This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 04/06/2018 at 18:08:00 (UTC).

PRESIDIO PLACE CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION vs. Weik

Case Summary

On 01/14/2014 PRESIDIO PLACE CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Weik. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RANDA TRAPP. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Satisfied.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Satisfied

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

RANDA TRAPP

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

PRESIDIO PLACE CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION

SCOTT PROPERTIES INC; DBA : SCOTT PROPERTIES

SCOTT, SHAWNA

LLT LOCKSMITH INC; ESA : LLT ENGINEERING SERVICES INC

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

ANWAR MOHEBI AS CO-TRUSTEE OF THE DAN J WEIK REVOCABLE TRUST DATED MARCH 25, 2008

ARREGUIN, ISIDRO

ASMIK TAKMAZYAN AS CO-TRUSTEE OF THE DAN J WEIK REVOCABLE TRUST DATED MARCH 25, 2008

BORGES, TONY

COOLIDGE GOODALL AS CO-TRUSTEE OF THE DAN J WEIK REVOCABLE TRUST DATED MARCH 25, 2008

DAN J WEIK AS TRUSTEE OF THE DAN J WEIK REVOCABLE TRUST DATED MARCH 25, 2008

GARY TORRENZE AS CO-TRUSTEE OF THE DAN J WEIK REVOCABLE TRUST DATED MARCH 25, 2008

GOODALL, COOLIDGE

ISIDRO ARREGUIN AS CO-TRUSTEE OF THE DAN J WEIK REVOCABLE TRUST DATED MARCH 25, 2008

KENNETH OLIVER AS CO-TRUSTEE OF THE DAN J WEIK REVOCABLE TRUST DATED MARCH 25, 2008

MOHEBI, ANWAR

OLIVER, KENNETH

TAKMAZYAN, ASMIK

TONY BORGES AS CO-TRUSTEE OF THE DAN J WEIK REVOCABLE TRUST DATED MARCH 25, 2008

TORRENZE, GARY

Weik, Dan J

3 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

Perez, Elisa M

Attorney at EPSTEN GRINNELL & HOWELL APC

10060-10080 Willow Creek Road

San Diego, CA 92131

STOGER, JUSTIN M

Attorney at EPSTEN GRINNELL & HOWELL APC

10200 Willow Creek Rd #100

San Diego, CA 92131

BURFENING, PETER J JR

ZUMWALT, DEBORA M

Attorney at EPSTEN GRINNELL & HOWELL APC

10200 Willow Creek Rd Ste 100

San Diego, CA 92131

SMITH, KEVIN D

BURFENING, PETER J

DAVIDSON, CHERYL D

Attorney at SUNDERLAND MCCUTCHAN LLP

11770 Bernardo Plaza Court 310

San Diego, CA 92128

Defendant Attorney

LEWIS, MICHAEL R

Attorney at LEWIS & HAM LLP

1425 W Foothill Blvd

Upland, CA 91786

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by PRESIDIO PLACE CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION. Refers to: Weik, Dan; DAN J WEIK AS TRUSTEE OF THE DAN J WEIK REVOCABLE TRUST DATED MARCH 25, 2008; BORGES, TONY; TONY BORGES AS CO-TRUSTEE OF THE DAN J WEIK REVOCABLE TRUST DATED MARCH 25, 2008; MOHEBI, ANWAR; ANWAR MOHEBI AS CO-TRUSTEE OF THE DAN J WEIK REVOCABLE TRUST DATED MARCH 25, 2008; GOODALL, COOLIDGE; COOLIDGE GOODALL AS CO-TRUSTEE OF THE DAN J WEIK REVOCABLE TRUST DATED MARCH 25, 2008; TORRENZE, GARY; GARY TORRENZE AS CO-TRUSTEE OF THE DAN J WEIK REVOCABLE TRUST DATED MARCH 25, 2008; ARREGUIN, ISIDRO; ISIDRO ARREGUIN AS CO-TRUSTEE OF THE DAN J WEIK REVOCABLE TRUST DATED MARCH 25, 2008; TAKMAZYAN, ASMIK; ASMIK TAKMAZYAN AS CO-TRUSTEE OF THE DAN J WEIK REVOCABLE TRUST DATED MARCH 25, 2008; OLIVER, KENNETH; KENNETH OLIVER AS CO-TRUSTEE OF THE DAN J WEIK REVOCABLE TRUST DATED MARCH 25, 2008

Proof of Personal Service - Petition

Proof of Personal Service - Petition filed by PRESIDIO PLACE CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION.

