNE Filed By: Prolien Services LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.