Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 03/12/2021 at 04:41:56 (UTC).

PHILLIPS VS GLEIBERMAN PROPERTIES INC

Case Summary

On 10/13/2020 PHILLIPS filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against GLEIBERMAN PROPERTIES INC. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is John S. Meyer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    10/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

John S. Meyer

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Defendants

Russell, Niana

Brooks, Donnesha

Russell, Symphony

Phillips, Brittany

Gleiberman Properties Inc; DBA : MG PROPERTIES GROUP;DBA : MG WATERLEAF APARTMENTS SHL LLC;DBA : MG WATERLEAF APARTMENTS CDP LLC;DBA : MG WATERLEAF APARTMENTS GSP LLC;DBA : MG WATERLEAF APARTMENTS BSR LC

Guardian Ad Litem

Russell, Walter

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff, Guardian Ad Litem and Defendant Attorney

Thompson, Anthony D

 

Court Documents

Complaint

Complaint filed by Phillips, Brittany; Brooks, Donnesha; Russell, Niana; Russell, Symphony. Refers to: Gleiberman Properties Inc

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Phillips, Brittany; Brooks, Donnesha; Russell, Niana; Russell, Symphony. Refers to: Russell, Walter; Gleiberman Properties Inc

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Phillips, Brittany; Brooks, Donnesha; Russell, Niana; Russell, Symphony. Refers to: Russell, Walter; Gleiberman Properties Inc

Application and Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem

Application and Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem filed by Phillips, Brittany; Brooks, Donnesha; Russell, Niana; Russell, Symphony. Refers to: Russell, Niana

Application and Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem

Application and Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem filed by Phillips, Brittany; Brooks, Donnesha; Russell, Niana; Russell, Symphony. Refers to: Russell, Symphony

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 9]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 9]

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/25/2021
  • HearingLocation: C-64; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 06/25/2021 at 10:00:00 AM at Central in C-64 John S. Meyer.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication and Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem filed by Phillips, Brittany; Brooks, Donnesha; Russell, Niana; Russell, Symphony. Refers to: Russell, Niana Filed By: Russell, Walter (Guardian Ad Litem)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication and Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem filed by Phillips, Brittany; Brooks, Donnesha; Russell, Niana; Russell, Symphony. Refers to: Russell, Symphony Filed By: Russell, Walter (Guardian Ad Litem)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Phillips, Brittany; Brooks, Donnesha; Russell, Niana; Russell, Symphony. Refers to: Gleiberman Properties Inc Filed By: Phillips, Brittany (Plaintiff); Brooks, Donnesha (Plaintiff); Russell, Niana (Plaintiff); Russell, Symphony (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Phillips, Brittany; Brooks, Donnesha; Russell, Niana; Russell, Symphony. Refers to: Russell, Walter; Gleiberman Properties Inc Filed By: Phillips, Brittany (Plaintiff); Brooks, Donnesha (Plaintiff); Russell, Niana (Plaintiff); Russell, Symphony (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Phillips, Brittany; Brooks, Donnesha; Russell, Niana; Russell, Symphony. Refers to: Russell, Walter; Gleiberman Properties Inc Filed By: Phillips, Brittany (Plaintiff); Brooks, Donnesha (Plaintiff); Russell, Niana (Plaintiff); Russell, Symphony (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Meyer, John.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GLEIBERMAN PROP INC; DBA : MG PROPERTIES is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Thompson, Anthony D