Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 01/05/2021 at 19:50:24 (UTC).

Poiset vs Spire

Case Summary

On 09/17/2019 Poiset filed a Family - Harassment lawsuit against Spire. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, North County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************R-NC

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Harassment

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North County Regional Center

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Poiset, Matthew

Respondent

Spire, Eric Ryan

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

SORENSEN, ASHBY CLARK

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver, filed by Poiset, Matthew, on 10/09/2019, has expired.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver, filed by Poiset, Matthew, on 10/09/2019, has expired.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver filed by Poiset, Matthew. Refers to: Spire, Eric Filed By: Poiset, Matthew (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketRestraining order as requested denied with prejudice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Hearing on Restraining Order heard 12/20/2019 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketRequest - Other (Request for Court Reporter) filed by Poiset, Matthew. Filed By: Poiset, Matthew (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service - Petition (Affidavit of Unsuccessful Service) filed by Poiset, Matthew. Refers to: Spire, Eric Filed By: Poiset, Matthew (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • DocketOrder on Request to Continue Hearing filed by Poiset, Matthew. Filed By: Poiset, Matthew (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • DocketResponse to Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders filed by Spire, Eric Ryan. Filed By: Spire, Eric Ryan (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketApplication - Other (AND ORDER DECLARING INFORMATION ON AFFIDAVIT OF VOTER REGISTRATION CONFIDENTIAL) filed by Poiset, Matthew. Filed By: Poiset, Matthew (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 10/09/2019
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (granted) filed by Poiset, Matthew. Filed By: Poiset, Matthew (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • DocketDeclaration of Due Diligence filed by Poiset, Matthew. Refers to: Spire, Eric Filed By: Poiset, Matthew (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • DocketRequest for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders (Civil Harassment Prevention) filed by Poiset, Matthew. Refers to: Spire, Eric Filed By: Poiset, Matthew (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Poiset, Matthew. Refers to: Spire, Eric Filed By: Poiset, Matthew (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Department N-02.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order filed by Poiset, Matthew. Refers to: Spire, Eric Filed By: Poiset, Matthew (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • DocketNotice of Court Hearing filed by Poiset, Matthew. Refers to: Spire, Eric Filed By: Poiset, Matthew (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • DocketHearing on Restraining Order scheduled for 10/11/2019 at 08:30:00 AM at North County in N-02 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • DocketMiscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.

    Read MoreRead Less