This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 05/02/2019 at 12:39:00 (UTC).

Professional Collection Consultants vs. Beatrice Roy

Case Summary

On 08/06/2010 Professional Collection Consultants filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Beatrice Roy. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, South County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************L-SC

  • Filing Date:

    08/06/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South County Regional Center

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PROFESSIONAL COLLECTION CONSULTANTS

Defendant

ROY, BEATRICE ; AKA : CARBAJAL, BEATRICE

Assignee

Mid Valley Collections Bureau

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Assignee Attorney

GAREN, CLARK

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF CLARK GAREN

6700 S Centinela Avenue Third Floor

Culver City, CA 90230

 

Court Documents

Writ SD

Writ SD generated.

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed by Mid Valley Collections Bureau. Refers to: Roy, Beatrice

Notice to Filing Party SD

Writ of Execution submitted by Professional Collection Consultants rejected on 03/16/2012.

Writ of Execution

Writ of Execution filed by Mid Valley Collections Bureau. Refers to: Roy, Beatrice

Case File Contents as of 06/15/17 - volume 1 of 1

Case File Contents as of 06/15/17 - volume 1 of 1

Assignment of Judgment

Assignment of Judgment filed by Professional Collection Consultants. Refers to: Mid Valley Collections Bureau

Notice to Filing Party SD

Writ of Execution submitted by Professional Collection Consultants rejected on 04/18/2012. Refers to: Roy, Beatrice

Assignment of Judgment

Assignment of Judgment filed by Professional Collection Consultants. Refers to: Wireless Receivables Acquisition Group

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Execution filed by Mid Valley Collections Bureau. Refers to: Roy, Beatrice Filed By: Mid Valley Collections Bureau (Assignee)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed by Mid Valley Collections Bureau. Refers to: Roy, Beatrice Filed By: Mid Valley Collections Bureau (Assignee)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • **Writ of Execution Received**

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Assignment of Judgment filed by Professional Collection Consultants. Refers to: Mid Valley Collections Bureau Filed By: Professional Collection Consultants (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Assignment of Judgment filed by Professional Collection Consultants. Refers to: Wireless Receivables Acquisition Group Filed By: Professional Collection Consultants (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case File Contents as of 06/15/17 - volume 1 of 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2014
  • Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed by Professional Collection Consultants. Filed By: Professional Collection Consultants (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2015
  • Writ of Execution issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2014
  • Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed by Professional Collection Consultants. Refers to: Roy, Beatrice Filed By: Professional Collection Consultants (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2015
  • Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed by Professional Collection Consultants. Filed By: Professional Collection Consultants (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 11/09/2010
  • The default filed by Professional Collection Consultants was entered as to Roy, Beatrice on Complaint and Declaration Re: Reduced Filing Fees . Override feature used.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2010
  • Request for Entry of Default filed by Professional Collection Consultants. Refers to: Roy, Beatrice Filed By: Professional Collection Consultants (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2011
  • Judgment by Default by Court filed by Professional Collection Consultants. Refers to: Roy, Beatrice Filed By: Professional Collection Consultants (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2010
  • Location changed from File Bin to Court Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2010
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Professional Collection Consultants. Refers to: Roy, Beatrice Filed By: Professional Collection Consultants (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2010
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Cannon, William.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2010
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2010
  • Original Summons filed by Professional Collection Consultants. Refers to: Roy, Beatrice Filed By: Professional Collection Consultants (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2010
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Professional Collection Consultants. Refers to: Roy, Beatrice Filed By: Professional Collection Consultants (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2010
  • Complaint and Declaration Re: Reduced Filing Fees filed by Professional Collection Consultants. Refers to: Roy, Beatrice Filed By: Professional Collection Consultants (Plaintiff); Mid Valley Collections Bureau (Assignee)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.