This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 05/01/2019 at 05:19:41 (UTC).

Precision Pool Tiling Inc vs. Matthew McCormick

Case Summary

On 09/23/2010 Precision Pool Tiling Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Matthew McCormick. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, South County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KENNETH J MEDEL. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************C-SC

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South County Regional Center

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

KENNETH J MEDEL

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MOSLEY, STACIE

MOSLEY, SHANE

PRECISION POOL TILING INC

Defendant

MCCORMICK, MATTHEW

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

YALE, EUGENE P

Attorney at YALE & BAUMGARTEN LLP

1450 Frazee Road 403

San Diego, CA 92108

 

Court Documents

Case File Contents as of 06/05/17 - volume 1 of 1

Case File Contents as of 06/05/17 - volume 1 of 1

Notice to Filing Party SD

The default was denied as to McCormick, Matthew on Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Precision Pool Tiling Inc; Mosley, Shane; Mosley, Stacie .

Notice of Hearing SD

OSC - Failure to File Certificate of Service scheduled for 03/16/2011 at 08:30:00 AM at South County in S-04 William S. Cannon.

Notice of Hearing SD

OSC - Failure to File Judgment scheduled for 09/08/2011 at 08:30:00 AM at South County in S-04 William S. Cannon.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for OSC - Failure to File Judgment heard 09/08/2011 08:30:00 AM.

Notice of Hearing SD

OSC - Failure to File Judgment scheduled for 02/02/2012 at 08:30:00 AM at South County in S-04 William S. Cannon.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for OSC - Failure to File Judgment heard 02/02/2012 08:30:00 AM.

Notice of Case Reassignment SD

Case reassigned from Cannon,William to Medel,Kenneth effective 02/25/2012

Minute Order

Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 05/31/2012 08:30:00 AM.

Notice to Filing Party SD

Judgment by Default by Court submitted by Precision Pool Tiling Inc; Mosley, Shane; Mosley, Stacie rejected on 06/20/2012. Refers to: McCormick, Matthew

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case File Contents as of 06/05/17 - volume 1 of 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2012
  • Judgment was entered as follows: Judgment entered for Mosley, Shane ;Mosley, Stacie ;Precision Pool Tiling Inc and against McCormick, Matthew for $ 7040.00, punitive damages: $ 0.00, attorney fees: $ 0.00, interest: $ 1057.64, prejudgment costs: $ 313.89, other costs: $ 0.00, amount payable to court: $ .00, for a grand total of $ 8411.53.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2012
  • Judgment by Default by Court filed by Precision Pool Tiling Inc; Mosley, Shane; Mosley, Stacie. Refers to: McCormick, Matthew Filed By: Precision Pool Tiling Inc (Plaintiff); Mosley, Shane (Plaintiff); Mosley, Stacie (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • Application for Entry of Judgment filed by Precision Pool Tiling Inc; Mosley, Shane; Mosley, Stacie. Refers to: McCormick, Matthew Filed By: Precision Pool Tiling Inc (Plaintiff); Mosley, Shane (Plaintiff); Mosley, Stacie (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2012
  • Case sent to Judge Medel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2012
  • Case located in Court Judgment Bin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Judgment by Default by Court submitted by Precision Pool Tiling Inc; Mosley, Shane; Mosley, Stacie rejected on 06/20/2012. Refers to: McCormick, Matthew Filed By: Precision Pool Tiling Inc (Plaintiff); Mosley, Shane (Plaintiff); Mosley, Stacie (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2012
  • Declarations in Support of Default Judgment by Court CCP 585(d) (corrections needed) filed by Precision Pool Tiling Inc; Mosley, Shane; Mosley, Stacie. Filed By: Precision Pool Tiling Inc (Plaintiff); Mosley, Shane (Plaintiff); Mosley, Stacie (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2012
  • Application for Entry of Judgment filed by Precision Pool Tiling Inc; Mosley, Shane; Mosley, Stacie. Refers to: McCormick, Matthew Filed By: Precision Pool Tiling Inc (Plaintiff); Mosley, Shane (Plaintiff); Mosley, Stacie (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2012
  • Case located in Court Judgment Bin

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 02/17/2011
  • The default filed by Precision Pool Tiling Inc; Mosley, Shane; Mosley, Stacie was entered as to McCormick, Matthew on Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 . Override feature used.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2011
  • Request for Entry of Default filed by Precision Pool Tiling Inc; Mosley, Shane; Mosley, Stacie. Refers to: McCormick, Matthew Filed By: Precision Pool Tiling Inc (Plaintiff); Mosley, Shane (Plaintiff); Mosley, Stacie (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • OSC - Failure to File Certificate of Service scheduled for 03/16/2011 at 08:30:00 AM at South County in S-04 William S. Cannon.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • The default was denied as to McCormick, Matthew on Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Precision Pool Tiling Inc; Mosley, Shane; Mosley, Stacie .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2010
  • Request for Entry of Default filed by Precision Pool Tiling Inc; Mosley, Shane; Mosley, Stacie. Refers to: McCormick, Matthew Filed By: Precision Pool Tiling Inc (Plaintiff); Mosley, Shane (Plaintiff); Mosley, Stacie (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2010
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Cannon, William.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2010
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2010
  • Original Summons filed by Precision Pool Tiling Inc; Mosley, Shane; Mosley, Stacie. Refers to: McCormick, Matthew Filed By: Precision Pool Tiling Inc (Plaintiff); Mosley, Shane (Plaintiff); Mosley, Stacie (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2010
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Precision Pool Tiling Inc; Mosley, Shane; Mosley, Stacie. Refers to: McCormick, Matthew Filed By: Precision Pool Tiling Inc (Plaintiff); Mosley, Shane (Plaintiff); Mosley, Stacie (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2010
  • Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Precision Pool Tiling Inc; Mosley, Shane; Mosley, Stacie. Refers to: McCormick, Matthew Filed By: Precision Pool Tiling Inc (Plaintiff); Mosley, Shane (Plaintiff); Mosley, Stacie (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.