This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 01/03/2022 at 08:08:01 (UTC).

Pettus VS Berge

Case Summary

On 10/05/2021 Pettus filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Berge. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Ronald F. Frazier. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    10/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Ronald F. Frazier

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Pettus, Elizabeth A

Defendants

Berge, Daniel Franklin

CSC Construction & Remodeling Inc; DBA : Supreme Handyman

Grygar, Steven Charles; DBA : S G CONSTRUCTION;DBA : SUPREME BUILDERS REMODELING & HANDYMAN SERVICES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Fahey, Richard L

4950 Waring Rd Unit 6

San Diego, CA 92120-2731

Defendant Attorneys

Rasmussen, Sara Lindsey

Attorney at STONE KALFUS LLP

5330 Carrol Canyon Road 200

San Diego, CA 92121

Letofsky, Larry D

Attorney at LETOFSKY MCCLAIN

3655 Nobel Drive 400

San Diego, CA 92122

MCCLAIN, ROBYN S

3655 Nobel Drive 400

San Diego, CA 92122

 

Court Documents

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Pettus, Elizabeth A. Refers to: Berge, Daniel; Grygar, Steven; CSC Construction & Remodeling Inc

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Pettus, Elizabeth A. Refers to: Berge, Daniel; Grygar, Steven; CSC Construction & Remodeling Inc

Complaint

Complaint filed by Pettus, Elizabeth A. Refers to: Berge, Daniel; Grygar, Steven; CSC Construction & Remodeling Inc

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Pettus, Elizabeth A. Refers to: Berge, Daniel

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Pettus, Elizabeth A. Refers to: CSC Construction & Remodeling Inc

Consent to Electronic Service and Notice of Electronic Service Address

Consent to Electronic Service and Notice of Electronic Service Address filed by CSC Construction & Remodeling Inc; Grygar, Steven Charles.

Consent to Electronic Service and Notice of Electronic Service Address

Consent to Electronic Service and Notice of Electronic Service Address filed by CSC Construction & Remodeling Inc; Grygar, Steven Charles.

Peremptory Challenge

Peremptory Challenge (Granted) filed by CSC Construction & Remodeling Inc; Grygar, Steven Charles.

Peremptory Challenge

Peremptory Challenge (Denied) filed by CSC Construction & Remodeling Inc; Grygar, Steven Charles.

Demand for Jury Trial

Demand for Jury Trial filed by CSC Construction & Remodeling Inc; Grygar, Steven Charles.

Answer

Answer filed by CSC Construction & Remodeling Inc; Grygar, Steven Charles.

Notice of Hearing SD

Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 05/20/2022 at 11:00:00 AM at Central in C-65 Ronald F. Frazier.

Notice of Case Reassignment SD

Case reassigned from Judge Caietti, Carolyn to Ronald Frazier effective 12/16/2021

Declaration of Sara L. Rasmussen re Inability to Meet & Confer Triggering Automatic 30-Day Extension_2021.12.09

Declaration of Meet and Confer filed by Berge, Daniel Franklin.

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/20/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-65; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference reassigned to Frazier, Ronald for 04/01/2022 at 09:15:00 AM in C-65 at Central.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 04/01/2022 at 09:15:00 AM at Central in C-65 Ronald F. Frazier was vacated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 05/20/2022 at 11:00:00 AM at Central in C-65 Ronald F. Frazier.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase reassigned from Judge Caietti, Carolyn to Ronald Frazier effective 12/16/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by CSC Construction & Remodeling Inc; Grygar, Steven Charles. Filed By: CSC Construction & Remodeling Inc (Defendant); Grygar, Steven Charles (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial filed by CSC Construction & Remodeling Inc; Grygar, Steven Charles. Filed By: CSC Construction & Remodeling Inc (Defendant); Grygar, Steven Charles (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPeremptory Challenge (Denied) filed by CSC Construction & Remodeling Inc; Grygar, Steven Charles. Filed By: CSC Construction & Remodeling Inc (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPeremptory Challenge (Granted) filed by CSC Construction & Remodeling Inc; Grygar, Steven Charles. Filed By: Grygar, Steven Charles (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketConsent to Electronic Service and Notice of Electronic Service Address filed by CSC Construction & Remodeling Inc; Grygar, Steven Charles. Filed By: CSC Construction & Remodeling Inc (Defendant); Grygar, Steven Charles (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration of Meet and Confer filed by Berge, Daniel Franklin. Filed By: Berge, Daniel Franklin (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Pettus, Elizabeth A. Refers to: CSC Construction & Remodeling Inc Filed By: Pettus, Elizabeth A (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Pettus, Elizabeth A. Refers to: Berge, Daniel Filed By: Pettus, Elizabeth A (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 04/01/2022 at 09:15:00 AM at Central in C-70 Carolyn Caietti.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Pettus, Elizabeth A. Refers to: Berge, Daniel; Grygar, Steven; CSC Construction & Remodeling Inc Filed By: Pettus, Elizabeth A (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Pettus, Elizabeth A. Refers to: Berge, Daniel; Grygar, Steven; CSC Construction & Remodeling Inc Filed By: Pettus, Elizabeth A (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Pettus, Elizabeth A. Refers to: Berge, Daniel; Grygar, Steven; CSC Construction & Remodeling Inc Filed By: Pettus, Elizabeth A (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Caietti, Carolyn.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Fahey, Richard L