This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 08/07/2022 at 10:13:03 (UTC).

POWELL VS THE CITY OF CHULA VISTA

Case Summary

On 05/03/2022 POWELL filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against THE CITY OF CHULA VISTA. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Joel R. Wohlfeil. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    05/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Joel R. Wohlfeil

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

POWELL, JUDITH

Defendants and Cross Defendants

MONTECITO AT OTAY RANCH COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

THE CITY OF CHULA VISTA

THE WALTERS MANAGEMENT COMPANY

Cross Plaintiff

City of Chula Vista

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joseph, James

Attorney at JUREWITZ LAW GROUP

600 B Street 1450

San Diego, CA 92101

Cross Plaintiff Attorney

Yang, Rebecca Y

Attorney at CITY OF CHULA VISTA

276 4Th Ave

Chula Vista, CA 91910

 

Court Documents

Complaint

Complaint filed by POWELL, JUDITH. Refers to: THE CITY OF CHULA VISTA; MONTECITO AT OTAY RANCH COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION; THE WALTERS MANAGEMENT COMPANY

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by POWELL, JUDITH. Refers to: THE CITY OF CHULA VISTA; MONTECITO AT OTAY RANCH COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION; THE WALTERS MANAGEMENT COMPANY

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by POWELL, JUDITH. Refers to: THE CITY OF CHULA VISTA; MONTECITO AT OTAY RANCH COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION; THE WALTERS MANAGEMENT COMPANY

Consent to Electronic Service and Notice of Electronic Service Address

Consent to Electronic Service and Notice of Electronic Service Address filed by POWELL, JUDITH. Refers to: THE CITY OF CHULA VISTA; MONTECITO AT OTAY RANCH COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION; THE WALTERS MANAGEMENT COMPANY

Notice of Remote Appearance

Notice of Remote Appearance filed by POWELL, JUDITH. Refers to: THE CITY OF CHULA VISTA; MONTECITO AT OTAY RANCH COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION; THE WALTERS MANAGEMENT COMPANY

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 9]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 9]

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer or File Responsive Pleading and [Proposed] Order

Stipulation - Other - Fee Due (to Extend Time to Answer and Order Signed 6/27/22) filed by THE CITY OF CHULA VISTA; POWELL, JUDITH; MONTECITO AT OTAY RANCH COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION; THE WALTERS MANAGEMENT COMPANY.

Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer or File Responsive Pleading and [Proposed] Order

Stipulation - Other - Fee Due (to Extend Time to Answer and Order Signed 7/11/22) filed by THE CITY OF CHULA VISTA; POWELL, JUDITH; MONTECITO AT OTAY RANCH COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION; THE WALTERS MANAGEMENT COMPANY.

Answer of City of Chula Vista to Complaint

Answer filed by City of Chula Vista.

Original Summons on Cross-Complaint

Original Summons (CROSS COMPLAINT) filed by City of Chula Vista. Refers to: MONTECITO AT OTAY RANCH COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION; THE WALTERS MANAGEMENT COMPANY

Cross-Complaint of City of Chula Vista

Cross-Complaint filed by City of Chula Vista. Refers to: MONTECITO AT OTAY RANCH COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION; THE WALTERS MANAGEMENT COMPANY

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/07/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-73; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCross-Complaint filed by City of Chula Vista. Refers to: MONTECITO AT OTAY RANCH COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION; THE WALTERS MANAGEMENT COMPANY; Filed By: City of Chula Vista (Cross - Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons (CROSS COMPLAINT) filed by City of Chula Vista. Refers to: MONTECITO AT OTAY RANCH COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION; THE WALTERS MANAGEMENT COMPANY; Filed By: City of Chula Vista (Cross - Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by City of Chula Vista.; Filed By: City of Chula Vista (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation - Other - Fee Due (to Extend Time to Answer and Order Signed 7/11/22) filed by THE CITY OF CHULA VISTA; POWELL, JUDITH; MONTECITO AT OTAY RANCH COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION; THE WALTERS MANAGEMENT COMPANY.; Filed By: THE CITY OF CHULA VISTA (Defendant); POWELL, JUDITH (Plaintiff); MONTECITO AT OTAY RANCH COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION (Defendant); THE WALTERS MANAGEMENT COMPANY (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation - Other - Fee Due (to Extend Time to Answer and Order Signed 6/27/22) filed by THE CITY OF CHULA VISTA; POWELL, JUDITH; MONTECITO AT OTAY RANCH COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION; THE WALTERS MANAGEMENT COMPANY.; Filed By: THE CITY OF CHULA VISTA (Defendant); POWELL, JUDITH (Plaintiff); MONTECITO AT OTAY RANCH COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION (Defendant); THE WALTERS MANAGEMENT COMPANY (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 10/07/2022 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-73 Joel R. Wohlfeil.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Wohlfeil, Joel.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearance filed by POWELL, JUDITH. Refers to: THE CITY OF CHULA VISTA; MONTECITO AT OTAY RANCH COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION; THE WALTERS MANAGEMENT COMPANY; Filed By: POWELL, JUDITH (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketConsent to Electronic Service and Notice of Electronic Service Address filed by POWELL, JUDITH. Refers to: THE CITY OF CHULA VISTA; MONTECITO AT OTAY RANCH COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION; THE WALTERS MANAGEMENT COMPANY; Filed By: POWELL, JUDITH (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by POWELL, JUDITH. Refers to: THE CITY OF CHULA VISTA; MONTECITO AT OTAY RANCH COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION; THE WALTERS MANAGEMENT COMPANY; Filed By: POWELL, JUDITH (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by POWELL, JUDITH. Refers to: THE CITY OF CHULA VISTA; MONTECITO AT OTAY RANCH COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION; THE WALTERS MANAGEMENT COMPANY; Filed By: POWELL, JUDITH (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by POWELL, JUDITH. Refers to: THE CITY OF CHULA VISTA; MONTECITO AT OTAY RANCH COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION; THE WALTERS MANAGEMENT COMPANY; Filed By: POWELL, JUDITH (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Montecito At Otay Ranch Community Association is a litigant

Latest cases where Walters Management is a litigant