This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 03/06/2018 at 01:25:03 (UTC).

Progressive Choice Insurance Company vs. Juan Brunette

Case Summary

On 03/05/2010 Progressive Choice Insurance Company filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Juan Brunette. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, South County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Satisfied.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************A-SC

  • Filing Date:

    03/05/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Satisfied

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South County Regional Center

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PROGRESSIVE CHOICE INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants

MASTERS, STEEL

BRUNETTE, JUAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEA, MICHAEL R

Attorney at NIVINSKUS LAW GROUP A LAW CORPORATION

134 W Wilshire Ave

Fullerton, CA 92832

Defendant Attorney

CANNON, PAUL B

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF RICHARD A GUIDO

700 Columbia St

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

Case File Contents as of 06/05/17 - volume 1 of 1

Case File Contents as of 06/05/17 - volume 1 of 1

Notice of Hearing SD

Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 09/29/2010 at 08:30:00 AM at South County in S-04 William S. Cannon.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 09/29/2010 08:30:00 AM.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Settlement Conference (Civil) heard 12/06/2010 01:30:00 PM.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Trial Readiness Conference (Civil) heard 01/21/2011 10:00:00 AM.

Notice of Hearing SD

Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 03/21/2011 at 08:30:00 AM at South County in S-04 William S. Cannon.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 03/21/2011 08:30:00 AM.

Notice of Hearing SD

Notice of Hearing SD generated.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Court Trial heard 05/26/2011 09:00:00 AM.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case File Contents as of 06/05/17 - volume 1 of 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2011
  • Satisfaction of Judgment - full filed by Progressive Choice Insurance Company. Refers to: Brunette, Juan; Masters, Steel Filed By: Progressive Choice Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2011
  • Judgment was entered as follows: Judgment entered for Progressive Choice Insurance Company and against Brunette, Juan ;Masters, Steel for $ 21618.32, punitive damages: $ 0.00, attorney fees: $ 0.00, interest: $ 4324.00, prejudgment costs: $ 468.00, other costs: $ 0.00, amount payable to court: $ .00, for a grand total of $ 26410.32.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2011
  • Judgment - by Court - After Trial (AND ORDER) filed by Progressive Choice Insurance Company. Refers to: Brunette, Juan; Masters, Steel Filed By: Progressive Choice Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2011
  • Declaration - Other (Declaration Pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure Section 98) filed by Progressive Choice Insurance Company. Filed By: Progressive Choice Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Civil Court Trial heard 05/26/2011 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2011
  • Judgment rendered, Plaintiff directed to prepare the judgment.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2011
  • The Court finds judgment on the Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 for Progressive Choice Insurance Company and against Juan Brunette, Steel Masters in the amount of: $21618.32 principal, $0 punitive damages, $0 attorney fees, $4324.00 interest, $0 prejudgment costs and $0 other costs.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2011
  • Judgment was recorded as follows: Judgment recorded for Progressive Choice Insurance Company and against Juan Brunette;Steel Masters for $ 21618.32, punitive damages: $ 0, attorney fees: $ 0, interest: $ 4324.00, prejudgment costs: $ 0, other costs: $ 0, amount payable to court: $ , for a grand total of $ 25942.32.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 09/29/2010
  • Trial Readiness Conference (Civil) scheduled for 01/21/2011 at 10:00AM before Judge William S. Cannon.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 09/29/2010 at 08:30:00 AM at South County in S-04 William S. Cannon.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2010
  • Answer filed by Brunette, Juan; Masters, Steel.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2010
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Progressive Choice Insurance Company. Refers to: Brunette, Juan Filed By: Progressive Choice Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2010
  • Certificate of Service filed by Progressive Choice Insurance Company. Filed By: Progressive Choice Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2010
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Progressive Choice Insurance Company. Refers to: Masters, Steel Filed By: Progressive Choice Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2010
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Cannon, William.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2010
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Progressive Choice Insurance Company. Refers to: Brunette, Juan; Masters, Steel Filed By: Progressive Choice Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2010
  • Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 filed by Progressive Choice Insurance Company. Refers to: Brunette, Juan; Masters, Steel Filed By: Progressive Choice Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2010
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.