This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 11/16/2023 at 11:21:43 (UTC).

Porter vs FCA US LLC

Case Summary

On 11/15/2022 Porter filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against FCA US LLC. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kenneth J Medel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    11/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kenneth J Medel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Porter, Amy

Defendants

FCA US LLC

SUNROAD MC AUTO INC; DBA : SAN DIEGO CHRYSLER DODGE JEEP RAM;ESA : SAN DIEGO CHRYSLER DODGE JEEP RAM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Dolin, Tionna

Defendant Attorney

Sentlinger, Eric N

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Multiple Events heard 08/25/2023 09:30:00 AM.

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minutes Only) SD

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minutes Only) SD generated.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 07/21/2023 08:30:00 AM.

Case Management Statement (Case Management)

Case Management Statement filed by FCA US LLC.

Case Management Statement (Case Management)

Case Management Statement filed by Porter, Amy.

Case Management Statement (Case Management)

Case Management Statement filed by FCA US LLC.

Tentative Rulings

Tentative Ruling for Motion Hearing (Civil) published.

Case Management Statement (Case Management)

Case Management Statement filed by Porter, Amy.

Case Management Statement (Case Management)

Case Management Statement filed by FCA US LLC.

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Porter, Amy.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Porter, Amy.

Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice - Other (Notice of Case Management Conference) filed by Porter, Amy.

Declaration - Other (Declarations/Affidavits/Statements)

Declaration - Other filed by SUNROAD MC AUTO INC.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities (Declarations/Affidavits/Statements)

Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by SUNROAD MC AUTO INC.

Proposed Order (Motions)

Proposed Order submitted by SUNROAD MC AUTO INC received but not filed on 03/09/2023.

Motion to Compel Discovery (Motions)

Motion - Other (To Compel Arbitration) filed by SUNROAD MC AUTO INC.

Declaration - Other (Declarations/Affidavits/Statements)

Declaration - Other filed by FCA US LLC.

Peremptory Challenge (Challenge)

Peremptory Challenge filed by FCA US LLC.

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

10/16/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCase Management Statement filed by Porter, Amy.; Filed By: Porter, Amy (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/12/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCase Management Statement filed by FCA US LLC.; Filed By: FCA US LLC (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketMinutes finalized for Multiple Events heard 08/25/2023 09:30:00 AM.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/25/2023

DocketCivil Case Management Conference continued pursuant to party's motion to 10/27/2023 at 08:30AM before Judge Kenneth J Medel.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/24/2023
View Court Documents

DocketTentative Ruling for Motion Hearing (Civil) published.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/21/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCase Management Statement filed by FCA US LLC.; Filed By: FCA US LLC (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/14/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCase Management Statement filed by Porter, Amy.; Filed By: Porter, Amy (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/21/2023
View Court Documents

DocketClerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minutes Only) SD generated.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/21/2023
View Court Documents

DocketMinutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 07/21/2023 08:30:00 AM.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/21/2023

DocketCivil Case Management Conference continued pursuant to Court's motion to 08/25/2023 at 09:30AM before Judge Kenneth J Medel.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
15 More Docket Entries
12/19/2022
View Court Documents

DocketAnswer filed by FCA US LLC; SUNROAD MC AUTO INC.; Filed By: FCA US LLC (Defendant); SUNROAD MC AUTO INC (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/01/2022
View Court Documents

DocketProof of Service filed by Porter, Amy.; Filed By: Porter, Amy (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/18/2022
View Court Documents

DocketProof of Service filed by Porter, Amy.; Filed By: Porter, Amy (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/16/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCase initiation form printed.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/16/2022

DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 07/07/2023 at 10:30:00 AM at Central in C-67 Eddie C Sturgeon.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/16/2022

DocketSummons issued.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/15/2022

DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Sturgeon, Eddie.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/15/2022
View Court Documents

DocketOriginal Summons filed by Porter, Amy. Refers to: FCA US LLC; SUNROAD MC AUTO INC; Filed By: Porter, Amy (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/15/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Porter, Amy. Refers to: FCA US LLC; SUNROAD MC AUTO INC; Filed By: Porter, Amy (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/15/2022
View Court Documents

DocketComplaint filed by Porter, Amy. Refers to: FCA US LLC; SUNROAD MC AUTO INC; Filed By: Porter, Amy (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less