This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 08:47:46 (UTC).

Plummer Wax Jr vs McMillin Chambord 211 LLC

Case Summary

On 03/27/2015 Plummer Wax Jr filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against McMillin Chambord 211 LLC. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RONALD L. STYN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    03/27/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

RONALD L. STYN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Baca, Javier

Catabay, Rodrigo S

Catabay, Teresita J

Corral-Felix, Vinicio

PLUMMER JR, WAX

ROSS, ESTRELLITA

WAX, VIVIKA

MARTINEZ, GREG

POWERS, CHRISTINE

O'BRIEN, KEVIN

PARCEL, BRIAN

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

MCMILLIN FAIRHAVEN 121 LLC

Cross Defendants

ATRIUM DOOR AND WINDOW COMPANY OF ARIZONA INC

Alpine Plumbing & Backhoe Inc

Bay Sheet Metal Inc

Bernard & Hart Inc; DBA : Premier Glass

Coastal Concrete Innovations

Creative Touch Interiors Inc

RA HUGHES ENTERPRISES INC; DBA : HUGHES HEATING AND AIR CONDITIONING

PRO CON CONCRETE INC

28 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CHODZCO, MEGAN M

Attorney at SHINNICK & RYAN LLP

1650 N Hotel Circle 200

San Diego, CA 92108

CHODZKO, MEGAN M

Attorney at SHINNICK & RYAN LLP

1650 N Hotel Circle 200

San Diego, CA 92108

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

LILLIG, REBECCA M

11858 Bernardo Plaza Court Suite 11

San Diego, CA 92128

SIMPSON, JOHN A

11858 Bernardo Plaza Ct #110

San Diego, CA 92128

Cross Defendant Attorneys

LARSON, ERIC J

Attorney at LIEDLE LOUNSBERY LARSON & LIDL LLP

12520 High Bluff Drive 200

San Diego, CA 92130

SQUILLARO, THOMAS S

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF PEGAN & FRASER

650 W Macarthur Blvd

Santa Ana, CA 92707

HALL, DAVID M.

750 B Street 2550

San Diego, CA 92101

WASSER, SHAIN A

Attorney at ARCHER NORRIS

Macarthur Ct

Newport Beach, CA 92660

JONES, TODD A

333 University Avenue 200

Sacramento, CA 95825

Other Attorneys

SIEGEL, MARK S

First National Bank Center, 401 W A St

San Diego, CA 92101

MENESES, E VAL

1230 Columbia St #600

San Diego, CA 92101

RAPP, SUSAN H

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF WAGNER & ISERT KOTT

Swift Plaza Building A, 1655 Grant St

Concord, CA 94520

NAGPAL, VIK

Attorney at BREMER WHYTE BROWN & O MEARA LLP

501 W Broadway 1700

San Diego, CA 92101

PARKER, JAMES

Attorney at HUGO PARKER LLP One Front Street

One Front Street, 1 Front St

San Francisco, CA 94111

ALDEN, ERIC

Attorney at BREMER WHYTE BROWN & O MEARA LLP

501 W West Broadway 1700

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and POS -Pro Con

Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed by McMillin Fairhaven 121 LLC; McMillin Homes Construction Inc; McMillin Quintessa LLC.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by McMillin Homes Construction Inc; McMillin Fairhaven 121 LLC; McMillin Quintessa LLC. Refers to: Harlan Equipment Rental Inc

Notice of Association of Counsel

Association of Attorney filed by Saber Plumbing Inc.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by McMillin Homes Construction Inc; McMillin Fairhaven 121 LLC; McMillin Quintessa LLC. Refers to: Coastal Concrete Innovations

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Wax, Plummer Jr; Wax, Vivika; Baca, Javier; Jaquez De Baca, Magdelena; Catabay, Rodrigo S; Catabay, Teresita J; Corral-Felix, Vinicio; Light, Teresa; Loop, Thomas; Loop, Christine;OTHERS. Refers to: McMillin Chambord 211 LLC; McMillin Fairhaven 121 LLC; McMillin Quintessa LLC; McMillin Homes Construction Inc

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by McMillin Homes Construction Inc; McMillin Fairhaven 121 LLC; McMillin Quintessa LLC. Refers to: Bernard & Hart Inc

Notice of Association of Counsel

Association of Attorney filed by Framing Associates.

Request for Entry of Default

Request for Entry of Default filed by McMillin Fairhaven 121 LLC; McMillin Homes Construction Inc; McMillin Quintessa LLC. Refers to: Quality Tract Roofing Inc

Notice of Hearing SD

Civil Jury Trial scheduled for 12/01/2017 at 09:30:00 AM at Central in C-62 Ronald L. Styn.

Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party filed by Michael Ross and Estrallita Ross as trustees of The Micheal D & Estrellita C Ross Revocable 2008 Trust; Ross, Michael; Light, Teresa; Loop, Christine; Martinez, Greg; O'Brien, Kevin; Powers, Christine; Plummer, Wax Jr; Wax, Vivika; Baca, Javier;OTHERS. Refers to: McMillin Chambord 211 LLC

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by McMillin Homes Construction Inc; McMillin Fairhaven 121 LLC; McMillin Quintessa LLC. Refers to: Bay Sheet Metal Inc

Order for Determination of Good Faith Settlement

Order for Determination of Good Faith Settlement (Signed as modified) filed by Saber Plumbing Inc. Refers to: McMillin Chambord 211 LLC; McMillin Fairhaven 121 LLC; McMillin Quintessa LLC; McMillin Homes Construction Inc

Notice to Filing Party - Default SD

The default was denied as to Quality Tract Roofing Inc on Cross-Complaint filed by McMillin Homes Construction Inc; McMillin Fairhaven 121 LLC; McMillin Quintessa LLC .

