This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 11/28/2021 at 11:28:38 (UTC).

PITV LP vs SAKS & COMPANY LLC

Case Summary

On 12/04/2020 PITV LP filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against SAKS COMPANY LLC. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is John S. Meyer. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

John S. Meyer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PITV LP

Defendant

Saks & Company LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Fontaine, Justin

Attorney at PROCOPIO CORY HARGREAVES & SAVITCH LLP

525 B Street 2200

San Diego, CA 92101

Reed, Rebecca L

525 B Street 2200

San Diego, CA 92101

Defendant Attorneys

Dennis, Marissa M

Attorney at ALLEN MATKINS ET AL LLP

Tcw Tower, 865 S Figueroa St #2800

Los Angeles, CA 90017-2543

Kenney, Suzanne E.

One America Plaza, 600 W Broadway 27Th Floor

San Diego, CA 92101-0903

 

Court Documents

Stipulation - Other - Fee Due re Court Retention of Jurisdiction

Stipulation - Other - Fee Due (re Court Retention of Jurisdiction, Order signed 8/10/21) filed by PITV LP; Saks & Company LLC.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by PITV LP.

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by PITV LP.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by PITV LP; PITV LP.

Stipulation and order to Stay Proceedings

Stipulation - Other - Fee Due (and order to Stay Proceedings) filed by PITV LP; Saks & Company LLC.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by PITV LP.

Notice of Hearing SD

OSC - Why Case Should Not be Dismissed (Unlawful Detainer) scheduled for 04/09/2021 at 10:30:00 AM at Central in C-64 John S. Meyer.

Defendant Saks & Company LLCs Notice of Demurrer and Demurrer to Complaint for Unlawful Detainer; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Demurrer to Complaint for Unlawful Detainer

Demurrer filed by Saks & Company LLC.

Defendant Saks & Company LLCs Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Demurrer to Complaint for Unlawful Detainer

Request for Judicial Notice (in support of demurrer) filed by Saks & Company LLC.

Proof of Service re Defendant Saks & Company LLCs Demurrer to Complaint for Unlawful Detainer

Proof of Service (demurrer, request) filed by Saks & Company LLC.

Defendant Saks & Company LLCs Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings

Motion - Other (to compel arbitration and stay proceedings) filed by Saks & Company LLC.

Declaration of Marissa M Dennis in Support of Defendant Saks & Company LLCs Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings

Declaration - Other (of Marissa M Dennis in support of motion to compel arbitration and stay proceedings) filed by Saks & Company LLC.

Proof of Service re Defendant Saks & Company LLCs Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings

Proof of Service (motion, declaration) filed by Saks & Company LLC.

Supplemental Proof of Service re Defendant Saks & Company LLCs Demurrer to Complaint for Unlawful Detainer

Proof of Service by Mail (re Defendant Saks & Company LLCs Demurrer to Complaint for Unlawful Detainer) filed by Saks & Company LLC.

Supplemental Proof of Service re Defendant Saks & Company LLCs Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings

Proof of Service by Mail (re Defendant Saks & Company LLCs Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings) filed by Saks & Company LLC.

Complaint Unlawful Detainer

Complaint filed by PITV LP. Refers to: Saks & Company LLC

Plaintiff's Mandatory Cover Sheet and Supplemental Allegations-Unlawful Detainer

Plaintiff's Mandatory Cover Sheet and Supplemental Allegations-Unlawful Detainer filed by PITV LP. Refers to: Saks & Company LLC

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by PITV LP. Refers to: Saks & Company LLC

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by PITV LP. Filed By: PITV LP (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by PITV LP; PITV LP. Filed By: PITV LP (Plaintiff); PITV LP (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to Saks & Company LLC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to PITV LP.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation - Other - Fee Due (re Court Retention of Jurisdiction, Order signed 8/10/21) filed by PITV LP; Saks & Company LLC. Filed By: PITV LP (Plaintiff); Saks & Company LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by PITV LP. Filed By: PITV LP (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketMotion Hearing (Civil) scheduled for 04/09/2021 at 10:30:00 AM at Central in C-64 John S. Meyer was vacated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketDemurrer / Motion to Strike scheduled for 04/09/2021 at 10:30:00 AM at Central in C-64 John S. Meyer was vacated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation - Other - Fee Due (and order to Stay Proceedings) filed by PITV LP; Saks & Company LLC. Filed By: PITV LP (Plaintiff); Saks & Company LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by PITV LP. Filed By: PITV LP (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration - Other (of Marissa M Dennis in support of motion to compel arbitration and stay proceedings) filed by Saks & Company LLC. Filed By: Saks & Company LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service (motion, declaration) filed by Saks & Company LLC. Filed By: Saks & Company LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by PITV LP. Refers to: Saks & Company LLC Filed By: PITV LP (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by PITV LP. Refers to: Saks & Company LLC Filed By: PITV LP (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPlaintiff's Mandatory Cover Sheet and Supplemental Allegations-Unlawful Detainer filed by PITV LP. Refers to: Saks & Company LLC Filed By: PITV LP (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by PITV LP. Refers to: Saks & Company LLC Filed By: PITV LP (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by PITV LP. Refers to: Saks & Company LLC Filed By: PITV LP (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Meyer, John.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SAKS & COMPANY LLC. A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KENNEY SUZANNE E.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DENNIS, MARISSA M.