Cross-Complaint

Cross-Complaint filed by Weik, Dan J. Refers to: PRESIDIO PLACE CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION; Scott Properties Inc; Scott, Shawna; Scott, Daniel; LLT Locksmith Inc

Denied Request for Entry of Default

[Another document for ROA# 25]

Request for Entry of Default

Request for Entry of Default filed by PRESIDIO PLACE CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION. Refers to: DAN J WEIK AS TRUSTEE OF THE DAN J WEIK REVOCABLE TRUST DATED MARCH 25, 2008

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party filed by PRESIDIO PLACE CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION. Refers to: ASMIK TAKMAZYAN AS CO-TRUSTEE OF THE DAN J WEIK REVOCABLE TRUST DATED MARCH 25, 2008; TAKMAZYAN, ASMIK

Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail (Answer to Complaint and Cross Complaint) filed by Weik, Dan J. Refers to: PRESIDIO PLACE CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION

Answer

Answer filed by PRESIDIO PLACE CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION.

Association of Attorney

Association of Attorney filed by PRESIDIO PLACE CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION.

Notice of Change in Handling Attorney

Notice of Change in Handling Attorney filed by PRESIDIO PLACE CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Weik, Dan J.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by PRESIDIO PLACE CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION. Refers to: Scott Properties Inc

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Scott, Shawna; Scott, Daniel; Scott Properties Inc.

Notice of Entry of Dismissal

Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed by PRESIDIO PLACE CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Scott, Shawna; Scott, Daniel; Scott Properties Inc.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Weik, Dan J.

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Scott Properties Inc; Scott, Shawna; Scott, Daniel.

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel of Record

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel of Record filed by LLT Locksmith Inc.

80 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Execution Returned - Partially Satisfied filed by PRESIDIO PLACE CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION. Filed By: PRESIDIO PLACE CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service (as to ORder Granting Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel) filed by LLT Locksmith Inc. Filed By: LLT Locksmith Inc (Cross - Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Granting Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel filed by LLT Locksmith Inc. Filed By: LLT Locksmith Inc (Cross - Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 10/30/2015 11:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2015
  • Tentative Ruling for Motion Hearing (Civil) published.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service filed by LLT Locksmith Inc. Filed By: LLT Locksmith Inc (Cross - Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice - Other (of Non-Opposition to Motion) filed by LLT Locksmith Inc. Filed By: LLT Locksmith Inc (Cross - Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Satisfaction of Judgment - full filed by PRESIDIO PLACE CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION. Filed By: PRESIDIO PLACE CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party (NOT ENTERED) filed by Weik, Dan J. Refers to: PRESIDIO PLACE CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION Filed By: Weik, Dan J (Cross - Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2015
  • Cross-Complaint dismissed without prejudice as to Weik, Dan J .

