This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 04/10/2018 at 22:25:25 (UTC).

Prolien Services LLC vs Schack

Case Summary

On 04/15/2015 Prolien Services LLC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Schack. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, North County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TIMOTHY M. CASSERLY. The case status is Other - Consolidated.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************R-NC

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2015

  • Case Status:

    Other - Consolidated

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North County Regional Center

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

TIMOTHY M. CASSERLY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

Prolien Services LLC

K and M Contacting, Inc.

Peterson, Jared

Quintrall, Albert

Schaul, Kimball

Zagami Inc

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

Schack, Kathy

BURNS, JEANNE

BURNS, JEANNE ; AKA : Burns, Jeanne M

K and M Contacting, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

Peterson, Jared D

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF JARED PETERSON

2003 S El Camino Real

Oceanside, CA 92054

KRAFT, PHILIP A

Attorney at PHILIP A KRAFT & ASSOCIATES

3234 Grey Hawk Ct

Carlsbad, CA 92010

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

Spreter, Geoffrey J

Attorney at SPRETER LEGAL SERVICES APC

402 W Broadway 860

San Diego, CA 92101

Cross Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

KRAFT, PHILIP A

Attorney at PHILIP A KRAFT & ASSOCIATES

3234 Grey Hawk Ct

Carlsbad, CA 92010

Spreter, Geoffrey J

Attorney at SPRETER LEGAL SERVICES APC

402 W Broadway 860

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Prolien Services LLC. Refers to: Schack, Kathy; BURNS, JEANNE

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Prolien Services LLC. Refers to: BURNS, JEANNE

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Schack, Kathy.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (X-COMPLAINT) filed by Schack, Kathy; BURNS, JEANNE. Refers to: Quintrall, Albert

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (X-COMPLAINT) filed by Schack, Kathy; BURNS, JEANNE. Refers to: Peterson, Jared

Motion to Consolidate Cases

Motion to Consolidate Cases (7/31/2015) filed by Schack, Kathy; BURNS, JEANNE.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

The Civil Case Management Conference was rescheduled to 09/25/2015 at 09:00:00 AM in N-31 before Timothy M. Casserly at North County.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Schack, Kathy; BURNS, JEANNE.

Request for Entry of Default

Request for Entry of Default (APPROVED FORM ONLY) filed by Schack, Kathy; BURNS, JEANNE. Refers to: Quintrall, Albert; Schaul, Kimball; Peterson, Jared; Zagami Inc; Prolien Services LLC; K and M Contacting, Inc.

Judgment by Default by Court

Judgment by Default by Court filed by Schack, Kathy; BURNS, JEANNE.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Schack, Kathy; BURNS, JEANNE.

Motion to Set Aside Default

Motion to Set Aside Default (10/16/15) filed by Prolien Services LLC; Quintrall, Albert; Peterson, Jared; K and M Contacting, Inc..

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.

Declaration - Other

Declaration - Other (10/16/15) filed by Schack, Kathy; BURNS, JEANNE.

Order - Other

Order - Other (10/16/15) submitted by Schack, Kathy; BURNS, JEANNE received but not filed on 10/02/2015.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 10/16/2015 01:30:00 PM.

Substitution of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney filed by Schaul, Kimball.

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/04/2015
  • Cases consolidated on 12/04/2015. 37-2015-00009987-CU-BC-NC is designated the lead case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2015
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 02/05/2016 at 09:00:00 AM at North County in N-31 Timothy M. Casserly was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2015
  • Demurrer / Motion to Strike scheduled for 01/08/2016 at 01:30:00 PM at North County in N-31 Timothy M. Casserly was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Substitution of Attorney filed by K and M Contacting, Inc.. Filed By: K and M Contacting, Inc. (Cross - Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Substitution of Attorney filed by Schaul, Kimball. Filed By: Schaul, Kimball (Cross - Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Demurrer (01/08/2016) filed by Prolien Services LLC. Filed By: Prolien Services LLC (Cross - Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 10/16/2015 01:30:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2015
  • Tentative Ruling for Motion Hearing (Civil) published.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Reply to Opposition of Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations filed by Zagami Inc; Prolien Services LLC; K and M Contacting, Inc.; Quintrall, Albert; Schaul, Kimball; Peterson, Jared. Filed By: Zagami Inc (Cross - Defendant); Prolien Services LLC (Cross - Defendant); K and M Contacting, Inc. (Cross - Defendant); Quintrall, Albert (Cross - Defendant); Schaul, Kimball (Cross - Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service (10/16/15) filed by Schack, Kathy; BURNS, JEANNE. Filed By: Schack, Kathy (Cross - Complainant); BURNS, JEANNE (Cross - Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
34 More Docket Entries
  • 06/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer filed by Schack, Kathy; BURNS, JEANNE. Filed By: Schack, Kathy (Defendant); BURNS, JEANNE (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Cross-Complaint filed by Schack, Kathy. Refers to: Prolien Services LLC; K and M Contacting, Inc.; Zagami Inc; Schaul, Kimball; Quintrall, Albert; Peterson, Jared Filed By: Schack, Kathy (Cross - Complainant); K and M Contacting, Inc. (Cross - Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Prolien Services LLC. Refers to: BURNS, JEANNE Filed By: Prolien Services LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2015
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 09/18/2015 at 09:00:00 AM at North County in N-31 Timothy M. Casserly.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2015
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Casserly, Timothy.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2015
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Summons filed by Prolien Services LLC. Refers to: Schack, Kathy; BURNS, JEANNE Filed By: Prolien Services LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Prolien Services LLC. Refers to: Schack, Kathy; BURNS, JEANNE Filed By: Prolien Services LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 filed by Prolien Services LLC. Refers to: Schack, Kathy; BURNS, JEANNE Filed By: Prolien Services LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.