This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 06/28/2020 at 01:55:00 (UTC).

Ponce vs Vivint Solar Developer LLC

Case Summary

On 02/14/2020 Ponce filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Vivint Solar Developer LLC. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The case status is Pending - Trial.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Trial

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Ponce, Ernesto Ramos

de Ponce, Blanca Isabel Reyes

Defendants

Enerev LLC

Vivint Solar Developer LLC

 

Court Documents

Notice of Hearing SD

Small Claims Court Trial scheduled for 05/20/2020 at 08:00:00 AM at Central in C-63 was vacated.

Proof of Service of Claim and Order to Defendant - Certified Mail by Clerk

Proof of Service of Claim and Order to Defendant - Certified Mail by Clerk (Enerev LLC) filed by Ponce, Ernesto Ramos. Refers to: Enerev LLC

Proof of Service of Claim and Order to Defendant - Certified Mail by Clerk

Proof of Service of Claim and Order to Defendant - Certified Mail by Clerk (Vivint Solar Developer LLC) filed by Ponce, Ernesto Ramos. Refers to: Vivint Solar Developer LLC

Declaration of Due Diligence

Declaration of Due Diligence filed by de Ponce, Blanca Isabel Reyes; Ponce, Ernesto Ramos. Refers to: Enerev LLC

Application and Order Correcting Court Record

Application and Order Correcting Court Record (Granted 02/27/2020) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court filed by Ponce, Ponce Ramos; de Ponce, Blanca Isabel Reyes. Refers to: Vivint Solar Developer LLC; Enerev LLC

Interpreter Request

Interpreter Request (Language: Spanish) filed by Ponce, Ponce Ramos; de Ponce, Blanca Isabel Reyes.

Order on Court Fee Waiver

Order on Court Fee Waiver filed by Ponce, Ernesto Ramos.

Order on Court Fee Waiver

Order on Court Fee Waiver filed by de Ponce, Blanca Isabel Reyes.

Notice of Case Assignment Small Claims SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Case Assignment Small Claims SD

Notice of Case Assignment Small Claims SD generated.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial scheduled for 05/20/2020 at 08:00:00 AM at Central in C-63 was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Claim and Order to Defendant - Certified Mail by Clerk (Enerev LLC) filed by Ponce, Ernesto Ramos. Refers to: Enerev LLC Filed By: Ponce, Ernesto Ramos (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Claim and Order to Defendant - Certified Mail by Clerk (Vivint Solar Developer LLC) filed by Ponce, Ernesto Ramos. Refers to: Vivint Solar Developer LLC Filed By: Ponce, Ernesto Ramos (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration of Due Diligence filed by de Ponce, Blanca Isabel Reyes; Ponce, Ernesto Ramos. Refers to: Enerev LLC Filed By: de Ponce, Blanca Isabel Reyes (Plaintiff); Ponce, Ernesto Ramos (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication and Order Correcting Court Record (Granted 02/27/2020) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court filed by Ponce, Ponce Ramos; de Ponce, Blanca Isabel Reyes. Refers to: Vivint Solar Developer LLC; Enerev LLC Filed By: Ponce, Ernesto Ramos (Plaintiff); de Ponce, Blanca Isabel Reyes (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees filed by Ponce, Ponce Ramos; de Ponce, Blanca Isabel Reyes. Filed By: Ponce, Ernesto Ramos (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInterpreter Request (Language: Spanish) filed by Ponce, Ponce Ramos; de Ponce, Blanca Isabel Reyes. Filed By: Ponce, Ernesto Ramos (Plaintiff); de Ponce, Blanca Isabel Reyes (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Department C-63.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial scheduled for 05/20/2020 at 08:00:00 AM at Central in C-63 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver filed by Ponce, Ernesto Ramos. Filed By: Ponce, Ernesto Ramos (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees filed by de Ponce, Blanca Isabel Reyes. Filed By: de Ponce, Blanca Isabel Reyes (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver filed by de Ponce, Blanca Isabel Reyes. Filed By: de Ponce, Blanca Isabel Reyes (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment Small Claims SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketCertified Mail Green Card Tracking Numbers (Enerev LLC) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketCertified Mail Green Card Tracking Numbers (Vivint Solar Developer LLC) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.

    Read MoreRead Less