Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 02/28/2021 at 02:28:54 (UTC).

Petition of Symetra Assigned Benefits Service Company

Case Summary

On 08/20/2020 Petition of Symetra Assigned Benefits Service Company was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, North County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Timothy M. Casserly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************T-NC

  • Filing Date:

    08/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North County Regional Center

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Timothy M. Casserly

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Symetra Assigned Benefits Service Company

Respondent

Shea, Patrick

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Sudano, Brian

Attorney at SUDANO LAW FIRM

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Hearing on Petition heard 10/16/2020 01:30:00 PM.

Proposed Order

Order - Other filed by Symetra Assigned Benefits Service Company.

Notice of Hearing for Court Approval of Transfer of Structured Settlement Payment Rights

Notice of Hearing (10/16/2020) filed by Symetra Assigned Benefits Service Company.

Declaration in support of petition for transfer of structured settlement payment rights

Declaration - Other (of Sabsco Executive 10/16/2020) filed by Symetra Assigned Benefits Service Company.

Proof of Service by Mail - Petition

Proof of Service by Mail - Petition (10/16/2020) filed by Symetra Assigned Benefits Service Company. Refers to: Shea, Patrick

Proposed Order approving transfer of structured settlement payment rights

Proposed Order (10/16/2020) submitted by Symetra Assigned Benefits Service Company received but not filed on 08/27/2020.

Petition for Court Approval of Transfer of Structured Settlement Payment Rights

Petition - Other filed by Symetra Assigned Benefits Service Company. Refers to: Shea, Patrick

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Symetra Assigned Benefits Service Company. Refers to: Shea, Patrick

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder - Other filed by Symetra Assigned Benefits Service Company. Filed By: Symetra Assigned Benefits Service Company (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketThe Petition for Court Approval of Transfer of Structured Settlement, was granted. Petitioner to submit new proposed order with modifications.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Hearing on Petition heard 10/16/2020 01:30:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketTentative Ruling for Hearing on Petition published.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing (10/16/2020) filed by Symetra Assigned Benefits Service Company. Filed By: Symetra Assigned Benefits Service Company (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration - Other (of Sabsco Executive 10/16/2020) filed by Symetra Assigned Benefits Service Company. Filed By: Symetra Assigned Benefits Service Company (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail - Petition (10/16/2020) filed by Symetra Assigned Benefits Service Company. Refers to: Shea, Patrick Filed By: Symetra Assigned Benefits Service Company (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order (10/16/2020) submitted by Symetra Assigned Benefits Service Company received but not filed on 08/27/2020. Filed By: Symetra Assigned Benefits Service Company (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 02/26/2021 at 09:00:00 AM at North County in N-31 Timothy M. Casserly.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketHearing on Petition scheduled for 10/16/2020 at 01:30:00 PM at North County in N-31 Timothy M. Casserly.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition - Other filed by Symetra Assigned Benefits Service Company. Refers to: Shea, Patrick Filed By: Symetra Assigned Benefits Service Company (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Symetra Assigned Benefits Service Company. Refers to: Shea, Patrick Filed By: Symetra Assigned Benefits Service Company (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Casserly, Timothy.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Symetra Assigned Benefits Service Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SUDANO, BRIAN D.