This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 08/11/2020 at 07:10:53 (UTC).

PIPELINE PRODUCTIONS INC vs THE MADISON COMPANIES LLC

Case Summary

On 12/19/2019 PIPELINE PRODUCTIONS INC filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against THE MADISON COMPANIES LLC. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Joel R. Wohlfeil. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    12/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Joel R. Wohlfeil

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BACKWOOD ENTERPRISES LLC

MOSIMAN, BRETT

PIPELINE PRODUCTIONS INC

PIPELINE TICKETING KC LLC

Defendants

Kaaboo Contract Services LLC n/k/a Eventpro Contract Services LLC

Kaaboo Del Mar LLC n/k/a Eventpro Del Mar LLC

Gordon, Bryan

VIRGIN FEST INVESTCO LLC

KSD OWNCO LLC; FKA : SAN DIEGO FEST OWNCO LLC

Kaabooworks Services LLC n/k/a Eventpro Services LLC

Wolkov, Seth

WARDAWGZ LLC

KB Eventpro LLC n/k/a Eventpro Production Services LLC

Kaaboo Management LLC n/k/a Eventpro Management LLC

Kaaboo Works LLC n/k/a Eventpro Works LLC

Horsepower Entertainment LLC

Kaaboo LLC n/k/a Surf's Up Legacy Partners LLC

VFLA EVENTCO LLC

Walker, Robert

VIRGIN FEST LLC

4 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Weiner, Michael H

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by PIPELINE PRODUCTIONS INC; BACKWOOD ENTERPRISES LLC; OK PRODUCTIONS INC; PIPELINE TICKETING KC LLC; MOSIMAN, BRETT. Refers to: The Madison Companies LLC; Horsepower Entertainment LLC; Kaaboo LLC n/k/a Surf's Up Legacy Partners LLC; Kaaboo Management LLC n/k/a Eventpro Management LLC; KB Eventpro LLC n/k/a Eventpro Production Services LLC; Kaaboo Del Mar LLC n/k/a Eventpro Del Mar LLC; Kaabooworks Services LLC n/k/a Eventpro Services LLC; Kaaboo Contract Services LLC n/k/a Eventpro Contract Services LLC; Kaaboo Works LLC n/k/a Eventpro Works LLC; WARDAWGZ LLC; VIRGIN FEST LLC; VIRGIN FEST INVESTCO LLC; VFLA EVENTCO LLC; KSD OWNCO LLC; Gordon, Bryan; Walker, Robert; Wolkov, Seth; FELTS, JASON; HAGLE, MARC

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by PIPELINE PRODUCTIONS INC; BACKWOOD ENTERPRISES LLC; OK PRODUCTIONS INC; PIPELINE TICKETING KC LLC; MOSIMAN, BRETT. Refers to: The Madison Companies LLC; Horsepower Entertainment LLC; Kaaboo LLC n/k/a Surf's Up Legacy Partners LLC; Kaaboo Management LLC n/k/a Eventpro Management LLC; KB Eventpro LLC n/k/a Eventpro Production Services LLC; Kaaboo Del Mar LLC n/k/a Eventpro Del Mar LLC; Kaabooworks Services LLC n/k/a Eventpro Services LLC; Kaaboo Contract Services LLC n/k/a Eventpro Contract Services LLC; Kaaboo Works LLC n/k/a Eventpro Works LLC; WARDAWGZ LLC; VIRGIN FEST LLC; VIRGIN FEST INVESTCO LLC; VFLA EVENTCO LLC; KSD OWNCO LLC; Gordon, Bryan; Walker, Robert; Wolkov, Seth; FELTS, JASON; HAGLE, MARC

Complaint

[A document for ROA# 1]

Ex Parte Application for Extension of Time to Serve Pleading and Orders

Ex Parte Application for Extension of Time to Serve Pleading and Orders filed by BACKWOOD ENTERPRISES LLC; MOSIMAN, BRETT; OK PRODUCTIONS INC; PIPELINE PRODUCTIONS INC; PIPELINE TICKETING KC LLC.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

The Civil Case Management Conference was rescheduled to 07/31/2020 at 02:00:00 PM in C-73 before Joel R. Wohlfeil at Central.

Ex Parte Application for Extension of Time to Serve Pleading and Orders

Ex Parte Application for Extension of Time to Serve Pleading and Orders filed by BACKWOOD ENTERPRISES LLC; MOSIMAN, BRETT; OK PRODUCTIONS INC; PIPELINE PRODUCTIONS INC; PIPELINE TICKETING KC LLC.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

