This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 08/23/2021 at 10:58:53 (UTC).

PNC Equipment Finance LLC vs Bruneau

Case Summary

On 05/25/2021 PNC Equipment Finance LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Bruneau. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kenneth J Medel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    05/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kenneth J Medel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PNC Equipment Finance LLC

Defendant

BRUNEAU, DARRELL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ITO, KEN I

 

Court Documents

Declaration - In Support of Writ of Possession

Declaration - Other filed by PNC Equipment Finance LLC.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities

Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by PNC Equipment Finance LLC.

Application for Writ of Possession

Application for Writ of Possession filed by PNC Equipment Finance LLC.

Notice of Application for Writ of Possession and Hearing

Notice of Application for Writ of Possession and Hearing filed by PNC Equipment Finance LLC.

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by PNC Equipment Finance LLC. Refers to: BRUNEAU, DARRELL

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by PNC Equipment Finance LLC. Refers to: BRUNEAU, DARRELL

Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000

Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 filed by PNC Equipment Finance LLC. Refers to: BRUNEAU, DARRELL

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-66; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • HearingLocation: C-66; Event Type: Motion Hearing (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketMotion Hearing (Civil) scheduled for 11/05/2021 at 09:30:00 AM at Central in C-66 Kenneth J Medel.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 01/28/2022 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-66 Kenneth J Medel.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Application for Writ of Possession and Hearing filed by PNC Equipment Finance LLC. Filed By: PNC Equipment Finance LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication for Writ of Possession filed by PNC Equipment Finance LLC. Filed By: PNC Equipment Finance LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum of Points and Authorities filed by PNC Equipment Finance LLC. Filed By: PNC Equipment Finance LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration - Other filed by PNC Equipment Finance LLC. Filed By: PNC Equipment Finance LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 filed by PNC Equipment Finance LLC. Refers to: BRUNEAU, DARRELL Filed By: PNC Equipment Finance LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by PNC Equipment Finance LLC. Refers to: BRUNEAU, DARRELL Filed By: PNC Equipment Finance LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by PNC Equipment Finance LLC. Refers to: BRUNEAU, DARRELL Filed By: PNC Equipment Finance LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Medel, Kenneth.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PNC EQUIPMENT FINANCE LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY SUCCESSOR BY ASSIGNMENT FROM ELEMENT FINANCIAL CORP. AND FROM ECN FINANCIAL LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ITO KEN I.