    Read MoreRead Less
112 More Docket Entries
  • 01/31/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (ISIDRO ARREGUIN) filed by PRESIDIO PLACE CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION. Refers to: ARREGUIN, ISIDRO Filed By: PRESIDIO PLACE CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (GARY TORRENZE) filed by PRESIDIO PLACE CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION. Refers to: TORRENZE, GARY Filed By: PRESIDIO PLACE CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (COOLIDGE GOODALL) filed by PRESIDIO PLACE CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION. Refers to: GOODALL, COOLIDGE Filed By: PRESIDIO PLACE CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (KENNETH OLIVER) filed by PRESIDIO PLACE CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION. Refers to: OLIVER, KENNETH Filed By: PRESIDIO PLACE CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2014
  • Case assigned to Department C-07.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2014
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Summons filed by PRESIDIO PLACE CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION. Refers to: Weik, Dan; DAN J WEIK AS TRUSTEE OF THE DAN J WEIK REVOCABLE TRUST DATED MARCH 25, 2008; BORGES, TONY; TONY BORGES AS CO-TRUSTEE OF THE DAN J WEIK REVOCABLE TRUST DATED MARCH 25, 2008; MOHEBI, ANWAR; ANWAR MOHEBI AS CO-TRUSTEE OF THE DAN J WEIK REVOCABLE TRUST DATED MARCH 25, 2008; GOODALL, COOLIDGE; COOLIDGE GOODALL AS CO-TRUSTEE OF THE DAN J WEIK REVOCABLE TRUST DATED MARCH 25, 2008; TORRENZE, GARY; GARY TORRENZE AS CO-TRUSTEE OF THE DAN J WEIK REVOCABLE TRUST DATED MARCH 25, 2008; ARREGUIN, ISIDRO; ISIDRO ARREGUIN AS CO-TRUSTEE OF THE DAN J WEIK REVOCABLE TRUST DATED MARCH 25, 2008; TAKMAZYAN, ASMIK; ASMIK TAKMAZYAN AS CO-TRUSTEE OF THE DAN J WEIK REVOCABLE TRUST DATED MARCH 25, 2008; OLIVER, KENNETH; KENNETH OLIVER AS CO-TRUSTEE OF THE DAN J WEIK REVOCABLE TRUST DATED MARCH 25, 2008 Filed By: PRESIDIO PLACE CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by PRESIDIO PLACE CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION. Refers to: Weik, Dan; DAN J WEIK AS TRUSTEE OF THE DAN J WEIK REVOCABLE TRUST DATED MARCH 25, 2008; BORGES, TONY; TONY BORGES AS CO-TRUSTEE OF THE DAN J WEIK REVOCABLE TRUST DATED MARCH 25, 2008; MOHEBI, ANWAR; ANWAR MOHEBI AS CO-TRUSTEE OF THE DAN J WEIK REVOCABLE TRUST DATED MARCH 25, 2008; GOODALL, COOLIDGE; COOLIDGE GOODALL AS CO-TRUSTEE OF THE DAN J WEIK REVOCABLE TRUST DATED MARCH 25, 2008; TORRENZE, GARY; GARY TORRENZE AS CO-TRUSTEE OF THE DAN J WEIK REVOCABLE TRUST DATED MARCH 25, 2008; ARREGUIN, ISIDRO; ISIDRO ARREGUIN AS CO-TRUSTEE OF THE DAN J WEIK REVOCABLE TRUST DATED MARCH 25, 2008; TAKMAZYAN, ASMIK; ASMIK TAKMAZYAN AS CO-TRUSTEE OF THE DAN J WEIK REVOCABLE TRUST DATED MARCH 25, 2008; OLIVER, KENNETH; KENNETH OLIVER AS CO-TRUSTEE OF THE DAN J WEIK REVOCABLE TRUST DATED MARCH 25, 2008 Filed By: PRESIDIO PLACE CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 filed by PRESIDIO PLACE CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION. Refers to: Weik, Dan; DAN J WEIK AS TRUSTEE OF THE DAN J WEIK REVOCABLE TRUST DATED MARCH 25, 2008; BORGES, TONY; TONY BORGES AS CO-TRUSTEE OF THE DAN J WEIK REVOCABLE TRUST DATED MARCH 25, 2008; MOHEBI, ANWAR; ANWAR MOHEBI AS CO-TRUSTEE OF THE DAN J WEIK REVOCABLE TRUST DATED MARCH 25, 2008; GOODALL, COOLIDGE; COOLIDGE GOODALL AS CO-TRUSTEE OF THE DAN J WEIK REVOCABLE TRUST DATED MARCH 25, 2008; TORRENZE, GARY; GARY TORRENZE AS CO-TRUSTEE OF THE DAN J WEIK REVOCABLE TRUST DATED MARCH 25, 2008; ARREGUIN, ISIDRO; ISIDRO ARREGUIN AS CO-TRUSTEE OF THE DAN J WEIK REVOCABLE TRUST DATED MARCH 25, 2008; TAKMAZYAN, ASMIK; ASMIK TAKMAZYAN AS CO-TRUSTEE OF THE DAN J WEIK REVOCABLE TRUST DATED MARCH 25, 2008; OLIVER, KENNETH; KENNETH OLIVER AS CO-TRUSTEE OF THE DAN J WEIK REVOCABLE TRUST DATED MARCH 25, 2008 Filed By: PRESIDIO PLACE CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less