Civil Case Management Conference rescheduled to 12/04/2020 at 02:00:00 PM in C-73 before Joel R. Wohlfeil at Central.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/04/2020
  • HearingLocation: C-73; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEx Parte Application for Extension of Time to Serve Pleading and Orders filed by BACKWOOD ENTERPRISES LLC; MOSIMAN, BRETT; OK PRODUCTIONS INC; PIPELINE PRODUCTIONS INC; PIPELINE TICKETING KC LLC. Filed By: BACKWOOD ENTERPRISES LLC (Plaintiff); MOSIMAN, BRETT (Plaintiff); OK PRODUCTIONS INC (Plaintiff); PIPELINE PRODUCTIONS INC (Plaintiff); PIPELINE TICKETING KC LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference rescheduled to 12/04/2020 at 02:00:00 PM in C-73 before Joel R. Wohlfeil at Central.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketThe Civil Case Management Conference was rescheduled to 07/31/2020 at 02:00:00 PM in C-73 before Joel R. Wohlfeil at Central.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 07/31/2020 at 02:00:00 PM at Central in C-73 Joel R. Wohlfeil.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEx Parte Application for Extension of Time to Serve Pleading and Orders filed by BACKWOOD ENTERPRISES LLC; MOSIMAN, BRETT; OK PRODUCTIONS INC; PIPELINE PRODUCTIONS INC; PIPELINE TICKETING KC LLC. Filed By: BACKWOOD ENTERPRISES LLC (Plaintiff); MOSIMAN, BRETT (Plaintiff); OK PRODUCTIONS INC (Plaintiff); PIPELINE PRODUCTIONS INC (Plaintiff); PIPELINE TICKETING KC LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 05/29/2020 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-73 Joel R. Wohlfeil.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[A document for ROA# 1]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketComplaint filed by PIPELINE PRODUCTIONS INC; BACKWOOD ENTERPRISES LLC; OK PRODUCTIONS INC; PIPELINE TICKETING KC LLC; MOSIMAN, BRETT. Refers to: The Madison Companies LLC; Horsepower Entertainment LLC; Kaaboo LLC n/k/a Surf's Up Legacy Partners LLC; Kaaboo Management LLC n/k/a Eventpro Management LLC; KB Eventpro LLC n/k/a Eventpro Production Services LLC; Kaaboo Del Mar LLC n/k/a Eventpro Del Mar LLC; Kaabooworks Services LLC n/k/a Eventpro Services LLC; Kaaboo Contract Services LLC n/k/a Eventpro Contract Services LLC; Kaaboo Works LLC n/k/a Eventpro Works LLC; WARDAWGZ LLC; VIRGIN FEST LLC; VIRGIN FEST INVESTCO LLC; VFLA EVENTCO LLC; KSD OWNCO LLC; Gordon, Bryan; Walker, Robert; Wolkov, Seth; FELTS, JASON; HAGLE, MARC Filed By: PIPELINE PRODUCTIONS INC (Plaintiff); BACKWOOD ENTERPRISES LLC (Plaintiff); OK PRODUCTIONS INC (Plaintiff); PIPELINE TICKETING KC LLC (Plaintiff); MOSIMAN, BRETT (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[A document for ROA# 2]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by PIPELINE PRODUCTIONS INC; BACKWOOD ENTERPRISES LLC; OK PRODUCTIONS INC; PIPELINE TICKETING KC LLC; MOSIMAN, BRETT. Refers to: The Madison Companies LLC; Horsepower Entertainment LLC; Kaaboo LLC n/k/a Surf's Up Legacy Partners LLC; Kaaboo Management LLC n/k/a Eventpro Management LLC; KB Eventpro LLC n/k/a Eventpro Production Services LLC; Kaaboo Del Mar LLC n/k/a Eventpro Del Mar LLC; Kaabooworks Services LLC n/k/a Eventpro Services LLC; Kaaboo Contract Services LLC n/k/a Eventpro Contract Services LLC; Kaaboo Works LLC n/k/a Eventpro Works LLC; WARDAWGZ LLC; VIRGIN FEST LLC; VIRGIN FEST INVESTCO LLC; VFLA EVENTCO LLC; KSD OWNCO LLC; Gordon, Bryan; Walker, Robert; Wolkov, Seth; FELTS, JASON; HAGLE, MARC Filed By: PIPELINE PRODUCTIONS INC (Plaintiff); BACKWOOD ENTERPRISES LLC (Plaintiff); OK PRODUCTIONS INC (Plaintiff); PIPELINE TICKETING KC LLC (Plaintiff); MOSIMAN, BRETT (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by PIPELINE PRODUCTIONS INC; BACKWOOD ENTERPRISES LLC; OK PRODUCTIONS INC; PIPELINE TICKETING KC LLC; MOSIMAN, BRETT. Refers to: The Madison Companies LLC; Horsepower Entertainment LLC; Kaaboo LLC n/k/a Surf's Up Legacy Partners LLC; Kaaboo Management LLC n/k/a Eventpro Management LLC; KB Eventpro LLC n/k/a Eventpro Production Services LLC; Kaaboo Del Mar LLC n/k/a Eventpro Del Mar LLC; Kaabooworks Services LLC n/k/a Eventpro Services LLC; Kaaboo Contract Services LLC n/k/a Eventpro Contract Services LLC; Kaaboo Works LLC n/k/a Eventpro Works LLC; WARDAWGZ LLC; VIRGIN FEST LLC; VIRGIN FEST INVESTCO LLC; VFLA EVENTCO LLC; KSD OWNCO LLC; Gordon, Bryan; Walker, Robert; Wolkov, Seth; FELTS, JASON; HAGLE, MARC Filed By: PIPELINE PRODUCTIONS INC (Plaintiff); BACKWOOD ENTERPRISES LLC (Plaintiff); OK PRODUCTIONS INC (Plaintiff); PIPELINE TICKETING KC LLC (Plaintiff); MOSIMAN, BRETT (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Wohlfeil, Joel.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less