This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 05/05/2019 at 05:23:26 (UTC).

Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC vs. Guildner

Case Summary

On 02/10/2012 Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Guildner. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, East County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************L-EC

  • Filing Date:

    02/10/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    East County Regional Center

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC

Defendant

Guildner, Cheryl

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Kohler, Kristen

BRINKERHOFF, KRISTEN L

Attorney at PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC

120 Corporate Blvd

Norfolk, VA 23502

 

Court Documents

Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000

Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC. Refers to: Guildner, Cheryl

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC. Refers to: Guildner, Cheryl

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Collections SD

Case initiation form printed.

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC. Refers to: Guildner, Cheryl

Request for Dismissal of Does

Request for Dismissal of Does filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC.

Declarations in Support of Application for Default Judgment by Clerk

Declarations in Support of Application for Default Judgment by Clerk filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC. Refers to: Guildner, Cheryl

Request for Entry of Default

Request for Entry of Default filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC. Refers to: Guildner, Cheryl

Notice to Filing Party SD

Judgment by Default by Clerk submitted by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC rejected on 04/03/2012. Refers to: Guildner, Cheryl

Notice to Filing Party SD

Judgment by Default by Clerk (and Supporting Documents) submitted by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC rejected on 08/29/2012. Refers to: Guildner, Cheryl

Application for Entry of Judgment

Application for Entry of Judgment filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC. Refers to: Guildner, Cheryl

Declarations in Support of Application for Default Judgment by Clerk

Declarations in Support of Application for Default Judgment by Clerk filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC. Refers to: Guildner, Cheryl

Judgment by Default by Clerk

Judgment by Default by Clerk filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC. Refers to: Guildner, Cheryl

Proof of Service

Proof of Service (Judgment) filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC. Refers to: Guildner, Cheryl

Writ of Execution issued

Writ of Execution issued.

Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied

Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC.

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC. Filed By: Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Execution issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2014
  • *****WRIT RECEIVED*****

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2014
  • *****WRIT RECEIVED*****

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service (Judgment) filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2012
  • Judgment was entered as follows: Judgment entered for Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC and against Guildner, Cheryl for $ 6072.40, punitive damages: $ 0.00, attorney fees: $ 0.00, interest: $ 883.12, prejudgment costs: $ 280.00, other costs: $ 0.00, amount payable to court: $ .00, for a grand total of $ 7235.52.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Judgment by Default by Clerk filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Declarations in Support of Application for Default Judgment by Clerk filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Application for Entry of Judgment filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Judgment by Default by Clerk (and Supporting Documents) submitted by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC rejected on 08/29/2012.

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 04/02/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Entry of Default filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC. Refers to: Guildner, Cheryl Filed By: Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Declarations in Support of Application for Default Judgment by Clerk filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC. Refers to: Guildner, Cheryl Filed By: Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal of Does filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC. Filed By: Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Summons filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC. Filed By: Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2012
  • Case assigned to Department E-21.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2012
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC. Refers to: Guildner, Cheryl Filed By: Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC. Refers to: Guildner, Cheryl Filed By: Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.