Notice - Other

Notice of Ruling filed by Creative Touch Interiors Inc.

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Michael Ross and Estrallita Ross as trustees of The Micheal D & Estrellita C Ross Revocable 2008 Trust; Ross, Michael; Light, Teresa; Loop, Christine; Martinez, Greg; O'Brien, Kevin; Powers, Christine; Wax, Plummer Jr; Wax, Vivika; Baca, Javier;OTHERS.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by McMillin Fairhaven 121 LLC.

Certificate of Service

Certificate of Service filed by Michael Ross and Estrallita Ross as trustees of The Micheal D & Estrellita C Ross Revocable 2008 Trust; Ross, Michael; Light, Teresa; Loop, Christine; Martinez, Greg; O'Brien, Kevin; Powers, Christine; Wax, Plummer Jr; Wax, Vivika; Baca, Javier;OTHERS.

Request for Entry of Default

Request for Entry of Default filed by McMillin Fairhaven 121 LLC; McMillin Homes Construction Inc; McMillin Quintessa LLC. Refers to: Harlan Equipment Rental Inc

161 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Ruling filed by Creative Touch Interiors Inc. Filed By: Creative Touch Interiors Inc (Cross - Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • Cross-Complaint dismissed without prejudice as to Framing Associates.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • Cross-Complaint dismissed without prejudice as to Quality Tract Roofing Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • Cross-Complaint dismissed without prejudice as to RII PLASTERING, INC. dba RESIDENTIAL WALL SYSTEMS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • Cross-Complaint dismissed without prejudice as to Pro Con Concrete Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • Cross-Complaint dismissed without prejudice as to Magna Window Corporation.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • Cross-Complaint dismissed without prejudice as to Hunt For Tile Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • Cross-Complaint dismissed without prejudice as to Heintschel Plastering Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • Cross-Complaint dismissed without prejudice as to Harlan Equipment Rental Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • Cross-Complaint dismissed without prejudice as to Bay Sheet Metal Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
245 More Docket Entries
  • 08/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Statement filed by Michael Ross and Estrallita Ross as trustees of The Micheal D & Estrellita C Ross Revocable 2008 Trust; Ross, Michael; Light, Teresa; Loop, Christine; Martinez, Greg; O'Brien, Kevin; Powers, Christine; Wax, Plummer Jr; Wax, Vivika; Baca, Javier;OTHERS. Filed By: Michael Ross and Estrallita Ross as trustees of The Micheal D & Estrellita C Ross Revocable 2008 Trust (Plaintiff); Ross, Michael (Plaintiff); Light, Teresa (Plaintiff); Loop, Christine (Plaintiff); Martinez, Greg (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service filed by McMillin Homes Construction Inc; McMillin Fairhaven 121 LLC; McMillin Quintessa LLC. Filed By: McMillin Homes Construction Inc (Defendant); McMillin Fairhaven 121 LLC (Defendant); McMillin Quintessa LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer filed by McMillin Homes Construction Inc; McMillin Fairhaven 121 LLC; McMillin Quintessa LLC. Filed By: McMillin Homes Construction Inc (Defendant); McMillin Fairhaven 121 LLC (Defendant); McMillin Quintessa LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2015
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 09/04/2015 at 10:00:00 AM at Central in C-62 Ronald L. Styn.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2015
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Styn, Ronald.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2015
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Summons filed by Wax, Plummer Jr; Wax, Vivika; Baca, Javier; Jaquez De Baca, Magdelena; Catabay, Rodrigo S; Catabay, Teresita J; Corral-Felix, Vinicio; Light, Teresa; Loop, Thomas; Loop, Christine;OTHERS. Refers to: McMillin Chambord 211 LLC; McMillin Fairhaven 121 LLC; McMillin Quintessa LLC; McMillin Homes Construction Inc Filed By: Plummer, Wax Jr (Plaintiff); Wax, Vivika (Plaintiff); Baca, Javier (Plaintiff); Jaquez De Baca, Magdelena (Plaintiff); Catabay, Rodrigo S (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Wax, Plummer Jr; Wax, Vivika; Baca, Javier; Jaquez De Baca, Magdelena; Catabay, Rodrigo S; Catabay, Teresita J; Corral-Felix, Vinicio; Light, Teresa; Loop, Thomas; Loop, Christine;OTHERS. Refers to: McMillin Chambord 211 LLC; McMillin Fairhaven 121 LLC; McMillin Quintessa LLC; McMillin Homes Construction Inc Filed By: Plummer, Wax Jr (Plaintiff); Wax, Vivika (Plaintiff); Baca, Javier (Plaintiff); Jaquez De Baca, Magdelena (Plaintiff); Catabay, Rodrigo S (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed by Wax, Plummer Jr; Wax, Vivika; Baca, Javier; Jaquez De Baca, Magdelena; Catabay, Rodrigo S; Catabay, Teresita J; Corral-Felix, Vinicio; Light, Teresa; Loop, Thomas; Loop, Christine;OTHERS. Refers to: McMillin Chambord 211 LLC; McMillin Fairhaven 121 LLC; McMillin Quintessa LLC; McMillin Homes Construction Inc Filed By: Plummer, Wax Jr (Plaintiff); Wax, Vivika (Plaintiff); Baca, Javier (Plaintiff); Jaquez De Baca, Magdelena (Plaintiff); Catabay, Rodrigo S (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.