This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 03/27/2021 at 07:39:41 (UTC).

PREFERRED CONTRACTORS INSURANCE COMPANY RISK RETENTION GROUP LLC vs ROLDAN

Case Summary

On 01/26/2021 PREFERRED CONTRACTORS INSURANCE COMPANY RISK RETENTION GROUP LLC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against ROLDAN. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kenneth J Medel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    01/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kenneth J Medel

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Preferred Contractors Insurance Company Risk Retention Group LLC

United Specialty Insurance Company

Defendants

Justice Investors LP

A Roldan Construction Inc

Roldan, Aan M

Roldan, Adan M

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Schmitthenner, Christian W

Attorney at LINCOLN GUSTAFSON & CERCOS LLP

 

Court Documents

Amended Complaint

Amended Complaint (First) filed by Preferred Contractors Insurance Company Risk Retention Group LLC; United Specialty Insurance Company. Refers to: Roldan, Adan; A Roldan Construction Inc; Justice Investors LP

Complaint

Complaint filed by Preferred Contractors Insurance Company Risk Retention Group LLC; United Specialty Insurance Company. Refers to: Roldan, Aan; A Roldan Construction Inc; Justice Investors LP

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Preferred Contractors Insurance Company Risk Retention Group LLC; United Specialty Insurance Company. Refers to: Roldan, Aan; A Roldan Construction Inc; Justice Investors LP

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Preferred Contractors Insurance Company Risk Retention Group LLC; United Specialty Insurance Company. Refers to: Roldan, Aan; A Roldan Construction Inc; Justice Investors LP

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/10/2021
  • HearingLocation: C-66; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Complaint (First) filed by Preferred Contractors Insurance Company Risk Retention Group LLC; United Specialty Insurance Company. Refers to: Roldan, Adan; A Roldan Construction Inc; Justice Investors LP Filed By: Preferred Contractors Insurance Company Risk Retention Group LLC (Plaintiff); United Specialty Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 09/10/2021 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-66 Kenneth J Medel.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Preferred Contractors Insurance Company Risk Retention Group LLC; United Specialty Insurance Company. Refers to: Roldan, Adan; A Roldan Construction Inc; Justice Investors LP Filed By: Preferred Contractors Insurance Company Risk Retention Group LLC (Plaintiff); United Specialty Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Preferred Contractors Insurance Company Risk Retention Group LLC; United Specialty Insurance Company. Refers to: Roldan, Adan; A Roldan Construction Inc; Justice Investors LP Filed By: Preferred Contractors Insurance Company Risk Retention Group LLC (Plaintiff); United Specialty Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Preferred Contractors Insurance Company Risk Retention Group LLC; United Specialty Insurance Company. Refers to: Roldan, Adan; A Roldan Construction Inc; Justice Investors LP Filed By: Preferred Contractors Insurance Company Risk Retention Group LLC (Plaintiff); United Specialty Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Medel, Kenneth.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Preferred Contractors Insurance Company Risk Retention Group LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where UNITED SPECIALTY INS. CO. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHMITTHENNER CHRISTIAN